McKinnon v. Cuda, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00072-WWE
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James McKinnon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Helen Dorsey, Defendant
No Logo Joan Cuda, Defendant
No Logo Joan Dobson, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $25000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Fairfield
Terminated 11/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PRISONER
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) dated 8/17/05 DISMISSED as to [19] Notice of Appeal filed by James McKinnon. Any Motions pending prior to the entry of this order of dismissal are deemed MOOT. Signed Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk by Connie Mazariego, Deputy Clerk. (Simpson, T.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [12] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Reassign Case, by James McKinnon. Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Simpson, T.)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
      PRISCS RULING denying [17] Motion for Reconsideration re [13] Judgment, construed as a motion to reopen judgment. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/15/05. (Larsen, M.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
        MOTION for Reconsideration re [13] Judgment by James McKinnon.Responses due by 4/7/2004 (Corriette, M.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
          RULING denying [14] Motion for Reconsideration, denying [15] Motion to Amend . Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 1/29/04. (Larsen, M.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
            MOTION to Amend [8] Amended Complaint by James McKinnon.Responses due by 1/6/2004 (Corriette, M.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
              MOTION for Reconsideration re [12] RULING and ORDER on Motions for copy of complaint, Order on Motion to Reassign Case, by James McKinnon.Responses due by 1/6/2004 (Corriette, M.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Judgment*
                JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk on 11/26/03. (Larsen, M.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                  RULIN and ORDER, the amended complaint is DISMISSED, denying [7] Motion for copy of complaint, denying [9] Motion for copy of complaint, denying [10] Motion for copy of complaint, denying [11]Motion to Reassign Case to Judge Hall. . Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/18/03. (Jaiman, R.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                    MOTION by James McKinnon to Transfer Case to Judge Janet C. Hall (Corriette, M.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003, Terminated: 11/18/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION by James McKinnon for copies of complaint (Brief Due 6/18/03) (Corriette, M.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003, Terminated: 11/18/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        MOTION by James McKinnon for copy of complaint (Brief Due 5/7/03) (Corriette, M.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Amended Complaint
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by James McKinnon amending [2-1] complaint (Corriette, M.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION by James McKinnon for copies of amended complaint (Brief Due 4/11/03) (Corriette, M.)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Order
                              ENDORSEMENT granting [6-1] amended motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Corriette, M.) Modified on 04/15/2003
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003, Terminated: 3/12/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                AMENDED MOTION by James McKinnon to Proceed in Forma Pauperis referring to: [5-1] amended motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by James McKinnon (Larsen, M.) Modified on 03/03/2003
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                  COMPLIANCE With Insufficiency re [3-1] notice. Ledger sheet, Prisoner Authorization Form. (Larsen, M.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                    AMENDED MOTION by James McKinnon to Proceed in Forma Pauperis referring to: [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by James McKinnon (Larsen, M.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Prisoner Authorization Form
                                      Prisoner Authorization Form by James McKinnon (Larsen, M.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Order re: InsufficiencyCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE to petitioner re: papers returned for insufficient IFP, PAF. Case to be dismissed by 3/12/03 if insufficiency not corrected ( by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Jaiman, R.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT (D'Andrea, S.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                            MOTION by James McKinnon to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (D'Andrea, S.)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?