Grant v. Naugatuck, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00001-JBA
District Judge Janet Bond Arterton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kelly A. Grant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Murphy +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 tmurphy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Ross Smart +1 203 696 3000 +1 202 305 2685 James.Smart@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Borough of Naugatuck, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howd & Ludorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha Anne Shaw +1 860 249 1361 +1 860 249 7665 mshaw@hl-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Kallor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Rose +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mrose@rosekallor.com
No Logo Dennis E. Clisham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howd & Ludorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha Anne Shaw +1 860 249 1361 +1 860 249 7665 mshaw@hl-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Kallor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Rose +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mrose@rosekallor.com
No Logo Ricky Smolicz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howd & Ludorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha Anne Shaw +1 860 249 1361 +1 860 249 7665 mshaw@hl-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jorden Burt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Sconzo +1 860 392 5022 +1 860 392 5058 jms@jordenusa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Kallor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Rose +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mrose@rosekallor.com
No Logo Town of Naugatuck, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howd & Ludorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha Anne Shaw +1 860 249 1361 +1 860 249 7665 mshaw@hl-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Kallor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Rose +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mrose@rosekallor.com
No Logo Daniel E. Livingston, Special Master
No Logo Diana Garfield, Special Master
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County New Haven
Terminated 6/11/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT [22-1] stipulation ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Depino, F.)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of dismissal of Case with prejudice as to Kelly A. Grant, Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz (Rodko, R.)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
      Order of dismissal of case ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Warner, R.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Terminated Case
        Case closed (Warner, R.)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 41(b) Settlement. Case reported settled on 5/8/03 Dismissal due 6/9/03 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Depino, F.)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Order
            ENDORSEMENT denying [19-1] motion to Extend time to file amended complaint until 6/9/03 ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
              MOTION by Kelly A. Grant to Extend time to file amended complaint until 6/9/03 (Falcone, K.)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order Referring Case to Special Master
                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Diana Garfield, Daniel E. Livingston as special masters ( signed by Clerk ) (Torday, B.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting filing of motion to dismiss by 4/21/03 SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DETAILS ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                    Deadline updated; reset Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/03 (Torday, B.)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order
                      ENDORSEMENT granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time until 4/18/03 for 26(f) conference and to file amended complaint until 4/25/03, 26(f) Report of Conference Due 4/18/03 ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                        MOTION by Kelly A. Grant to Extend Time until 4/18/03 for 26(f) conference and to file amended complaint until 4/25/03 (Sherman, M.) Modified on 03/25/2003
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Order
                          ENDORSEMENT granting, to 3/21/03 and 3/28/03 [15-1] motion to Extend time for 4 weeks to file amended complaint and conduct a 26(f) conference ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Torday, B.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Order
                            ENDORSEMENT granting [14-1] motion for Reconsideration of [10-1] order dated 1/29/03 re: [7-1] motion for Security for Costs, vacating [10-1] order re: [7-1] motion for Security for Costs by Ricky Smolicz, Dennis E. Clisham, Town of Naugatuck, Borough of Naugatuck ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 3/12/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                              MOTION by Kelly A. Grant to Extend time for 4 weeks to file amended complaint and conduct a 26(f) conference (Sherman, M.) Modified on 02/25/2003
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 2/27/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                                MOTION by Kelly A. Grant for Reconsideration of [10-1] order dated 1/29/03 re: [7-1] motion for Security for Costs (Brief Due 3/17/03 ) (Falcone, K.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting filing of amended pleadings by 2/28/03 SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DETAILS ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Kelly A. Grant -- James Ross Smart (Sherman, M.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ricky Smolicz -- James M. Sconzo (Warner, R.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 2/27/2003 Order
                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Security for Costs . Bond as security for costs in this action shall be filed by the Plaintiff(s) within 30 days of this date as requested by Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz ( signed by Clerk ) (Depino, F.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion for Conference
                                          Letter MOTION by Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz for pre-filing Conference (Depino, F.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Order
                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [8-1] motion for prefiling Conference ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Sherman, M.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Order
                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [9-1] motion for pre-filing Conference which has been set down for 2/13/03 @ 2:30p.m. ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion for Conference
                                                MOTION by Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz for prefiling Conference (Sherman, M.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion for Security for Costs
                                                  MOTION by Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz for Security for Costs (Sherman, M.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Order
                                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time until 02/22/03 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Sherman, M.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz -- Michael J. Rose (Rodko, R.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz -- Martha Anne Shaw (Rodko, R.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz to Extend Time until 02/22/03 to respond to Complaint (Rodko, R.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed on 01/02/03 as to Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz (Rodko, R.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                              ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/03 Amended Pleadings due 3/2/03 Motions to Dismiss due 4/2/03 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H8206 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Borough of Naugatuck, Town of Naugatuck, Dennis E. Clisham, Ricky Smolicz (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 647 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?