Cuevas v. Preferred Mutual Ins, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00586-EBB
District Judge Ellen Bree Burns, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ellen Bree Burns
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Victor Cuevas, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of J. Michael Sulzbach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Sulzbach +1 203 781 0880 +1 203 781 0861 jms@sulzbachlaw.com

Represented by Thomas G. Manning

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter A. Kelly +1 520 366 0112 +1 520 366 0038 attpak@hughes.net
v.
No Logo Melanie Benjamin, Defendant

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
Space Charles Phillip Reed +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 creed@lflaw.com
No Logo Preferred Mutual Ins Co, Defendant

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
Space Charles Phillip Reed +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 creed@lflaw.com
Attributes
Office New Haven
Filed 4/5/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County New Haven
Terminated 8/6/2004
Origin 4
Reopened 5/22/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JGM, REFCNF
Timeline
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order Dismissing Case
NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE re [38] Stipulation of Dismissal . Signed by Clerk on 8/6/04. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE. (Rodko, B.)
LREF
Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Melanie Benjamin, Victor Cuevas, Preferred Mutual Ins Co. (Rodko, B.)
LREF
Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE 41(b) by Victor Cuevas, Preferred Mutual Ins Co. Case reported settled 7/22/04, case to be dismissed if closing papers not filed within 30 days thereafter (August 23, 2004). (Moore, P.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dismissal due by 8/21/2004 (Moore, P.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Docket Annotation
Made correction re [36] Settlement Conference as to Judge. (Villano, P.)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis : Telephone Settlement Conference held on 6/23/2004. (Villano, P.) Modified on 7/1/2004 (Villano, P.).
LREF
Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis : Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2004. (Rodko, B.)
LREF
Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Re: courtesy copies . Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/21/03. (Rodko, B.)
LREF
Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 11/19/03. (Rodko, B.)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Victor Cuevas -- J. Michael Sulzbach (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
RULING vacating [24-1] judgment order pursuant to [25-1] motion for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 granting [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment, vacating [23-1] ruling granting [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Melanie Benjamin, Preferred Mutual Ins, denying [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment and reinstating case ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) 3 Page(s) SEE Ruling for details (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Case Reopened
Case reopened pursuant to 5/22/03 [31-1] ruling (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by Victor Cuevas to response to [25-1] motion for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Victor Cuevas (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Peter Kelly Re [25-1] motion for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Victor Cuevas (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Statement of Material Facts
Amended STATEMENT of Material Facts by Victor Cuevas regarding [25-1] motion for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
OBJECTIONS by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin to [25-1] motion for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Victor Cuevas (Depino, F.)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM by Victor Cuevas in support of [25-1] motion for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION by Victor Cuevas for Reconsideration of [24-1] judgment order dated 4/10/03 re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brief Due 5/8/03 ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003, Terminated: 5/22/2003 Order on Motion for Judgment
JUDGMENT for Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin ( signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Terminated Case
Case closed (Warner, R.)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003, Terminated: 5/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
RULING granting [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) 4 Page(s) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin to response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss by Melanie Benjamin (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Statement of Material Facts
STATEMENT of Material Facts by Victor Cuevas regarding [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM by Victor Cuevas in opposition to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Melanie Benjamin, Preferred Mutual Ins (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to 3/17/03 to file opposition brief to summary judgment motion, Brief Deadline set for 3/17/03 [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Victor Cuevas to Extend Time until 3/17/03 to file brief in opposition to summary judgment motion (Sherman, M.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [16-1] motion to Extend pretrial deadline by 90 days (no date given) ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin in support of [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin for Summary Judgment (Brief Due 2/19/03 ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin to Extend the orginal pretrial deadline by 90 days (no date given) (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT [15-1] motion to Extend Time for 30 days to respond to Request for Admissions ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin to Extend Time for 30 days to respond to Request for Admissions (Rodko, R.)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Answer
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin (Sherman, M.)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
RULING denying [9-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) 9 Page(s) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by Melanie Benjamin to response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss by Melanie Benjamin (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM by Victor Cuevas in opposition to [9-1] motion to Dismiss by Melanie Benjamin (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM by Melanie Benjamin in support of [9-1] motion to Dismiss (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002, Terminated: 7/25/2002 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Melanie Benjamin to Dismiss (Brief Due 7/22/02 ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin -- W. Glen Pierson (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT approving [7-1] 26f report, reset Discovery deadline to 11/30/02 , reset Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/03 , reset Filing of Trial Memorandum due by 11/30/02 , reset Jury Trial for 1/31/03 ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002, Terminated: 6/13/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Warner, R.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time 30 days to respond to complaint ( signed by Senior Judge Ellen Bree Burns ) (Brown, S.) Modified on 05/14/2002
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin to Extend Time 30 days to answer complaint (Falcone, K.) Modified on 05/14/2002
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie Benjamin -- Charles Phillip Reed (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed on 4/11/02 as to Preferred Mutual Ins (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed on 4/11/02 as to Melanie Benjamin (Falcone, K.)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Scheduling Order
ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 10/5/02 ; Dispositive Motions due 11/4/02 Amended Pleadings due 6/5/02 Motions to Dismiss due 7/5/02 (Malone, P.)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # N006211 (Malone, P.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Preferred Mutual Ins, Melanie BenJamin (Malone, P.)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 149 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?