USA v. Smith
Criminal Case Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cr-00163-JBA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Araujo Kahn +1 203 821 3700

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Haven
Filed 6/5/2002
County New Haven
Terminated 5/2/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1832.F
Offense Level 4
181832.F THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 USM Return Executed
MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on Judgment executed as to Kevin Smith on 7/9/03 (Villano, P.)
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
    Acknowledged Receipt of PSI as to Kevin Smith from Probation Office (Jefferson, V.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 PSI Returned to USPO
      Pre Sentence Report returned to U.S. Probation Office as to Kevin Smith (Jefferson, V.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Payment
        SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $ 100.00 paid in full as to Kevin Smith . Receipt # N009373 (Carfora, C.)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
          AMENDED JUDGMENT: AMENDMENT TO JUDGMENT: The date of imposition of sentence has been changed to reflect the correct date of 5/2/03. In all other respects the Judgment and Order of Commitment remains in effect. ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Jefferson, V.)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
            JUDGMENT as to Kevin Smith (1) count 1. Defendant placed on probation for a term of 5 years. Defendant shall pay as much of the costs of mental health treatment as he is deemed financially able. Defendant shall pay restitution in the amount of $311,000.00 payable to Clerk of Court, District of Connecticut and forwarded to Stran Technologies, Inc. at a rate of $50.00 per month due on or before the 15th. of the month. Fine waived. Special Assessment of $100.00, due within 15 days from date of judgment. ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Jefferson, V.)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Presentence Investigation Report
              PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to Kevin Smith PSI may be unsealed and returned to US Probation Office after 10 days if no appeal has been filed. (document filed separate from case file) (Jefferson, V.)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Order
                ENDORSEMENT as to Kevin Smith granting [14-1] motion SEALED MOTION as to Kevin Smith (1) ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Jefferson, V.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Sentencing
                  Sentencing held Kevin Smith (1) count 1 ( JBA) (Jefferson, V.)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Order
                    ENDORSEMENT as to Kevin Smith granting [13-1] motion SEALED MOTION to seal this document and document #14 as to Kevin Smith (1) ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Jefferson, V.)
                      LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Sealed Document +
                      Sealed document by USA as to Kevin Smith (document filed separate from the case file) (Moore, P.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Sealed Motion +
                        MOTION by USA as to Kevin Smith SEALED MOTION (document filed separate from case file) (Moore, P.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Sealed Motion +
                          MOTION by USA as to Kevin Smith SEALED MOTION to seal this document and document #14 (document filed separate from case file) (Moore, P.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Order
                            ENDORSEMENT as to Kevin Smith granting [11-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing to a date in April reset Sentencing for 2:30 5/2/03 for Kevin Smith as to Kevin Smith (1), granting [11-2] motion to Seal motion to postpone sentencing as to Kevin Smith (1), to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 2/25/03 to 5/2/03 ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) UNDER SEAL (Jefferson, V.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Waiver of Sentencing Time
                              WAIVER of Sentencing Time by Kevin Smith (Torday, B.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Motion to Continue
                                MOTION by Kevin Smith to Postpone Sentencing to a date in April , and to Seal motion to postpone sentencing (Torday, B.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ENDORSEMENT ORDER as to Kevin Smith granting [8-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing until 2/03 reset Sentencing for 2:30 2/25/03 for Kevin Smith as to Kevin Smith (1), granting [8-2] motion to Seal this Motion as to Kevin Smith (1), to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 11/4/02 to 2/25/03 ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Jefferson, V.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Waiver of Sentencing Time
                                    WAIVER of Sentencing Time by Kevin Smith (Torday, B.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002, Terminated: 11/12/2002 Motion to Continue
                                      MOTION by Kevin Smith to Postpone Sentencing until 2/03 , and to Seal this Motion (Jefferson, V.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Initial Appearance
                                        Initial presentment held as to Kevin Smith Defendant informed of rights. ( JBA) (Jefferson, V.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 BondCourt Filing
                                          RELEASE on Personal Recognizance Bond dated 6/5/02 as to Kevin Smith ( Approved by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Jefferson, V.)
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Sealed Document +
                                            Sealed document by Kevin Smith as to Kevin Smith (document filed separate from the case file) (Jefferson, V.)
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Sealed Document +
                                              Sealed document by Kevin Smith, USA as to Kevin Smith (document filed separate from the case file) (Jefferson, V.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Plea Agreement
                                                Plea Agreement Letter as to Kevin Smith (Jefferson, V.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Waiver of Indictment
                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT executed in open court by Kevin Smith (Jefferson, V.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Information - Felony
                                                    INFORMATION filed in open Court as to Kevin Smith (1) count(s) 1 (Jefferson, V.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Plea Entered
                                                      PLEA entered by Kevin Smith . PLEA of GUILTY: Kevin Smith (1) count(s) 1 Sentencing set for 2:30 11/4/02 for Kevin Smith Court accepts plea. ( JBA) (Jefferson, V.)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?