Hiler v. Hyde School
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00416-DJS
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lindsay Hiler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dawne Westbrook +1 860 633 2139 +1 860 633 2749 dawnewestbrook@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Hyde School at Woodstock, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ouellette, Deganis & Gallagher, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sergio C Deganis +1 203 272 1157 +1 203 250 1835 Sdeganis@ODGWLAW.com
Office New Haven
Filed 3/7/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/6/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, REFCNF
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT so ordered [55-1] stipulation ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
    LREF
    Blank 55 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 7/24/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of dismissal of case (Basile, F.)
      LREF
      Blank 53 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
      Order of dismissal of case; case settled ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
        LREF
        Blank 52 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
        NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 41(b) Settlement. Case reported settled on 5/6/03 Dismissal due 6/5/03 ( Signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Basile, F.)
          LREF
          Blank 51 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM by Lindsay Hiler in support of of admissibility of circumstantial evidence concerning the knowledge of the defendant (Basile, F.)
            LREF
            Blank 50 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Jury Selection
            JURY Selection held Jury Trial set for 8:30 5/12/03 ( DJS) (Basile, F.)
              LREF
              Blank 49 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Notice of Appearance/
              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Lindsay Hiler -- Dawne Westbrook (Basile, F.)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Terminated Case
                Case closed (Basile, F.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Settlement Conference
                  Settlement Conference held. Case settled. (TPS) (Sunbury, B.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 48 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by Hyde School to response to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Hyde School (Basile, F.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 47 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER:Parties to submit briefs by 12:00 noon on 5/5/03 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 46 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER: Settlement Conference scheduled for 5/4/03 at 2pm ( signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Basile, F.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Pretrial Conference
                          Pre-Trial Conference held ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 44 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Trial Brief
                            TRIAL BRIEF by Hyde School Estimated trial time is for 6 days (Basile, F.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Trial Brief
                              TRIAL BRIEF by Hyde School Estimated trial time is for 6 days (Basile, F.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                RULING denying [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment, resetting Jury Selection for 8:30 a.m. on 5/5/03 , resetting Jury Trial for 5/12/03 , setting Pre-Trial Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 4/25/03 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) 12 Page(s) (Grady, B.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                  Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 4/25/03 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 41 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM by Lindsay Hiler in opposition to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Hyde School (Basile, F.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 40 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Statement of Material Facts
                                      STATEMENT of Material Facts by Lindsay Hiler regarding [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Basile, F.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM by Hyde School in support of [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Basile, F.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Statement of Material Facts
                                          STATEMENT of Material Facts by Hyde School regarding [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Basile, F.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            MOTION by Hyde School for Summary Judgment (Brief Due 3/14/03 ) (Basile, F.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Order
                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to 06/03 for trial and pretrial conference, setting Jury Selection for 8:30 a.m. on 5/6/03 , setting Jury Trial for 5/12/03 through 05/19/03 from 8:30 a.m. to 2:00 p.m. ( signed Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Pretrial Conference
                                                Pre-Trial Conference held ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Trial Brief
                                                  TRIAL BRIEF by Hyde School Estimated trial time is for 6 days (Basile, F.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Order
                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time for filing of dispositive motions, reset Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/03 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Trial Brief
                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by Lindsay Hiler Estimated trial time is for 4 days (Montgomery, C.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        OBJECTIONS by Lindsay Hiler to [32-1] motion to Extend Time to June 2003 for trial and pretrial conference be rescheduled for date 2 weeks prior by Hyde School, [31-1] motion to Extend Time for filing of dispositive motions by Hyde School (Montgomery, C.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003, Terminated: 2/14/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by Hyde School to Extend Time to June 2003 for trial and pretrial conference be rescheduled for date 2 weeks prior (Montgomery, C.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003, Terminated: 2/12/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                            MOTION by Hyde School to Extend Time for filing of dispositive motions No time specified (Montgomery, C.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                              Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 2/12/03 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER requiring defendant to supply plaintiff only with certain pages from Larry Dubinsky's personnel file by 1/3/03 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Order
                                                                  ENDORSEMENT denying [25-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to comply with Discovery requests ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Bauer, J.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Conference set for 10/1/02 at 12:00 pm on Motion to Compel (Doc.#25) See for details ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      OBJECTIONS by Lindsay Hiler to [25-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to comply with Discovery requests by Hyde School (Bauer, J.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Settlement Conference
                                                                        Settlement Conference held Case did not settle.(TPS) (Sunbury, B.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Statement of Material Facts
                                                                          STATEMENT of Material Facts by Hyde School regarding [25-1] motion to Compel compliance with Discovery requests (Montgomery, C.) Modified on 10/03/2002
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Motion to Compel
                                                                            MOTION by Hyde School to Compel compliance with Discovery requests (Brief Due 10/2/02 ) (Montgomery, C.) Modified on 10/03/2002
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER Settlement conference before Judge Smith to be held 9/12/02 at 10:00 am See for details ( signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                Status Conference held ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  RULING denying [17-1] motion to Extend Time by 30 days to respond to Production requests, granting in part, denying in part [12-1] motion to Compel Production requests ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) 2 Page(s) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Status Conference set for 7/29/02 at 9:30 am on Motion to Compel See Order for details ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER of referral to Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith for settlement conference (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/9/02 ; Dispositive Motions due 1/9/03 ; Filing of Trial Memorandum by 2/7/03 Trial Ready Date Set for 3/1/03 Trial will commence 3/2003 ( Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2003 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                          ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSES by Hyde School to amended complaint (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002, Terminated: 7/31/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            MOTION by Hyde School to Extend Time by 30 days to respond to Production requests (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER, set Status Report deadline to 2:00 6/24/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Hyde School in opposition to [12-1] motion to Compel Production requests by Lindsay Hiler (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Material Facts by Lindsay Hiler regarding [12-1] motion to Compel Production requests (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Lindsay Hiler in support of [12-1] motion to Compel Production requests (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002, Terminated: 7/31/2002 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                      MOTION by Lindsay Hiler to Compel Production requests (Brief Due 6/25/02 ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Lindsay Hiler amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Order
                                                                                                          ENDORSEMENT granting [8-1] motion for Clarification of [1-1] complaint, granting [8-2] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint to comply with FRCP Rule 10(b) ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                            REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER, 26(f) Report of Conference Due 5/23/02 See for details ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002, Terminated: 5/23/2002 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                MOTION by Hyde School for Clarification of [1-1] complaint , and to Amend [1-1] complaint to comply with FRCP Rule 10(b) (Brief Due 5/28/02 ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Order
                                                                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time by 60 days to respond to complaint, 26(f) Report of Conference Due 5/10/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002, Terminated: 4/4/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Hyde School to Extend Time by 60 days to respond to complaint (Sprong, R.)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Hyde School -- Sergio C. Deganis (Sprong, R.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed on 3/18/02 as to Hyde School (Sprong, R.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Lindsay Hiler -- John R. Williams (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: Parties are commence Discovery immediately ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 9/6/02 ; Dispositive Motions due 10/6/02 Amended Pleadings due 05/07/02 Motions to Dismiss due 06/07/02 (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # N005928 (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Hyde School at Woodstock (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,605 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?