Fishing Lure Article
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 07586580
Examiner Patty Hong, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Cobb, Jerry, Applicant

Represented by JERRY COBB

Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Cobb, Jerry, W. Yellowstone, MT (US)
Filing Date September 21, 1990
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number A90701US
Confirmation Number 3073
Group Art Unit 3205
Class / Sub-Class 43 / 45
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/21/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 12/24/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
    Issue Notification Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 12/23/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
        Issue Fee Payment Verified
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/9/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
          Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 8/9/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
            Mail Notice of Allowance
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/2/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
              Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/10/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/3/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/3/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Response after Non-Final Action
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 1/30/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Mail Non-Final Rejection
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 1/23/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Non-Final Rejection
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 11/23/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 11/19/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 11/19/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Preliminary Amendment
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 11/8/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Application Captured on Microfilm
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 9/21/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?