Reiske v. Armstrong, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00051-PCD
District Judge Peter C. Dorsey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald E. Reiske, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo John R. Armstrong, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County New London
Terminated 10/28/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PRISONER
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/27/03. (Larsen, M.)
    LREF
    Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    RULING and ORDER DISMISSING all claims against Connecticut DOC, all claims against Armstrong, individual capacity, and all claims for damages against Armstrong, official capacity. Only remaining claim is claim for injunctive relief against Armstrong, official capacity. Reiske may file amended complaint asserting damages claims provided he can identify correctional officials responsible for his designation as SRG member. Any amended complaint to be filed within 30 days. Reiske to effect service on Armstrong, official capacity, c/o Attorney General, and file return of service within 130 days. Amended Complaint to be filed by 3/27/03 ( signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) 6 Page(s) (Larsen, M.)
      LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Complaint
      COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # B005406 (Candee, D.)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 93 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?