Data Support Assoc v. MGE UPS Sys, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-01418-EBB
District Judge Ellen Bree Burns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Support Assoc, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandak Hennessey & Greco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Scott Klein +1 203 425 4200 +1 203 325 8608 gklein@shglaw.com
Space Peter M. Nolin +1 203 425 4200 +1 203 325 8608 pnolin@carmodylaw.com
No Logo MGE UPS Sys, Inc, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Elliott +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 djelliott@daypitney.com
Space Michael P. Shea +1 860 275 0146 +1 860 275 0343 mpshea@DayPitney.com
v.
No Logo MGE UPS Sys, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Elliott +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 djelliott@daypitney.com
Space Mitchell R. Harris +1 860 275 0332 +1 860 275 0343 mrharris@daypitney.com
Space Michael P. Shea +1 860 275 0146 +1 860 275 0343 mpshea@DayPitney.com
Space Jason S. Weathers +1 860 275 0356 +1 860 275 0343 jsweathers@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finn Dixon & Herling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. McHugh +1 203 325 5000 +1 203 325 5001 pmchugh@fdh.com

Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

No Logo Data Support Assoc, Inc, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandak Hennessey & Greco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Scott Klein +1 203 425 4200 +1 203 325 8608 gklein@shglaw.com
No Logo Enersys Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
Space Jason Marc Kuselias +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299
Space Elizabeth R. Leong +1 860 275 8245 +1 860 275 8299 eleong@rc.com
Space Craig A. Raabe +1 860 275 8200 craabe@rc.com
No Logo MGE UPS Sys, Inc, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Elliott +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 djelliott@daypitney.com
Space Michael P. Shea +1 860 275 0146 +1 860 275 0343 mpshea@DayPitney.com
Office New Haven
Filed 8/15/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Fairfield
Terminated 11/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JGM, REFCNF
  Entries (145) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 120 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Order Dismissing Case
NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE re [119] Stipulation of Dismissal . Signed by Clerk on 11/29/04. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE(Pesta, J.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of case by Data Support Assoc, Inc, Enersys Inc, MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Pesta, J.)
      LREF
      Blank 118 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection [117] Motion for Extension of Time until December 3, 2004 to file closing papers . Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 11/23/04. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. (Corbett, P.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
        Set Deadlines: Dismissal due by 12/3/2004 (Ruocco, M.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
          MOTION for Extension of Time to file closing papers until 12/3/04 by Data Support Assoc, Inc. (Pesta, J.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 116 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Exhibit
            Marked Trial Exhibit List by Enersys Inc. (Pesta, J.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Exhibit
              AMENDED Marked Exhibit List by Data Support Assoc, Inc. (Pesta, J.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 114 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Exhibit
                Marked Trial Exhibit List by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Pesta, J.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Notice
                  NOTICE 41(b) Dismissal due by 11/24/2004. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/04. (Moore, P.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 113 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Witness List
                    Marked Witness List. (Pesta, J.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 111 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Sweeney on behalf of Enersys Inc (Moore, P.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 110 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis : Miscellaneous Hearing held on 10/25/2004. Settlement placed on the record. (Court Reporter Granfield (Falzarano).) (Moore, P.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 109 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Bench Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial completed on 10/25/2004. (Court Reporter Biancucci (Falzarano).) (Moore, P.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 108 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/21/2004, continued until 9:00 on 10/25/04 (Court Reporter Biancucci/Granfield/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 107 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/20/2004, continued until 9:00 on 10/21/04 (Court Reporter R. Palletto/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Marc Kuselias on behalf of Enersys Inc (Villano, P.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 106 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/19/2004, continued until 9:00 on 10/20/04. (Court Reporter L. Biancucci/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 104 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ENDORSEMENT ORDER denying re [92] Corrected MOTION to Amend [67] Third Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 10/19/04. (Pesta, J.)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Response
                                      Memorandum in Opposition to [92] CORRECTED MOTION to Amend [67] Third Amended Answer to Complaint,Counterclaim filed by Data Support Assoc, Inc. Exhibits in paper format only. (Pesta, J.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 102 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/18/2004, continued until 9:00 on 10/19/04. (Court Reporter B. Granfield/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 101 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/15/2004; continued until 10/18/04 (Court Reporter B. Scott/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 100 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/14/2004. (Court Reporter B. Granfield/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 99 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen Bree Burns : Bench Trial held on 10/13/2004, continued until 9:00 10/14/04. (Court Reporter B. Scott/Falzarano Court Reporters.) (Ruocco, M.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                Oral ORDER in open court denying [90] Motion to Amend/Correct, denying [92] Motion to Amend/Correct by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 10/13/04. (Ruocco, M.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 98 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Endorsement ORDER approving [96] Stipulation re: Trial Witnesses filed by Data Support Assoc, Inc, MGE UPS Sys, Inc. Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 9/5/04. (Pesta, J.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 97 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                    DEPOSITION designations for trial by Data Support Assoc, Inc (Pesta, J.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Stipulation
                                                      STIPULATION re: Trial Witnesses by Data Support Assoc, Inc, MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Pesta, J.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 95 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        FOURTH AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Separate & additional COUNTERCLAIMS against Data Support Assoc, Inc by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit H# (8) Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit G only)(Pesta, J.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 94 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE to Parties re: court will not be held on 10/18/04 . Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 10/04/04. (Pesta, J.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 93 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            CORRECTED Memorandum in Support re [92] CORRECTED MOTION to Amend [67] Amended Third Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Pesta, J.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004, Terminated: 10/19/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                              CORRECTED MOTION to Amend [67] Third Amended Answer to Complaint,Counterclaim by MGE UPS Sys, Inc.Responses due by 10/20/2004 (Pesta, J.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 91 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                Memorandum in Support re [90] MOTION to Amend/Correct [67] Third Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit a# (2) Exhibit b# (3) Exhibit c# (4) Exhibit d# (5) Exhibit e)(Pesta, J.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 90 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct [67] Third Amended Answer to Complaint, Defenses, Counterclaim by MGE UPS Sys, Inc.Responses due by 10/8/2004 (Pesta, J.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Data Support Assoc, Inc (Pesta, J.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR Calendar Entry Bench Trial set for 10/13/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom Three - New Haven before Judge Ellen Bree Burns. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE (Corbett, P.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell R. Harris on behalf of MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis : Settlement Conference held on 8/10/2004. (Pesta, J.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER approving [84] Stipulation filed by Data Support Assoc, Inc, MGE UPS Sys, Inc, Enersys Inc. Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 7/21/04. (Depino, F.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004 Stipulation
                                                                              STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES CONSENTING TO TRIAL BY THE COURT by Data Support Assoc, Inc, Enersys Inc, MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2004 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303 before Judge Joan G. Margolis. PARTIES MUST BE AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE IF THEY ARE UNABLE TO ATTEND THE CONFERENCE. (Hill, M.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 82 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Ellen Bree Burns on 6/15/04. (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 81 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Order of TransferCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Dominic J. Squatrito recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ellen Bree Burns for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/26/04. (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                      Telephone Status Conference held before Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/30/2004. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                        Telephone Status Conference set for 4/30/2004 11:30 AM before Judge Dominic J. Squatrito. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Response
                                                                                          RESPONSE to plaintiffs [77] memorandum regarding evidentiary problems pursuant to [76] Trial Brief filed by Enersys Inc. (Bauer, J.)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Response
                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMO & RESPONSE re [76] Joint Trial Memo - re Anticipated Evidentiary Problems, filed by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-B)(Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 77 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Response
                                                                                              RESPONSE re [76] Joint Trial Memo - Defendant's Memo re Evidentiary Problems filed by Data Support Assoc, Inc. (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Trial Brief
                                                                                                JOINT TRIAL MEMO by Data Support Assoc, Inc, Enersys Inc, MGE UPS Sys, Inc Estimated trial time 15 Days. (Attachments: # (1) List of Witnesses# (2) List of Exhibits# (3) Proposed Vore Dire Questions# (4) Proposed Jury Instructions# (5) Memo re Evidentiary Problems# (6) MGE List of Witnesses# (7) Trial Exhibit List# (8) Prop. Voir Dire re MGE# (9) Req. for Jury Instr.# (10) Notice of Manual Filing re Exhibits A-E)(Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Second Amended Third Party Complaint by Enersys Inc.(Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Enersys Inc , filed by MGE UPS Sys, Inc.(Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [72] Assented Motion for Leave to Amend Third Party Complaint. The Clerk shall docket the attached Second Amended Third Party Complaint dated February 27, 2004 . Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/8/04. (Pike, C.)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004, Terminated: 3/8/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Third Party [31] Amended Complaint by Data Support Assoc, Inc.Responses due by 3/19/2004 (Basile, F.)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [70] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mario R. Borelli terminated . Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 2/20/04. (Pike, C.)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004, Terminated: 2/20/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                          MOTION for Mario R. Borelli to Withdraw as Attorney by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Basile, F.)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Response
                                                                                                            RESPONSE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re [67] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Data Support Assoc, Inc. (Basile, F.)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Jury Demand
                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                THIRD AMENDED ANSWER & SEPARATE & ADDITIONAL DEFENSES to [31] Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Data Support Assoc, Inc by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F# (2) Exhibit G pg1-20# (3) Exhibit G pg21-38)(Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against MGE UPS Sys, Inc , filed by Data Support Assoc, Inc.(Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [64] Motion to Amend the Complaint. The Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint by February 16, 2004. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 1/23/04. (Pike, C.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/16/2004. (Pike, C.)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part [61] Motion for Extension of Time to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery shall be completed by February 16, 2004. Dispositive motions shall be filed by February 16, 2004 and if no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by March 15, 2004. This case shall be trial ready in April, 2004 . Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/13/03. (Pike, C.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/16/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2004. Trial Brief due by 3/15/2004. Trial Ready Date 4/2004. (Pike, C.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003, Terminated: 11/14/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order to 2/15/04 for Discovery, to 2/15/04 for Dispositive Motions & to 4/1/04 for Joint Trial Memo by MGE UPS Sys, Inc. (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            Offer of Judgment by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (for Enersys Inc) filed under seal (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              Offer of Judgment by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (for Data Support Assoc) filed under seal (Ferguson, L.) Modified on 10/07/2003
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & JURY DEMAND by Enersys Inc to third party complaint: amends [55-1] third-party answer by Enersys Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by MGE UPS Sys, Inc against Enersys Inc : amends [29-1] third-party complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [56-1] motion to Amend [29-1] third-party complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MGE UPS Sys, Inc to Amend [29-1] third-party complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Brief Due 9/1/03 ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Enersys Inc to third party complaint: amends [50-1] third-party answer by Enersys Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                          ENDORSEMENT granting [53-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer & Affrmative Defenses to Third Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Patrick J. McHugh (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Enersys Inc for Leave to File Amended Answer & Affrmative Defenses to Third Party Complaint (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [52-1] motion for Leave to File Substituted Amended Motion, granting [52-2] motion to Withdraw [49-1] motion for Leave to File Answer & Amended Affirmative Defenses to Third-Party Complaint by Enersys Inc ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Enersys Inc for Leave to File Substituted Amended Motion , to Withdraw [49-1] motion for Leave to File Answer & Amended Affirmative Defenses to Third-Party Complaint by Enersys Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for jury trial by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER & AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Enersys Inc to amended third-party complaint: [29-1] third-party complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [49-1] motion for Leave to File Answer & Amended Affirmative Defenses to Third-Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Enersys Inc for Leave to File Answer & Amended Affirmative Defenses to Third-Party Complaint (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 1/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            Offer of Judgment (FILED UNDER SEAL] by Data Support Assoc, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Settlement Conference held ( TPS) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle. (TPS) (Sunbury, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Enersys Inc -- Craig A. Raabe (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Settlement Conference on 6/2/03 at 10:00 am ( signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of referral to Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith for Settlement conference (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Jason S. Weathers (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, resetting Discovery deadline to 11/14/03 , resetting Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/03 , setting Filing of Joint Trial Memorandum due by 12/29/03 This case shall be trial ready 01/04 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [39-1] motion to Extend Time to 4/7/03 to respond to Discovery requests ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Telephone Status Conference held ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER & Affirmative Defenses by Enersys Inc to [29-1] third-party complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Enersys Inc to Extend Time to 4/7/03 to respond to Discovery requests (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Enersys Inc -- Elizabeth R. Leong (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Daniel B. Huyett (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                        Telephone Status Conference set for 4:30 3/7/03 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSEMENT granting [35-1] motion for Daniel B. Huyett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER & Affirmative Defenses by Data Support Assoc to [32-2] counter claim by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Enersys Inc for Daniel B. Huyett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to 3/6/03 to respond to third party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Enersys Inc -- Bradford S. Babbitt (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Enersys Inc to Extend Time to 3/6/03 to respond to third party Complaint (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED ANSWER, SEPARATE, AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by MGE UPS Sys, Inc against Data Support Assoc (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Data Support Assoc amending [1-1] complaint (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/15/03 as to Enersys Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [25-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 1/23/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint by Data Support Assoc, Inc.Responses due by 2/4/2003 (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by MGE UPS Sys, Inc against Enersys Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Enersys Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [28-1] motion for Robert E. Palmer and Alan J. Gordee to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Robert E. Palmer, Alan J. Gordee for MGE UPS Sys, Inc, ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MGE UPS Sys, Inc for Robert E. Palmer & Alan J. Gordee to Withdraw as Attorney (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Mario R. Borelli (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002, Terminated: 1/10/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MGE UPS Sys, Inc for Leave to File Third Party Complaint (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Data Support Assoc to Amend [1-1] complaint (Brief Due 1/13/03 ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [24-1] motion for Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Attorney Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker for Data Support Assoc ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Data Support Assoc for Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker to Withdraw as Attorney (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc : amends [18-1] answer, separate and additional defenses, and AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Data Support Assoc : amending [18-2] counter claim (part 2 of 2) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by MGE UPS Sys, Inc : amends [18-1] answer, separate and additional defenses, and AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS against Data Support Assoc : amending [18-2] counterclaims (part 1 of 2) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to 12/18/02 to respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Production ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSEMENT granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to 12/28/02 to respond to counterclaims ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving [17-1] report, resetting Discovery deadline to 5/15/03 , resetting Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/03 , setting Filing of Joint Trial Memorandum due by 7/15/03 This case shall be trial ready 08/03 (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002, Terminated: 11/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Data Support Assoc to Extend Time to 12/18/02 to respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002, Terminated: 11/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Data Support Assoc to Extend Time to 12/28/02 to respond to counterclaims (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure Statement by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by MGE UPS Sys, Inc against Data Support Assoc (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Alan J. Gordee (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Robert E. Palmer (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [11-1] motion for Robert E. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion for Alan J. Gordee to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Alan J. Gordee by MGE UPS Sys, Inc Re [13-1] motion for Alan J. Gordee to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002, Terminated: 9/25/2002 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MGE UPS Sys, Inc for Alan J. Gordee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Robert E. Palmer by MGE UPS Sys, Inc Re [11-1] motion for Robert E. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002, Terminated: 9/25/2002 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MGE UPS Sys, Inc for Robert E. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ferguson, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to 10/16/02 to answer the Complaint, 26(f) Report of Conference Due 10/16/02 , setting Dismissal due by 10/16/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MGE UPS Sys, Inc to Extend Time to 10/16/02 to answer the Complaint (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- Michael P. Shea (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for MGE UPS Sys, Inc -- David J. Elliott (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed on 08/21/02 as to MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Data Support Assoc -- Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Data Support Assoc -- Gary Scott Klein (Beverly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement by Data Support Assoc (Beverly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER parties to commence discovery immediately ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Beverly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 2/14/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 3/16/03 Amended Pleadings due 10/15/02 Motions to Dismiss due 11/15/02 (Beverly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # B004565 (Beverly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for MGE UPS Sys, Inc (Beverly, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?