Encrypted Data Transmission System Employing Means For Randomly Altering The Encryption Keys

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 07872674
Examiner Bernarr E Gregory, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Bernarr E Gregory
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jones, Michael F., Applicant

Represented by Docket Clerk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Anderson +1 972 628 3600
Space David Doyle +1 972 628 3600
Space Tara Doyle +1 972 628 3600
Space Jacob LaCombe +1 972 628 3637
Space Ryan Loveless +1 972 628 3610
Space Robert Darren McCutcheon +1 972 628 3600 +1 972 628 3616 rmccutcheon@munckcarter.com
Space William Munck +1 972 628 3600
Space Michael Rodriguez +1 972 628 3607
Space Daniel Venglarik +1 972 628 3621
Space David Weigand +1 972 628 3600
Space Emily White +1 972 628 3642
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Jones, Michael F., Nashua, NH (US)
Filing Date April 23, 1992
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 89.348A
Confirmation Number 4154
Group Art Unit 2202
Class / Sub-Class 380 / 46
Timeline
  Entries (217) Tab Overlap Assignments (4) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.POA.WDRW
Petition to withdraw attorney or agent (SB83) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
File Marked Found
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - ARTIFACT
Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
Change of Address (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Withdraw Publication/Pre-Exam Abandon
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition to Revive Application - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment Crossed in Mail
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (20 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
Abandonment (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/3/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/28/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/22/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/8/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/8/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/27/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/26/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/26/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/31/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
Notice of Formal Drawings Required (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/3/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/13/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/20/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/20/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (6 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (24 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (28 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?