Connecticut Resource v. Lay, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-02107-WWE
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis R. Pepe +1 860 522 5175 +1 860 522 2796 lpepe@pepehazard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Blumenthal +1 860 566 2026 Patricia.Sullivan@po.state.ct.us
Space Theodore M. Doolittle +1 860 808 5355 + 860 808 5391 ted.doolittle@po.state.ct.us
v.
No Logo Andrew S. Fastow, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ben F. Glisan, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin S. Neuhausen, Defendant
No Logo Bruce G. Willison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Charles A. LeMaistre, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Charles E. Walker, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.
No Logo Danny D. Rudloff, Defendant
No Logo David B. Duncan, Defendant
No Logo David Stephen Goddard, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Debra A. Cash, Defendant
No Logo Fitch, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan A Davis +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999 edavis@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Wolf, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stewart I. Edelstein +1 203 368 0211 sedelstein@cohenandwolf.com
Space Ari J. Hoffman +1 203 368 0211 +1 203 394 9901 ahoffman@cohenandwolf.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Gary B. Goolsby, Defendant
No Logo Gregory W. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Herbert S. Winokur, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo James V. Derrick, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rome, McGuigan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn E. Coe +1 860 549 1000 + 860 724 3921 gcoe@rms-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brenda M. Hamilton +1 860 275 6400 bhamilton@thelen.com
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William J. Melley III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Melley, III +1 860 247 9933 +1 860 247 9944 wjmelley@wjmelley.com
No Logo Jeffrey McMahon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Jerome J. Meyer, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Joe H. Foy, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo John A. Urquhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Conway +1 203 265 2035 jconway@lflaw.com
No Logo John E. Sorrells, Defendant
No Logo JOHN E. STEWART, Defendant
No Logo John H. Duncan, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo John Mendolsohn, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Joseph F. Beradino, Defendant
No Logo Joseph W. Sutton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason C. Norwood +1 713 654 7760
Space Edward John O'Neill +1 713 654 7607

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Garrett S. Flynn, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett S. Flynn +1 860 676 3148 +1 860 674 0085 gsf@flynn-law.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan Chase & Co"
No Logo Ken L. Harrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gersten & Clifford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eliot B. Gersten +1 860 527 7044 +1 860 527 4968 egersten@gcrlaw.net
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rome, McGuigan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn E. Coe +1 860 549 1000 + 860 724 3921 gcoe@rms-law.com
Kirkland & Ellis LLP Kirkland & Ellis LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirkland & Ellis"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony M. Fitzgerald +1 203 777 5501 +1 203 784 3199 afitzgerald@carmodylaw.com
Space David S. Hardy +1 203 784 3119 +1 203 784 3199 dhardy@carmodylaw.com
No Logo Lawrence Greg Whalley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co"
No Logo Michael C. Odom, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Michael M. Lowther, Defendant
No Logo Moody's Corp, Defendant
No Logo Norman P. Blake, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helen Currie Foster +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5881 hfoster@gdhm.com
Space John J. McKetta, III +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5816 mmcketta@gdhm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Garrett S. Flynn, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett S. Flynn +1 860 676 3148 +1 860 674 0085 gsf@flynn-law.com
No Logo Richard A. Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Richard B. Buy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Robert K. Jaedicke, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Roger D. Willard, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C. Chan, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo Standard & Poor's Rating Svc, Defendant
No Logo Vinson & Elkins LLP, Defendant
No Logo Wendy L. Gramm, Defendant

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

No Logo William E. Swanson, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 11/27/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Hartford
Terminated 4/29/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 3:02-cv-02095[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
Endorsement ORDER granting [57] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brenda M. Hamilton terminated . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/17/2004. (Falcone, K.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004, Terminated: 8/18/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
    MOTION for Brenda M. Hamilton to Withdraw as Attorney by Kenneth L. Lay. (Falcone, K.)
      LREF
      Blank 56 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
      Acknowledgement of Receipt from SD of Texas of case (Kolesnikoff, D.)
        LREF
        Blank 55 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order
        MDL TRANSFER ORDER - case transferred to the Southern District of Texas (signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chairman ) (Sbalbi, B.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated Case
          Case closed (Sbalbi, B.)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated Case
            Interdistrict transfer to District of Texas. Original file, certified copies of docket and Order sent 4/30/03 (Sbalbi, B.)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order
              ENDORSEMENT granting [54-1] motion to Extend Time to answer (no date specified) ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                LREF
                Blank 54 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/21/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION by Kenneth L. Lay to Extend Time to answer (no date specified) (Sbalbi, B.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [54-1] motion for Order approving stipulation re pretrial deadlines ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 53 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Stipulation
                    STIPULATION regarding pretrial deadlines by Connecticut Resource, Jeffrey K. Skilling (Sbalbi, B.)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Order
                      ENDORSEMENT approving [53-1] stipulation ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Order
                        ENDORSEMENT granting [52-1] motion for Leave to File stipulation re deadlines ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 52 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                          MOTION by Jeffrey K. Skilling for Leave to File stipulation re deadlines (Sbalbi, B.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 51 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche -- John J. McKetta, III (Corriette, M.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 50 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche -- Helen Currie Foster (Corriette, M.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                ENDORSEMENT granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time 30 days to respond to complaint ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Cody, C.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/06/03 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Cody, C.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Cody, C.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/06/03 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Cody, C.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Cody, C.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Order
                                          ENDORSEMENT [48-1] motion for Evan A. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 49 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Affidavit
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Evan A. Davis by Fitch Inc Re [48-1] motion for Evan A. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fitch Inc (Sbalbi, B.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 48 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                              MOTION by Fitch Inc for Evan A. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 47 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ken L. Harrison -- Eliot B. Gersten (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                  MOTION by Ken L. Harrison to Extend Time 30 days to respond to complaint (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Set/Clear Flags
                                                    Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 3:02cv2095 (Candee, D.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order
                                                      ENDORSEMENT [45-1] motion to Extend Time until 1/20/03 to respond to complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Fazekas, J.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        MOTION by Bruce G. Willison to Extend Time until 1/20/03 to respond to complaint (Fazekas, J.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Bruce G. Willison -- Steven M. Barry (Fazekas, J.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order
                                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [41-1] motion to Consolidate Case with docket number(s): 3:02cv2095 (signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton) (Candee, D.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              MOTION by Jeffrey K. Skilling to Extend Time to 1/29/03 to respond to complaint (Corriette, M.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Jeffrey K. Skilling -- William J. Melley III (Corriette, M.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Order
                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to 1/21/03 to answer ( signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Order
                                                                    ENDORSEMENT [43-1] motion to Extend Time to 1/29/03 to respond to complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Corriette, M.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 12/20/2002 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                      MOTION by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche to Consolidate Case with docket number(s): 3:02cv2095 (Brief Due 1/8/03 ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Connecticut Resource in support of [39-1] motion to Remand (Original docketed in lead case 3:02cv2095 Doc #122) (Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 01/28/2003
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 12/23/2002 Motion to Remand
                                                                          MOTION by Connecticut Resource to Remand (Brief Due 1/7/03 ) (Original docketed in lead case 3:02cv2095 Doc #121) (Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 01/28/2003
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Connecticut Resource -- Theodore M. Doolittle (Sbalbi, B.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Connecticut Resource in support of [36-1] motion to Stay Case (Original docketed in lead case 3:02cv2095 Doc #120) (Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 01/28/2003
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Motion to Stay
                                                                                MOTION by Connecticut Resource to Stay Case (Brief Due 1/6/03) (Original docketed in lead case 3:02cv2095 Doc #119)(Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 01/28/2003
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  MOTION by Fitch Inc to Extend Time to 1/21/03 to answer (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Fitch Inc -- Stewart I. Edelstein (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Fitch Inc -- Ari J. Hoffman (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                        MOTION by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche for John J. McKetta, III & Helen Currie Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                          MOTION by Joseph W. Sutton for Edward John O'Neill, Jr. & Jason C. Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Order
                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT [32-1] motion for John J. McKetta, III & Helen Currie Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Order
                                                                                              ENDORSEMENT [31-1] motion for Edward John O'Neill, Jr. & Jason C. Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Order
                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT [30-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Order
                                                                                                  ENDORSEMENT [29-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Order
                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT [28-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Order
                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT [27-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                        MOTION by Richard A. Causey to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          MOTION by Lawrence Greg Whalley to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                            MOTION by Richard B. Buy to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                              MOTION by Jeffrey McMahon to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Richard A. Causey, Richard B. Buy, Jeffrey McMahon, Lawrence Greg Whalley -- Michael Joseph Walsh (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Richard A. Causey, Richard B. Buy, Jeffrey McMahon, Lawrence Greg Whalley -- Michael Joseph Walsh (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) to Judge Warren W. Eginton (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Joseph W. Sutton to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche to Extend Time until 01/10/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Joseph W. Sutton -- Garrett S. Flynn (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kenneth L. Lay -- Glenn E. Coe (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kenneth L. Lay -- Brenda M. Hamilton (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT [22-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/09/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSEMENT [12-1] motion to Extend Time until 01/03/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Ken L. Harrison, Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, John Mendolsohn, John A. Urquhart, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Joe H. Foy, Bruce G. Willison, Fitch Inc to Extend Time until 01/06/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by John A. Urquhart to Extend Time until 01/09/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, John Mendolsohn, Jerome J. Meyer, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Joe H. Foy, Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Charles A. LeMaistre -- Michael G. Durham (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, John Mendolsohn, Jerome J. Meyer, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Joe H. Foy, Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Charles A. LeMaistre -- Patrick M. Noonan (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, John Mendolsohn, Jerome J. Meyer, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Joe H. Foy, Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Charles A. LeMaistre -- Steven M. Barry (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche -- Garrett S. Flynn (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for John A. Urquhart -- John F. Conway (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by James V. Derrick Jr. to Extend Time until 01/06/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Kenneth L. Lay to Extend Time until 01/03/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for James V. Derrick Jr. -- Glenn E. Coe (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for James V. Derrick Jr. -- Brenda M. Hamilton (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of Standing Order for Removed Cases and Order on Pretrial Deadlines and re disclosure statement by Kirkland & Ellis (Depino, F.)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            COMPLIANCE by Kirkland & Ellis with Standing Order (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kirkland & Ellis -- Anthony M. Fitzgerald (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kirkland & Ellis -- David S. Hardy (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of No Pending Motions by Kirkland & Ellis (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 5/29/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 6/28/03 Amended Pleadings due 01/27/03 Motions to Dismiss due 02/27/03 (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kirkland & Ellis from Judicial District of Hartford FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # N008077 (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?