USA v. Halvorsen
Criminal Case Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cr-00002-JCH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark G. Califano +1 203 696 3029 +1 203 579 5550
Space John A. Danaher, III +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 240 3291

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kari Anne Dooley +1 203 821 3700
Space Christopher W. Schmeisser +1 203 821 3754 +1 203 773 5376 Christopher.Schmeisser@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Haven
Filed 1/3/2002
County Fairfield
Terminated 10/7/2002
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1832.F
Offense Level 4
181832.F THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 USM Return Executed
MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on Judgment executed as to Brian Halvorsen on 11/1/02 (Gutierrez, Y.)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT as to Brian Halvorsen (1) count(s) 1. Defendant pled guilty to Count One of an Information. Defendant shall be placed on probation for a term of two years with Special Conditions. A Fine in the amount of $2,000.00 is imposed at the that rate of $200.00 per month. Defendant shall immediately pay a Special Assessment of $100.00, for Count One. ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Gutierrez, Y.)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Sentencing
      Sentencing held Brian Halvorsen (1) count(s) 1; court departs downward ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Payment
        SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $100.00 paid in full as to Brian Halvorsen. Receipt # B004835 (Beverly, T.)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Reply/Response Misc
          RESPONSE by USA as to Brian Halvorsen re [11-1] motion to Continue Sentencing (Barrille, J.)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Sentencing
            Sentencing continued (no date set) (JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Order
              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Brian Halvorsen (Gutierrez, Y.)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Order
                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Brian Halvorsen (Barrille, J.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [14-1] waiver as to Brian Halvorsen (1), to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 6/17/02 to 7/31/02 ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Waiver of Sentencing Time
                    WAIVER of Sentencing Time by Brian Halvorsen (Gutierrez, Y.)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Order
                      ENDORSEMENT granting [11-1] motion to Continue Sentencing as to Brian Halvorsen (1), resetting Jury Selection for 4:30 7/18/02 for Brian Halvorsen ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Motion to Continue
                        MOTION by Brian Halvorsen to Continue Sentencing (Gutierrez, Y.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          RULING granting [8-1] motion to condolidate sentencing hearing with Douglas sprenger (3:02cr87) (certified copy) as to Brian Halvorsen (1) ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Boroskey, C.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            OBJECTION by Brian Halvorsen to [8-1] motion to condolidate sentencing hearing with Douglas sprenger (3:02cr87) (certified copy) (Krajcik, R.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MOTION by USA as to Brian Halvorsen to condolidate sentencing hearing with Douglas sprenger (3:02cr87) (certified copy) (Boroskey, C.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Sentencing
                                Sentencing set for 3:30 4/24/02 for Brian Halvorsen (1) count(s) 1 ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Order
                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [7-1] waiver as to Brian Halvorsen (1) for speedy sentencing from 3/22/02 to 4/22/02 ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Boroskey, C.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 Waiver of Sentencing Time
                                    WAIVER of Sentencing Time for the period from 3/22/02 to 4/22/02 by Brian Halvorsen (Barrille, J.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Order
                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [6-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing to 4/22/02 reset Sentencing for 3:30 4/22/02 as to Brian Halvorsen (1) ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Boroskey, C.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002, Terminated: 2/4/2002 Motion to Continue
                                        MOTION by Brian Halvorsen to Postpone Sentencing to 4/22/02 (Krajcik, R.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Bond
                                          Nonsurety BOND dated 1/3/02 in the Amount of $ 50,000.00 as to Brian Halvorsen with conditions (Boroskey, C.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Initial Appearance
                                            Initial presentment held as to Brian Halvorsen Defendant informed of rights. ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Plea Agreement
                                              Plea Agreement Letter as to Brian Halvorsen (Boroskey, C.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Waiver of Indictment
                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT executed in open court by Brian Halvorsen (Boroskey, C.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Information - Felony
                                                  INFORMATION filed in open Court as to Brian Halvorsen (1) count(s) 1 (Boroskey, C.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Plea Entered
                                                    PLEA entered by Brian Halvorsen . PLEA of GUILTY: Brian Halvorsen (1) count(s) 1: Sentencing set for 3:30 3/22/02 for Brian Halvorsen Court accepts plea. ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?