USA v. Sprenger
Criminal Case Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cr-00087-JCH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark G. Califano +1 203 696 3029 +1 203 579 5550
Space John A. Danaher, III +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 240 3291

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kari Anne Dooley +1 203 821 3700
Space Christopher W. Schmeisser +1 203 821 3754 +1 203 773 5376 Christopher.Schmeisser@usdoj.gov
Space Christine L. Sciarrino +1 203 821 3780 +1 203 773 5373 Christine.Sciarrino@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Haven
Filed 3/25/2002
County Fairfield
Terminated 10/7/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
300-mj-00314
Citation
Offense Level
181343 and 1346 - having devised or intending to devise any scheme or artifice to defraud (which includes a scheme to deprive another of the intangible right of honest services) and for obtaining money or property by means of false or fraudulent pret
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1832.F
Offense Level 4
181832.F THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS
Def Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED, PRIOR
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Stipulation
POST-JUDGMENT STIPULATION by Douglas Sprenger, USA (Barrille, J.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Stipulation
    POST-JUDGMENT STIPULATION by Douglas Sprenger, USA (Barrille, J.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Attorney Appearance - USA
      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christine L. Sciarrino appearing for USA (Barrille, J.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Order
        ENDORSEMENT denying as Moot [20-1] motion to Postpone Surrender until 11/18/02 as to Douglas Sprenger (1) ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Barrille, J.)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002, Terminated: 10/28/2002 Motion to Continue
          MOTION by Douglas Sprenger to Postpone Surrender until 11/18/02 (Barrille, J.)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
            JUDGMENT as to Douglas Sprenger (1) count 1. Defendant pled guilty to count one of an information. Defendant shall be imprisoned for a term of six months . Upon release from custody, defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of three years with special conditions. Defendant shall pay a fine of $3000. Defendant shall surrender to the U.S. Marshal on 11/4/02. Defendant shall immediately pay a Special Assessment of $100 for count one. See Judgment for details. ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Barrille, J.)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 1/21/2003 Payment
              SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $ 100.00 paid in full as to Douglas Sprenger . Receipt # B004915 (Beverly, T.)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Sentencing
                Sentencing held Douglas Sprenger (1) count(s) 1; Court depaarts downward; Bond to be returned when defendant is incarcerated; Voluntary surrender on 11/4/02 or some earlier time ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [16-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing for 45 days Sentencing for as to Douglas Sprenger (1) ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Barrille, J.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Reply/Response Misc
                    RESPONSE by USA as to Douglas Sprenger re [16-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing for 45 days (Barrille, J.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002, Terminated: 7/23/2002 Motion to Continue
                      MOTION by Douglas Sprenger to Postpone Sentencing for 45 days (Barrille, J.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Sentencing
                        Sentencing continued (no date set) (JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Order
                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Douglas Sprenger (Barrille, J.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Order
                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Douglas Sprenger (Barrille, J.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Order
                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Douglas Sprenger (Montz, A.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Order
                                ENDORSEMENT granting [11-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing for thirty days reset Sentencing for 4:30 7/18/02 for Douglas Sprenger as to Douglas Sprenger (1), to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 6/10/02 to 7/18/02 ( Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Barrille, J.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 Motion to Continue
                                  MOTION by Douglas Sprenger to Postpone Sentencing for thirty days (Boroskey, C.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    MOTION by USA as to Douglas Sprenger to consolidate sentencing hearing with Brian Halvorsen (3:02cr02) (original) (Boroskey, C.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Initial Appearance
                                      Initial presentment held as to Douglas Sprenger Defendant informed of rights. Bond set in magistrate case (JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Plea Agreement
                                        Plea Agreement Letter as to Douglas Sprenger (Boroskey, C.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Waiver of Indictment
                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT executed in open court by Douglas Sprenger (Boroskey, C.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Information - Felony
                                            INFORMATION filed in open Court as to Douglas Sprenger (1) count(s) 1 (Boroskey, C.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Plea Entered
                                              PLEA entered. PLEA of GUILTY: Douglas Sprenger (1) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions: [4-1] motion for Protective Order as to Douglas Sprenger (1) ) Sentencing set for 9:30 6/17/02 for Douglas Sprenger Court accepts plea. ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001, Terminated: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [5-1] order as to SEALED3:00m314(1) (1) ( Signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Barrille, J.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001, Terminated: 3/25/2002 Motion for Order
                                                  Joint MOTION by USA as to SEALED3:00m314(1) for Protective Order [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Barrille, J.) Modified on 04/02/2002
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Douglas Sprenger (1) ( Signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ). SEE Order for conditions of release [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Boroskey, C.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Initial Appearance
                                                      Initial presentment held as to Douglas Sprenger(1) Defendant informed of rights. Bond set at $50,000 non-surety; probable cause hearing set for 12/22/00 at 10:00 AM before HBF (HBF) [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Boroskey, C.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Complaint(Sealed)
                                                        SEALED COMPLAINT as to Douglas Sprenger (1) [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Barrille, J.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Arrest
                                                          ARREST of Douglas Sprenger (1) [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Boroskey, C.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Warrant Issued
                                                            Arrest WARRANT issued as to Douglas Sprenger (1) [ 3:00-m -314 ] (Barrille, J.)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?