In Re: Publishers, et al v. American Natl Bank, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00002-AVC
District Judge Alfred V. Covello, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by leneslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Lenes +1 203 438 0255 +1 203 438 0266 jlenes@wwblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neubert, Pepe, and Monteith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas S. Skalka +1 203 821 2000 +1 203 821 2009 dskalka@npmlaw.com
No Logo Publishers Consortium, Inc., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Neubert, Pepe, and Monteith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis J. Testa +1 203 821 2000 +1 203 821 2008 ltesta@npmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeisler and Zeisler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Berman +1 203 368 4234 +1 203 367 9678 jberman@zeislaw.com
No Logo McBrooks Press, Inc, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by 730 17th St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara H. Katz +1 203 772 4828 bkatz@epitrustee.com

Toggle Switch Represented by crossmore.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Y. Crossmore +1 607 273 5787 +1 607 273 0291 ruth@crossmore.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, Trustee
Officially listed as "US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space US Trustee +1 203 773 2210 ustpregion02.nh.ecf@usdoj.gov
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County New Haven
Terminated 12/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 02-3048[BKY-NH], 02-31588[BKY-NH]
Def Custody Status
Flags BKAPP, CLOSED
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 USCA Order
ORDER of Stipulation re USCA as to [24] Notice of Appeal filed by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, [22] Notice of Appeal filed by McBrooks Press, Inc USCA Case Number 05-0318 (Blue, A.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 USCA Order
    STIPULATION of USCA as to [24] Notice of Appeal filed by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, [22] Notice of Appeal filed by McBrooks Press, Inc USCA Case Number 05-0318 (Blue, A.)
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 USCA Order
      STIPULATION of USCA withdrawing as to [24] Notice of Appeal filed by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, [22] Notice of Appeal filed by McBrooks Press, Inc USCA Case Number 05-0318 (Blue, A.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 USCA Mandate
        MANDATE of USCA dated 10/3/06 Withdrawing [22] Notice of Appeal filed by McBrooks Press, Inc,, [24] Notice of Appeal filed by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, (Blue, A.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 USCA Order
          ORDER of USCA as to [24] Notice of Appeal filed by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, USCA Case Number 05-0398 (Attachments: # (1) Order #4)(Blue, A.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 USCA Order
            ORDER of USCA as to [22] Notice of Appeal filed by McBrooks Press, Inc, USCA Case Number 05-0318 (Attachments: # (1) Order #2)(Blue, A.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 USCA Scheduling Order
              USCA Scheduling Order as to [22] Notice of Appeal filed by McBrooks Press, Inc,. USCA Number: 05-0318 (Blue, A.)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Acknowledged Receipt of ROA
                Acknowledged Receipt of Index at USCA on 1/19/05 re [22] Notice of Appeal: USCA Number: 05-0318 (Blue, A.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Acknowledged Receipt of ROA
                  Acknowledged Receipt of NOA at USCA on 1/18/05 re [22] Notice of Appeal (D'Onofrio, B.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Index to Record on Appeal
                    Index to Record on Appeal by McBrooks Press, Inc re [22] Notice of Appeal (Basile, F.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Notice of Appeal
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [20] Judgment by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number H014739.Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Blue, A.)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Lenes on behalf of American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago (Blue, A.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Notice of Appeal
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [20] Judgment, [19] Order by McBrooks Press, Inc. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number H014656.Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Blue, A.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Y. Crossmore on behalf of McBrooks Press, Inc (Blue, A.)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Judgment*
                            JUDGMENT Signed by Clerk on 12/16/04. (Blue, A.)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM & ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT re [2] Bankruptcy Appeal, Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/9/04. (Blue, A.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Order
                                ENDORSEMENT granting nunc pro tunc [18-1] motion to Extend Time until 4/22/03 to file a reply brief ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc to Extend Time until 4/22/03 to file a reply brief (Blue,A.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Appellants Reply Brief
                                    Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by McBrooks Press, Inc . (Blue,A.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Order
                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to 4/15/03 to file reply briefs, reset Bankruptcy Briefs due 4/15/03 ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc to Extend Time to 4/15/03 to file reply briefs (Montgomery, C.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Appellees Brief
                                          Appellee's BRIEF by American Natl Bank, Publishers . (Blue,A.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Order
                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time until 4/4/03 to file appellee briefs ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003, Terminated: 4/1/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              MOTION by American Natl Bank to Extend Time until 4/4/03 to file appellee briefs (Blue,A.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Order
                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time until 3/28/03 to file and serve appellees' briefs, reset Bankruptcy Briefs due 3/28/03 ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 3/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                  MOTION by Publishers to Extend Time until 3/28/03 to file and serve appellees' briefs (Blue,A.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Appellants Brief
                                                    Appellant's BRIEF by McBrooks Press, Inc . (Walker, J.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for McBrooks Press, Inc -- Edward Y. Crossmore (Blue,A.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Order
                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file brief ( signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003, Terminated: 1/21/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc to Extend Time to file brief (Blue,A.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for McBrooks Press, Inc -- Barbara H. Katz (Blue,A.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) to Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello (Sanders, C.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                                                ENDORSEMENT [7-1] motion for Edward Y. Crossmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                  MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc for Edward Y. Crossmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                                                    Joint Designation of Record on Appeal by Publishers Consortium, Inc and Creditors Committee (Pesta, J.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                                                      Additional Designation of Record on Appeal by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago (Pesta, J.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                                                        Designation of Record on Appeal by McBrooks Press, Inc (Pesta, J.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. ( signed by Clerk ) (Pesta, J.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. All Bankruptcy Briefs due by 2/11/03 . (Pesta, J.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                              NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. All Bankruptcy Briefs due by 2/11/03 . (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?