Health Fund, et al v. Mitchell & Bailey, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-01148-PCD
District Judge Peter C. Dorsey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Brockett +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 tbrockett@cheverielaw.com
No Logo Health Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Brockett +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 tbrockett@cheverielaw.com
No Logo Industry Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Brockett +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 tbrockett@cheverielaw.com
No Logo Local 777, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Brockett +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 tbrockett@cheverielaw.com
No Logo Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Brockett +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 tbrockett@cheverielaw.com
No Logo Training Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Brockett +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 tbrockett@cheverielaw.com
v.
No Logo Gregory Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Mitchell & Bailey, Inc, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 7/3/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 185 Employee Pension Plan
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Hartford
Terminated 12/16/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Default -Judgment
DEFAULT JUDGMENT ordered and adjudged against Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell ( signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (Warner, R.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Order
      ENDORSEMENT granting [7-1] motion for Default Judgment against Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell jointly and severally ( signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Warner, R.)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
        MOTION by Health Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund, Training Fund, Industry Fund, Pension Fund, Local 777 for Default Judgment against Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell (Brief Due 12/4/02 ) (Warner, R.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Order
          ENDORSEMENT granting [6-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell Default entered as to Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell Filing of Motion for Default Judgment by 11/14/02 for Mitchell & Bailey, for Gregory Mitchell . ( Signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Motion for Default Entry 55(a)
            MOTION by Health Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund, Training Fund, Industry Fund, Pension Fund, Local 777 for Entry of Default as to Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell (Brief Due 10/31/02 ) (Warner, R.)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Summons Returned Executed
              SUMMONS Returned Executed on 7/13/02 and 7/15/02 as to Mitchell & Bailey and Gregory Bailey (Falcone, K.) Modified on 07/24/2002
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Order
                Supplemental Order re: motion filing procedures (Ferguson, L.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Scheduling Order
                  ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 1/2/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 2/1/03 Amended Pleadings due 09/03/02 Motions to Dismiss due 10/03/02 (Ferguson, L.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H006704 (Ferguson, L.)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Summons Issued
                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for Mitchell & Bailey, Gregory Mitchell (Ferguson, L.)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 47 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?