Batiste, et al v. New Haven, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00983-SRU
District Judge Stefan R. Underhill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alicia Roman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff
No Logo Amy Pittman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Ana M. Ramirez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Attley F. Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Bobsie Perry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Cecelia Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Charlene Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Christian Community Action, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Cibyl Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Crystal Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Elias Valentin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Francisca Monta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Garfield Reid, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo George Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Gertrude Carney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Gloria Batiste, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Harold Carney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Harry L. Daniels, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Jerry Edwards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Leroy Hamilton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Linda Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Luis M. Santaella, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Lutherans In Mission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Marco Nieves, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Margaret Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Maria Luas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Neville, Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Norman Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Onelio Leon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Patricia Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Quintus Reid, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Raphael Ramirez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Resurrection Lutheran Church, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Robert Earl Howard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Sarah Senior, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Sarah Streater, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Shannon Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Sydney Graham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Tammie McClain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Valerie Graham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Wynita Douglass, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo City of New Haven, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Cofrancesco +1 203 467 6003 +1 203 467 6004 pattycofrancesco@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Corp Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Ude, Jr. +1 203 946 7951 +1 203 946 7942
Space Stacy L. Werner +1 203 946 7958
No Logo New Haven Bd of Ed, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durant, Nichols, Houston, Mitchell & Sheahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Sedor +1 203 337 8242 ssedor@durantnic.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandak Hennessey & Greco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy E. Souchuns +1 203 425 4200 +1 203 325 8608

Toggle Switch Represented by Shipman & Goodwin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P. Williams +1 860 251 5127 +1 860 251 5600 jwilliams@Goodwin.com
Office New Haven
Filed 6/10/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Court Trial
County New Haven
Terminated 12/30/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 52 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
Acknowledgement of Receipt from Shipman and Goodwin of trial exhibits (Sbalbi, B.)
    LREF
    Blank 51 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT for City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed against Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Warren, C.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Terminated Case
      Case closed (Warren, C.)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM of Decision The cousrt rules in favor of the defendants on each of the plaintiff's claims. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the defendants and shall close the file ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) 28 Pages(s) (Warren, C.)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Exhibit
          Marked exhibit List as to all plaintiffs (Sbalbi, B.)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Exhibit
            Marked exhibit List as to City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed (Sbalbi, B.)
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Exhibit
              Marked Court Exhibit List (Sbalbi, B.)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Exhibit
                Marked witness List as to all plaintiffs, City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed (Sbalbi, B.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Bench Trial Completed
                  COURT Trial concluded ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                    COURT Trial held Trial continued until 11/14/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                      COURT Trial held Trial continued until 11/13/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 ICMS - converted docket entry
                        MINUTE Entry: denying [0-0] oral motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                          MOTION in open court by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Sbalbi, B.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Settlement Conference
                            Settlement Conference held ( WIG) (Sanders, C.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 41 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                              COURT Trial held Trial continued until 11/5/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 40 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                                COURT Trial held Trial continued until 11/4/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                                  COURT Trial held Trial continued until 11/1/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                                    COURT Trial held Trial continued until 10/31/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                                      COURT Trial held Trial continued until 10/30/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Bench Trial - Held
                                        COURT Trial held Trial continued until 10/29/02 ( SRU) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002, Terminated: 12/30/2002 Answer
                                          ANSWER & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed (Sanders, C.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Trial Brief
                                            TRIAL BRIEF by Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin Estimated trial time is for 1 week (Sanders, C.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                              PROPOSED Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed (Sanders, C.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002, Terminated: 12/30/2002 Motion to Preclude
                                                MOTION by New Haven Bd of Ed to preclude witnesses (Brief Due 11/5/02 ) (Sanders, C.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Witness List
                                                  (Revised)Proposed Witness list by all plaintiffs (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed in support of [29-1] motion for Order of Notice re: Plaintiffs in this action (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Motion for Order
                                                      MOTION by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed for Order of Notice re: Plaintiffs in this action (Brief Due 10/29/02 ) (Gutierrez, Y.) Modified on 10/09/2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Order
                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to 10/14/2002 to disclose expert witnesses (signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill) (Candee, D.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002, Terminated: 10/7/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed to Extend Time to 10/14/2002 to disclose expert witnesses (Sanders, C.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                            MOTION by Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin for Preliminary Injunction (Brief Due 1/23/02 ) (Warren, C.) Modified on 10/07/2002
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Order
                                                              ENDORSEMENT granting in part, denying in part [23-1] motion to Extend Time to 9/13/02 to Respond to Discovery Requests (signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill) (Candee, D.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Status Report
                                                                Response re: 26f notice by all plaintiffs (Sanders, C.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  OBJECTIONS by Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin to [21-1] motion to Dismiss by New Haven Bd of Ed, City of New Haven (Sanders, C.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Notice
                                                                    Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 9/11/02 ( signed by Clerk ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002, Terminated: 9/10/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      MOTION by all plaintiffs to Extend Time 9/30/02 to Respond to Discovery Requests (Corriette, M.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                        MEMORANDUM by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed in support of [21-1] motion to Dismiss (Sanders, C.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002, Terminated: 12/30/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed to Dismiss (Brief Due 8/29/02 ) (Sanders, C.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Joint MOTION by City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed, all plaintiffs for expedited scheduling to 10/14/02 to complete discovery & to 7 days following a prefiling conference to file a motion for summary judgment (Kolesnikoff, D.) Modified on 08/06/2002
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Order
                                                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [20-1] motion for expedited scheduling 10/14/02 to complete discovery & to 7 days following a prefiling conference to file a motion for summary judgment, resetting Discovery deadline to 10/14/02 ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Kolesnikoff, D.) Modified on 08/06/2002
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for New Haven Bd of Ed -- Amy E. Souchuns (Warren, C.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for City of New Haven -- Martin S. Echter (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for City of New Haven -- Thomas W. Ude Jr. (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for City of New Haven -- Stacy L. Werner (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Order
                                                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [15-1] motion to Dismiss as to Henry Hamilton only ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002, Terminated: 7/9/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          MOTION by Henry Hamilton to Dismiss as to Henry Hamilton only (Brief Due 7/29/02 ) (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Order
                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to 8/3/02 to file an answer ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Order
                                                                                              ENDORSEMENT denying as moot [13-1] motion to Extend Time until 8/12/02 to file opposition to motion for temporary injunction and extend hearing date on motion for preliminary injunction. ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                MOTION by New Haven Bd of Ed to Extend Time to 8/3/02 to file an answer (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  MOTION by New Haven Bd of Ed to Extend Time until 8/12/02 to file opposition to motion for temporary injunction and extend hearing date on motion for preliminary injunction. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Order
                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [9-1] motion to Dismiss as to Arlease Edwards only (signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill) (Candee, D.)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE issued Re: preliminary injunction Hearing set for 10:00 7/18/02 (signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill) (Candee, D.)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                        Motion hearing re: [4-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction by plaintiffs set at 10:00 7/18/02 ( SRU) (Candee, D.)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for New Haven Bd of Ed -- Stephen M. Sedor (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for New Haven Bd of Ed -- Joseph P. Williams (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002, Terminated: 6/28/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION by Arlease Edwards to Dismiss as to Arlease Edwards only (Brief Due 7/15/02 (Sanders, C.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed on 6/12/02 as to City of New Haven (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed on 6/12/02 as to New Haven Bd of Ed (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Exhibits by Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Arlease Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Henry Hamilton, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin to [4-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (Villano, P.) Modified on 06/14/2002
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Arlease Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Henry Hamilton, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin in support of [4-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (Villano, P.) Modified on 06/14/2002
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Arlease Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Henry Hamilton, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin for Preliminary Injunction (Brief Due 7/1/02 ) (Villano, P.) Modified on 06/14/2002
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 12/10/02 ; Dispositive Motions due 1/9/03 Amended Pleadings due 8/12/02 Motions to Dismiss due 9/10/02 (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Gloria Batiste, Gertrude Carney, Harold Carney, Christian Community, Harry L. Daniels Jr., Wynita Douglass, Arlease Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Sydney Graham, Valerie Graham, Henry Hamilton, Leroy Hamilton, Cecelia Harris, Margaret Harris, Norman Harris, Robert Earl Howard, Attley F. Jackson, Crystal Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Cibyl Johnson, Onelio Leon, Neville Lewis, Maria Luas, Lutherans In Mission, Tammie McClain, Francisca Monta, Marco Nieves, Bobsie Perry, Amy Pittman, Ana M. Ramirez, Raphael Ramirez, Garfield Reid, Quintus Reid, Resurrection, Alicia Roman, Luis M. Santaella, Sarah Senior, Charlene Smith, Linda Smith, Shannon Smith, Sarah Streater, George Torres, Elias Valentin -- John R. Williams (Villano, P.) Modified on 06/14/2002
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT with jury demand Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 6713 (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                SUMMONSES issued for City of New Haven, New Haven Bd of Ed (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 279 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?