Connecticut v. Murtha Cullina, LLP, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00079-JBA
District Judge Janet Bond Arterton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Harvey Goldstein +1 860 522 5175 rgoldstein@pepehazard.com
Space Louis R. Pepe +1 860 522 5175 +1 860 522 2796 lpepe@pepehazard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Blumenthal +1 860 566 2026 Patricia.Sullivan@po.state.ct.us
v.
No Logo Andrew S. Fastow, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Anderson Llp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eliot Lauer +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 elauer@curtis.com
Space Benard Vincent Preziosi, Jr +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bpreziosi@cm-p.com
Space Turner Pearce Smith +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 tsmith@cm-p.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Ben F. Glisan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Horowitz & Etlinger LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew M. Horowitz +1 860 724 6667 +1 860 293 1979 mhorowitz@wolfhorowitz.com
No Logo Benjamin S. Neuhausen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Bruce G. Willison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Charles A. LeMaistre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Charles E. Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Connecticut Light & Power Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander G. Filotto +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 agfilotto@dbh.com
Space John B. Nolan +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jbnolan@DayPitney.com
No Logo Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority, Defendant
No Logo Danny D. Rudloff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo David B. Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo David Stephen Goddard, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Debra A. Cash, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Gary B. Goolsby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Gregory W. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Hawkins, Delafield & Wood, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fogarty, Cohen, Selby & Nemiroff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Fogarty +1 203 629 7351 +1 203 629 7319 jfogarty@fcsn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tiffany & Bosco, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Bourque +1 212 455 2000 + 214 455 2502 rbourque@stblaw.com
No Logo Herbert S. Winokur, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo James V. Derrick, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William J. Melley III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Melley, III +1 860 247 9933 +1 860 247 9944 wjmelley@wjmelley.com
No Logo Jeffrey McMahon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Jerome J. Meyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Joe H. Foy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo John A. Urquhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Conway +1 203 265 2035 jconway@lflaw.com
No Logo John E. Sorrells, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo JOHN E. STEWART, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo John H. Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Joseph F. Berardino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Joseph W. Sutton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason C. Norwood +1 713 654 7760
Space Edward John O'Neill +1 713 654 7607

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Garrett S. Flynn, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett S. Flynn +1 860 676 3148 +1 860 674 0085 gsf@flynn-law.com
No Logo Ken L. Harrison, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rome, McGuigan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn E. Coe +1 860 549 1000 + 860 724 3921 gcoe@rms-law.com
No Logo Lawrence Gregory Whalley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Leboeuf, Lamb, Greene & Macrae, LLP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan I. Blackman +1 212 225 2490 jblackman@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacobs & Dow, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Belt +1 203 772 3100 +1 203 772 1691 dbelt@jacobslaw.com
No Logo Michael C. Odom, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Kopper, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Michael M. Lowther, Defendant
No Logo Murtha Cullina LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Andrew Diemand +1 860 297 3738 +1 860 525 9380 tdiemand@wiggin.com
Space William H. Prout, Jr. +1 203 498 4400 +1 203 782 2889 wprout@wiggin.com
No Logo Norman P. Blake, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Northeast Utilities, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander G. Filotto +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 agfilotto@dbh.com
Space John B. Nolan +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jbnolan@DayPitney.com
No Logo Northeast Utilities Service Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander G. Filotto +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 agfilotto@dbh.com
Space John B. Nolan +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jbnolan@DayPitney.com
No Logo Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Stephen J. Curley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen James Curley +1 203 327 1317 +1 203 276 8768 scurley@cur-law.com
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helen Currie Foster +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5881 hfoster@gdhm.com
Space John J. McKetta, III +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5816 mmcketta@gdhm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Garrett S. Flynn, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett S. Flynn +1 860 676 3148 +1 860 674 0085 gsf@flynn-law.com
No Logo Richard B. Buy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Richard Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mcgeelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Robert K. Jaedicke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Roger D. Willard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Bagnell +1 203 255 4434 +1 203 255 4454 bagnell@optonline.com
No Logo Ronnie C. Chan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Wendy L. Gramm, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Barry +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 sbarry@ddnctlaw.com
Space Michael G. Durham +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 mdurham@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo William E. Swanson, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/10/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Hartford
Terminated 5/1/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (128) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting [97] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brenda M. Hamilton terminated . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/23/04. (Malone, P.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Order of TransferCourt Filing
    ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Gerard L. Goettel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Janet Bond Arterton for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/04. (Inferrera, L.) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2004 (Inferrera, L.).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Docket Annotation
      DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re [98] Order of Transfer ; Corrected pdf to reflect initials of JBA (Inferrera, L.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004, Terminated: 8/24/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        MOTION for Brenda M. Hamilton to Withdraw as Attorney by Kenneth L. Lay. (Inferrera, L.)
          LREF
          Blank 96 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
          Acknowledgement of Receipt from USDC-Southern District of Texas of 5/9/03 (Villano, P.)
            LREF
            Blank 95 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Remark
            TRANSFER LETTER from the MDL panel (Depino, F.)
              LREF
              Blank 94 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Order
              CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Case transferred to the Southern District of Texas at Houston ( signed by Michael Milby, Clerk ) (Depino, F.)
                LREF
                Blank 93 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Order
                CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Case transferred to the Southern District of Texas (signed by Michael N. Milby, Clerk) (Depino, F.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Terminated Case
                  Case closed (Depino, F.)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Terminated Case
                    Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas. Original file, certified copies of docket and Order sent 5/2/03 (Depino, F.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 92 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Request to Take Judicial Notice by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. (Villano, P.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 91 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kenneth L. Lay -- Brenda M. Hamilton (Falcone, K.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 90 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kenneth L. Lay -- Glenn E. Coe (Falcone, K.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Order
                            ENDORSEMENT [89-1] motion for Samuel Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Depino, F.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 89 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                              MOTION by Arthur Anderson LLP for Samuel Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Depino, F.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order
                                ENDORSEMENT granting [76-1] motion to Extend Time for filing motions to dimiss for thirty days after filing the motion to remand ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order
                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [81-1] motion to Extend Time to revise pretrial deadlines until ruling on motion to remand ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.) Modified on 03/31/2003
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 88 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Arthur Anderson LLP -- Turner P. Smith (Sherman, M.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 87 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Arthur Anderson LLP -- Eliot Lauer (Sherman, M.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 86 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Response
                                        Response by Hawkins, Delafield to [78-1] motion for Reconsideration of [0-0] order dated 2/20/03 re: [30-1] motion to Stay Case by Connecticut (Warner, R.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 85 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          OBJECTIONS by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to [72-1] motion to Remand by Connecticut (Depino, F.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 84 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                            MOTION by Arthur Andersen for Benard V. Preziosi Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sherman, M.) Modified on 03/27/2003
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 83 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Response
                                              Response by Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to [78-1] motion for Reconsideration of order dated 2/20/03 re: [30-1] motion to Stay Case by Connecticut (Depino, F.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Order
                                                ENDORSEMENT re: [84-1] motion for Benard V. Preziosi Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ---- ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Sherman, M.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Order
                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time of thirty days after a ruling on the remand motion to file answers to the complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Response to Motion
                                                    RESPONSE by Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to [78-1] motion for Reconsideration of [0-0] order dated 2/20/03 re: [30-1] motion to Stay Case by Connecticut (Villano, P.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      MOTION by John A. Urquhart to Extend Time to revise pretrial deadlines until ruling on motion to remand (Sherman, M.) Modified on 03/31/2003
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 3/14/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                        MOTION by Arthur Anderson LLP for Eliot Lauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sherman, M.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 3/14/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                          MOTION by Arthur Anderson LLP for Turner P. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sherman, M.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Order
                                                            ENDORSEMENT re: [80-1] motion for Eliot Lauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Sherman, M.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Order
                                                              ENDORSEMENT re: [79-1] motion for Turner P. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Sherman, M.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003, Terminated: 5/1/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                MOTION by Connecticut for Reconsideration of [0-0] order dated 2/20/03 re: [30-1] motion to Stay Case (Brief Due 4/2/03 ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Order
                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time for 30 days to answer complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ben F. Glisan -- Matthew M. Horowitz (Sherman, M.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      MOTION by Ben F. Glisan to Extend Time for filing motions to dimiss for thirty days after filing the motion to remand (Sherman, M.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        MOTION by Jeffrey K. Skilling to Extend Time of thirty days after a ruling on the remand motion to file answers to the complaint (Sherman, M.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION by Richard Causey, Richard B. Buy, Jeffrey McMahon, Lawrence Gregory Whalley to Extend Time for 30 days to answer complaint (Villano, P.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Connecticut in support of [72-1] motion to Remand, [72-2] motion Abstain exercising jurisdiction (Villano, P.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Motion to Remand
                                                                              MOTION by Connecticut to Remand , and/or Abstain exercising jurisdiction (Brief Due 3/24/03 ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Order
                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [69-1] motion to Extend Time to answer apportionment complaint to 30 days after the court rules on motion to remand ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Joseph W. Sutton -- Edward John O'Neill, Jr. (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Joseph W. Sutton -- Jason C. Norwood (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Order
                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [65-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motions to dismiss to 30 days after ruling on remand motion ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Brown, S.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        MOTION by Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira to Extend Time to answer apportionment complaint to 30 days after the court rules on motion to remand (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira -- Stephen James Curley (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff -- Sharon Katz (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              OBJECTIONS by Connecticut to [30-1] motion to Stay Case by Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Frank Savage (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003, Terminated: 2/27/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                MOTION by Hawkins, Delafield to Extend Time to respond to the motions to dismiss of the apportionment defendants until 30 days after a ruling on the remand motion (Depino, F.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Order
                                                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [30-1] motion to Stay Case Case Stayed 2/20/03 ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Depino, F.)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche in support of [62-1] motion to Dismiss of Apportionment (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Joseph W. Sutton in support of [61-1] motion to Dismiss of Apportionment (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003, Terminated: 5/1/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche to Dismiss of Apportionment (Brief Due 3/11/03 ) (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003, Terminated: 5/1/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                          MOTION by Joseph W. Sutton to Dismiss of Apportionment (Brief Due 3/11/03 ) (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Order
                                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT re: [36-1] motion for Sharon Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Sherman, M.) Modified on 02/14/2003
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/13/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                              STIPULATION regarding Pretrial Deadlines by Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 5/1/2003 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                MOTION by Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff to Join in Motion to Consolidate (Brief Due 3/6/03 ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff -- Jeffrey S. Bagnell (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Order
                                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT approving [60-1] stipulation ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Order
                                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [48-1] motion to Approve Stipulation Regarding Pretrial Deadlines ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northeast Utilities (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northeast Utilities (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connecticut Light (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Connecticut in opposition to [15-1] motion to Consolidate Case with docket number(s):3:02CV2095WWE by Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Frank Savage (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Hawkins, Delafield to [15-1] motion to Consolidate Case with docket number(s):3:02CV2095WWE by Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Frank Savage (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time up to 30 days after ruling on Motion to Remand ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [4-1] motion to Stay adjudication of any motions to transfer ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [53-1] motion for Edward John O'Neill, Jr and Jason C. Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [52-1] motion for John J. McKetta, III, Helen Currie Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.) Modified on 02/13/2003
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Joseph W. Sutton for Edward John O'Neill, Jr and Jason C. Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Warner, R.)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche for John J. McKetta, III, Helen Currie Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Warner, R.) Modified on 03/26/2003
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time until 03/20/03 to file Motion to Remand matter back to State Court ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to 2/17/03 to answer complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.) Modified on 03/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to 2/17/03 to answer complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to 2/17/03 to answer complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time until 3/4/03 to respond the apportionment complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Jeffrey K. Skilling -- William J. Melley III (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for John A. Urquhart -- John F. Conway (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003, Terminated: 2/13/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Hawkins, Delafield, Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff to Approve Stipulation Regarding Pretrial Deadlines (Brief Due 2/28/03 ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leboeuf, Lamb (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Murtha Cullina, LLP to [15-1] motion to Consolidate Case with docket number(s):3:02CV2095WWE by Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Frank Savage (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Leboeuf, Lamb in opposition to [15-1] motion to Consolidate Case with docket number(s):3:02CV2095WWE by Herbert S. Winokur Jr., Frank Savage (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                    Certified Return Receipt Card UNEXECUTED as to John H. Duncan, Michael L. Bennett (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                      Certified Return Receipt Card UNEXECUTED as to Michael C. Odom (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                        Certified Return Receipt Card UNEXECUTED as to Michael M. Lowther, Norman Blake and Jerome Meyer (Rodko, R.) Modified on 02/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                          Certified Return Receipt Card as to Lawrence Gregory Whalley, Michael J. Kopper, Richard Causey, Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Ken L. Harrison, Ronnie C. Chan, Robert K. Jaedicke, Gregory Hale, Jeffrey Skilling, Arthur Anderson, LLP as to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                            Certified Return Receipt Card as to David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, Jeffrey McMahon, Charles A. LeMaistre, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, William E. Swanson on 12/16/02 (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                              Certified Return Receipt Card as to Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Sorrells, Ronnie C. Chan, Arthur Anderson LLP, Bruce G. Willison on Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                Certified Return Receipt Card as to Richard B. Buy, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira on Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Certified Return Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certified Return Receipt Card as to David Stephen Goddard Jr., Wendy L. Gramm, Ken L. Harrison, Gary B. Goolsby, Danny D. Rudloff, Charles E. Walker, Kenneth Lay, John Wakeham, Ben Glisan on Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003, Terminated: 2/14/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff for Sharon Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sherman, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Northeast Utilities, Northeast Utilities Service, Connecticut Light to Extend Time until 3/4/03 to respond the apportionment complaint (Sherman, M.) Modified on 02/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSEMENT re: [34-1] motion to Extend Time until 3/4/03 to respond to the apportionment complaint -- ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Sherman, M.) Modified on 02/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION regarding Pretrial Deadlines by Connecticut, Murtha Cullina, LLP, Hawkins, Delafield, Leboeuf, Lamb (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Northeast Utilities, Northeast Utilities, Connecticut Light -- Alexander G. Filotto (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Northeast Utilities, Northeast Utilities, Connecticut Light -- John B. Nolan (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. in support of [30-1] motion to Stay Case (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 2/20/2003 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to Stay Case (Brief Due 2/24/03 ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 2/12/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to Extend Time up to 30 days after ruling on Motion to Remand (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Hawkins, Delafield -- James R. Fogarty (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Hawkins, Delafield -- Robert A. Bourque (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Richard Causey, Richard B. Buy, Jeffrey McMahon, Lawrence Gregory Whalley -- Michael Joseph Walsh (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Richard Causey, Richard B. Buy, Jeffrey McMahon, Lawrence Gregory Whalley to Extend Time until 02/24/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSEMENT [25-1] motion to Extend Time until 02/24/03 to respond to Complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells and Danny D. Rudloff -- Ethan A. Levin-Epstein (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Connecticut to Extend Time until 03/20/03 to file Motion to Remand matter back to State Court (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Leboeuf, Lamb -- Jonathan Blackman (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT [13-1] motion to Extend Time until 2/24/03 to respond to complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Warner, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche -- Garrett S. Flynn (Depino, F.) Modified on 01/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Joseph W. Sutton -- Garrett S. Flynn (Depino, F.) Modified on 01/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche to Extend Time to 2/17/03 to answer complaint (Depino, F.) Modified on 01/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Connecticut, Murtha Cullina, LLP, Hawkins, Delafield, Leboeuf, Lamb for Order Approving Stipulation Regarding Pretrial Deadlines (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Murtha Cullina, LLP -- William H. Prout Jr. (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Murtha Cullina, LLP -- Timothy Andrew Diemand (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003, Terminated: 5/1/2003 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Frank Savage, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to Consolidate Case with docket number(s):3:02CV2095WWE (Falcone, K.) Modified on 01/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Leboeuf, Lamb -- David L. Belt (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Benjamin S. Neuhausen, John E. Stewart, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff to Extend Time to 2/17/03 to answer complaint (Depino, F.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Joseph W. Sutton to Extend Time to 2/17/03 to answer complaint (Depino, F.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. to Extend Time until 2/24/03 to respond to complaint (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Compliance with Standing Order by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. (Falcone, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CT Resources (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by CT Resources in support of [4-1] motion to Stay adjudication of any motions to transfer (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003, Terminated: 2/12/2003 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CT Resources to Stay adjudication of any motions to transfer (Brief Due 2/5/03 ) (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent to Removal Response by Arthur Anderson LLP, Joseph F. Berardino, David B. Duncan, Debra A. Cash, David Stephen Goddard Jr., Gary B. Goolsby, Roger D. Willard, John E. Sorrells, Danny D. Rudloff to [1-1] removal notice by defendants (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. -- Steven M. Barry (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. -- Michael G. Durham (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Pending Motions filed in State Court. Motion by Murtha Cullina, LLP to Extend Time, Connecticut Resources Motion for Reconsideration and Hawkins, Delafield Motion to Extend Time attached (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/12/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/11/03 Amended Pleadings due 03/10/03 Motions to Dismiss due 04/10/03 (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe H. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert K. Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charles E. Walker, Bruce G. Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. from Judicial District of Hartford FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # N008399 (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?