McKinnon v. Lahda, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00017-JCH
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James McKinnon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Burgos, Defendant
No Logo DILWORTH, &., Defendant
Officially listed as "Dilworth"
No Logo John Lahda, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $15000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Fairfield
Terminated 8/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PRISONER
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Filing Fee Received
PRISCS-Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number B016387 (PAID IN FULL) (Payton, R.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Order on Motion to Reopen CaseCourt Filing
    PRISCS - RULING and ORDER denying [20] Motion to Reopen Case, denying [21] Motion to Reopen Case . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/5/04. (Jaiman, R.)
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Motion to Reopen Case
      PRISCS - MOTION to Reopen Case (Proposed Amended Complaint in Paper Form Only) by James McKinnon.Responses due by 9/30/2004 (Corriette, M.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004, Terminated: 10/6/2004 Motion to Reopen Case
        PRISCS - MOTION to Reopen Case by James McKinnon.Responses due by 7/13/2004 (Corriette, M.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
          RULING and ORDER denying [17] Motion for Reconsideration, denying [18] Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/8/03. (Jaiman, R.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
            MOTION to Respond to [16] Order on Motion for Reconsideration and MOTION to Amend [2] Complaint by James McKinnon.Responses due by 12/17/2003 (Corriette, M.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 12/10/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
              MOTION for Reconsideration re [16] Order on Motion for Reconsideration by James McKinnon.Responses due by 12/12/2003 (Corriette, M.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                RULING and ORDER granting [15] Motion for Reconsideration. After careful consideration, however, the relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/03. (Jaiman, R.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003, Terminated: 10/23/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                  MOTION by James McKinnon for Reconsideration of [13-1] order dated 8/22/03 re: (Brief Due 9/30/03) (Corriette, M.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Order on Motion for Judgment
                    JUDGMENT for John Lahda, Dilworth, Burgos against James McKinnon ( signed by Clerk ) (Larsen, M.)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Terminated Case
                      Case closed (Larsen, M.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Order FrivolousCourt Filing
                        RULING and ORDER dismissing the complaint ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Jaiman, R.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Description not available
                          MOTION by James McKinnon to Transfer Case 3:02cv2068(CFD), 3:02cv2306(WWE), 3:03CV71(JBA), 3:03CV72(WWE), 3:03CV944(RNC) to Janet C. Hall (Corriette, M.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003, Terminated: 8/26/2003 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                            MOTION by James McKinnon for Appointment of Counsel (Corriette, M.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MOTION by James McKinnon not to be held by court in same standards as an attorney (Brief Due 6/5/03 ) (Jaiman, R.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of being hindered by way of grievance that was rejected 11/29/03 by James McKinnon (Corriette, M.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Chief Judge Robert N. Chatigny ) to Judge Janet C. Hall (Sanders, C.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    MOTION by James McKinnon for copies of amended complaint (Brief Due 4/11/03) (Corriette, M.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Order
                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [6-1] amended motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Corriette, M.) Modified on 03/03/2003
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                        AMENDED MOTION by James McKinnon to Proceed in Forma Pauperis referring to: [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by James McKinnon (Larsen, M.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                          COMPLIANCE With Insufficiency re [5-1] notice. Current ledger sheet. (Larsen, M.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Order re: InsufficiencyCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE to petitioner re: papers returned for insufficient IFP. Case to be dismissed by 3/5/03 if insufficiency not corrected ( by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Jaiman, R.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Prisoner Authorization Form
                                              Prisoner Authorization Form by James McKinnon (Larsen, M.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Order re: InsufficiencyCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE to petitioner re: papers returned for insufficient IFP, PAF. Case to be dismissed by 2/22/03 if insufficiency not corrected ( by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Jaiman, R.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT (Sanders, C.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                    MOTION by James McKinnon to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Sanders, C.)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?