System And Method For Processor Bus Use
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 07588194
Examiner Glenn Allen Auve, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gulick, Dale E., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenkens & Gilchrist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK R. ANDERSON +1 312 658 6500
Space Cynthia Barnett +1 574 372 7332
Space Timothy Brown +1 214 842 6829
Space DANIEL J. BURNHAM. +1 312 425 8513
Space Richard Butler +1 408 446 1418
Space Sorinel Cimpoes +1 312 425 3900
Space JANET M. GARETTO. +1 312 425 3900
Space John G. Gatz +1 312 425 3900
Space Russell J. Genet +1 312 425 3900 +1 312 425 3909 rgenet@nixonpeabody.com
Space Anil Gollahalli +1 405 325 4124
Space
Space Steven R. Greenfield +1 972 680 6058
Space John Heptig +1 214 451 2154
Space Gerald Hrycyszyn +1 617 646 8313
Space Sharon Audrey Israel +1 713 546 0575 +1 713 632 1807 sisrael@mayerbrownrowe.com
Space Paul Richard Kitch +1 312 425 3900 pkitch@nixonpeabody.com
Space MICHAEL W. MADDOX +1 214 564 5563
Space Lisa Meyerhoff +1 713 427 5000
Space Ashley Moore +1 214 978 6337
Space
Space Ross Robinson +1 214 745 5185
Space Stephen Rudisill +1 312 425 8570
Space Jerry R Selinger +1 214 855 4500
Space Amy L. Sierocki +1 213 629 6000
Space Justin D. Swindells +1 312 425 8534 jswindells@nixonpeabody.com
Space Andre Szuwalski +1 214 999 4795
Space Katherine Tabor +1 312 401 8101
Space HAROLD N. WELLS +1 312 857 2336
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Gulick, Dale E., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date September 26, 1990
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 06940/0006
Confirmation Number 4759
Group Art Unit 2308
Class / Sub-Class 395 / 325
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Assignments (11) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
    Issue Notification Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Fee Payment Verified
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
        Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
          Mail Notice of Allowance
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 3/4/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
            Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 2/26/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 2/3/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
                Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 2/3/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Amendment after Final Rejection
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 8/5/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 7/27/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Final Rejection
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Date Forwarded to Examiner
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Response after Non-Final Action
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 11/18/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Non-Final Rejection
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 11/10/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 10/25/1990, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Application Captured on Microfilm
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?