OZTURK v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-05463
District Judge Esther Salas, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 1:11 AM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ULAS JAMES OZTURK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KRUMHOLZ DILLON PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALAN L. KRUMHOLZ +1 201 656 5232 krumholz@krumholzlaw.com
v.
No Logo United Parcel Service, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ansa Assuncao LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan R. Corkery +1 267 528 0733 +1 267 528 0726 ryan.corkery@ansalaw.com
Space Michael J. O'Neill +1 267 528 0750 michael.oneill@ansalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK J. HASSON +1 215 627 3087 patrick.hasson@libertymutual.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KEVIN JOHN SKELLY +1 973 966 8314 kskelly@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCINE ESPOSITO +1 973 966 8275 fesposito@daypitney.com
Space THERESA A. KELLY +1 973 966 6300 tkelly@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keenan Cohen & Howard, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHRISTOPHER J. MERRICK +1 215 609 1110 cmerrick@freightlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by MOLLY QUINN CAMPBELL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MOLLY QUINN CAMPBELL

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MIRIAM S. EDELSTEIN +1 215 851 8224 +1 215 851 1420 medelstein@reedsmith.com
Space JONATHAN R. NADLER +1 215 851 8100 jnadler@reedsmith.com
Space ROY PRATHER, III +1 215 851 8100 rprather@reedsmith.com
Space GARY M. TOCCI +1 215 241 7953 +1 215 851 1420 gtocci@reedsmith.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/13/2016. (ld, ) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Opinion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/13/2016. (ld, ) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Letter Rule 7.1
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Joint Discovery Plan
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. re 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (ESPOSITO, FRANCINE) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. re 4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ESPOSITO, FRANCINE) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEF in Opposition filed by ULAS JAMES OZTURK re 4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(KRUMHOLZ, ALAN) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ULAS JAMES OZTURK. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Proof of mailing)(KRUMHOLZ, ALAN) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. Responses due by 11/4/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration of Eric Bringe and Exhibit 1-A, # 3 Exhibit 1-B to the Bringe Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(ESPOSITO, FRANCINE) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc... (ESPOSITO, FRANCINE) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. from NJ SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION: HUDSON COUNTY, case number HUD-L-3556-13. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5228650), filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal, # 2 Certificate of Service and of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?