Method And Apparatus For Detecting And Quantifying Motion Of A Body Part

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 07872805
Examiner Joseph Mancuso, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Joseph Mancuso
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Neely, John G. H., Applicant

Represented by Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Codding +1 405 359 7478
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Neely, John G. H., Edmond, OK (US)
Filing Date April 23, 1992
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 4444.89000000
Confirmation Number 4291
Group Art Unit 2606
Class / Sub-Class 382 / 6
Timeline
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/19/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/28/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/13/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/14/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/29/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 6 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?