In Re: Publishers, et al v. American Natl Bank, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00003-AVC
District Judge Alfred V. Covello, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bank One, NA, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Neubert, Pepe, and Monteith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas S. Skalka +1 203 821 2000 +1 203 821 2009 dskalka@npmlaw.com
No Logo Publishers Consortium, Inc., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Neubert, Pepe, and Monteith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis J. Testa +1 203 821 2000 +1 203 821 2008 ltesta@npmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeisler and Zeisler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Berman +1 203 368 4234 +1 203 367 9678 jberman@zeislaw.com
No Logo McBrooks Press, Inc, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by 730 17th St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara H. Katz +1 203 772 4828 bkatz@epitrustee.com

Toggle Switch Represented by crossmore.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Y. Crossmore +1 607 273 5787 +1 607 273 0291 ruth@crossmore.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, Trustee
Officially listed as "US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space US Trustee +1 203 773 2210 ustpregion02.nh.ecf@usdoj.gov
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County New Haven
Terminated 12/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 02-3048[BKY-NH], 02-31588[BKY-NH]
Def Custody Status
Flags BKAPP, CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA dated 6/22/06 withdrawing without costs and attorney's fees and without prejudice [28] Notice of Appeal, filed by Publishers Consortium, Inc and [26] Notice of Appeal, filed by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, Bank One NA (Montgomery, A.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt by Bankruptcy Court/Hartford of 29 Court Exhibits filed along with Appeal, signed by Lou Dilella on 9/6/06 (Montgomery, A.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of delivery of 29 Court Exhibits filed with appeal to Bankruptcy Court/Hartford (Montgomery, A.) Modified on 9/6/2006 to expand text (Montgomery, A.).
        LREF
        Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Stipulation
        STIPULATION withdrawing appeal without costs and attorney's fees re [26] Notice of Appeal,. (Montgomery, A.)
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Docket Annotation
          Docket Entry Correction re [28] Notice of Appeal...filer corrected (Montgomery, A.) Modified on 3/15/2005 (Montgomery, A.).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2006 Acknowledged Receipt of ROA
            Acknowledged Receipt of Index at USCA on 2/11/05 re [26] Notice of Appeal, : USCA Number: 05-0513 (Montgomery, A.)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Docket Annotation
              Docket Entry Correction...Filing date for document #[28] Notice of Appeal corrected. (Montgomery, A.)
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Acknowledged Receipt of ROA
                Acknowledged Receipt of NOA at USCA on 2/1/05 re [26] Notice of Appeal, : (Montgomery, A.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Docket Annotation
                  Docket Entry Correction...Document [28] Notice of Appeal modified to reflect correct filer. (Montgomery, A.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [24] Judgment by Publisher's Consortium, Inc.and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Publisher's Consortium, Inc. Filing fee $255, receipt number H014871.Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Montgomery, A.) Modified on 2/3/2005 (Montgomery, A.). Modified on 3/15/2005 (Montgomery, A.).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Index to Record on Appeal
                      Index to Record on Appeal by Bank One NA re [28] Notice of Appeal, [26] Notice of Appeal, (Montgomery, A.)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Index to Record on Appeal
                        Statement of issues and Proposed Index to Record on Appeal by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, Bank One NA re [26] Notice of Appeal, (Montgomery, A.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Notice of Appeal
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [24] Judgment of District Court vacating Judgment of Bankruptcy Court by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, Bank One NA. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number H014743.Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Montgomery, A.)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Lenes on behalf of American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago, Bank One NA (Montgomery, A.)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Judgment*
                              JUDGMENT reversing Judgment of Bankruptcy Court and remanding case back to Bankruptcy Court for reconsideration . Signed by Clerk on 12/16/04. (Montgomery, A.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER vacating Judgment of Bankruptcy Court and remanding matter for reconsideration . Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/9/04. (Montgomery, A.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order
                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to 4/22/03 to file reply briefs ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc to Extend Time to 4/22/03 to file reply briefs (Montgomery, C.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Ruth Babbitt by McBrooks Press, Inc Re [20-1] response by McBrooks Press, Inc (Montgomery, C.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response
                                        Reply by McBrooks Press, Inc to [16-1] appellee's brief by Client Distribution (Montgomery, C.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Affidavit
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Ruth Babbitt by McBrooks Press, Inc Re [18-1] response by McBrooks Press, Inc (Montgomery, C.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response
                                            Reply by McBrooks Press, Inc to [15-1] appellee's brief by Publishers, American Natl Bank (Montgomery, C.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Order
                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to 4/15/03 to file reply briefs ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc to Extend Time to 4/15/03 to file reply briefs (Montgomery, C.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Appellees Brief
                                                  Appellee's BRIEF by Client Distribution Services, Inc. (Montgomery, C.) Modified on 04/22/2003
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Appellees Brief
                                                    Appellee's BRIEF by American Natl Bank, Publishers . (Montgomery, C.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                      Deadline updated; see endorsement 4/1/03 reset Bankruptcy Briefs due 4/4/03 (Walker, J.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Order
                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to 4/4/03 to file joint brief ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Grady, B.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003, Terminated: 4/1/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by American Natl Bank to Extend Time to 4/4/03 to file joint brief (Montgomery, C.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Appellants Brief
                                                            Appellant's BRIEF by McBrooks Press, Inc . (Montgomery, C.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Order
                                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to 3/28/03 for filing of appellee's briefs, reset Bankruptcy Briefs due 3/28/03 ( signed by Senior Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Bauer, J.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 3/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                MOTION by Publishers to Extend Time to 3/28/03 for filing of appellee's briefs (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 12/5/2006 Order
                                                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to 15 days after filing of transcript with District Court ( signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for McBrooks Press, Inc -- Edward Y. Crossmore (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) to Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for McBrooks Press, Inc -- Barbara H. Katz (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc to Extend Time to 15 days after filing of transcript with District Court (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Order
                                                                            ENDORSEMENT granting [6-1] motion for Edward Y Crossmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Edward Y. Crossmore by McBrooks Press, Inc Re [6-1] motion for Edward Y Crossmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by McBrooks Press, Inc (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                MOTION by McBrooks Press, Inc for Edward Y Crossmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                                                                  Joint Designation of Record on Appeal by Publishers, Creditors Committee (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                                                                    Additional Designation of Record on Appeal by American Natl Bank & Trust Co of Chicago (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                                                                      Designation of Record on Appeal by McBrooks Press, Inc (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. ( signed by Clerk ) (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                                          NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. All Bankruptcy Briefs due by 2/11/03 . (Pesta, J.)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?