Ladamus, et al v. Social Security Adm
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00028-SRU
District Judge Stefan R. Underhill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert G. Ladamus, Plaintiff
v.
Social Security Administration Social Security Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann M. Nevins +1 203 696 3000 +1 203 579 5575 ann.nevins@usdoj.gov
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 863 - D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W. (US Defendant)
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County New Haven
Terminated 11/13/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Affidavit of Service
USM 285 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General, Social Security Administration on 1/6/03. (Cody, C.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER re [9] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Social Security Administration, Robert G. Ladamus. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/13/03. (Warren, C.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ENDORSEMENT ORDER, GRANTING re [9] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Social Security Administration, Robert G. Ladamus. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/17/03. (Warren, C.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
        STIPULATION of Dismissal of case by Robert G. Ladamus, Social Security Administration. (Warren, C.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order
          ENDORSEMENT granting [8-1] motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Sanders, C.)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003, Terminated: 8/29/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION by Social Security Adm to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Warren, C.)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Transcript of Administrative Proceedings by Social Security Adm (Warren, C.)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge William I. Garfinkel ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Warren, C.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [5-1] motion for Scheduling Order, reset Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/03 ( signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill ) (Warren, C.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Motion for Order
                    MOTION by Social Security Adm for Scheduling Order (Warren, C.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Adm (Warren, C.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                        MARSHAL'S return of service on summons & complaint executed as to Social Security Adm on 2/26/03 (Fazekas, J.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Social Security Adm -- Ann M. Nevins (Simpson, T.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 ~Notice (other)
                            US Marshal 285 Forms and Instructions to US Marshal for service (D'Andrea, S.)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              CASE Assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Lopez, B.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Summons Issued
                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Social Security Adm; given to US Marshal for 60 day service (D'Andrea, S.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                  Misc. Case # 3:03mc1 (WIG) transferred to civil docket. Case assigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill (D'Andrea, S.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Order
                                    ENDORSEMENT Granting [1-1] Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Mag. Judge William I. Garfinkel) (D'Andrea, S.) Modified on 01/06/2003
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                      MOTION by Robert G. Ladamus to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (D'Andrea, S.)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?