Hill v. SBC/Southern
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00004-JCH
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Theresa Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katrena K. Engstrom +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 kengstrom@johnrwilliams.com
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori B. Alexander +1 203 234 6344 +1 203 234 6345 lalexander@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tyler Cooper & Alcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Duchin Kraus +1 203 784 8200 kraus@tylercooper.com
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County New Haven
Terminated 3/1/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Judgment*
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, SBC/Southern New England Telephone (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan against Plaintiff, Theresa Hill. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2005. (Sanders, C.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
    RULING granting [29] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . Documents #30-32, 40 & 47 are unsealed. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/24/05. (Cody, C.)
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall : Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/24/2005. (Court Reporter Fidanza.) (Boroskey, C.)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
        NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: E-FILE CALENDAR. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 2/25/2005 4:30 PM before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. This conference call is to be arranged between counsel. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 579-5554.(Szczygiel, G.)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
          NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. ORDER granting [37] Motion for Leave to File amended statement of undisputed facts. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/7/04. (Boroskey, C.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Response
            RESPONSE filed by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan to Plaintiffs LR 56(a)(1) Statement of Material Facts in Dispute. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Sealed Document +
              Sealed Document by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                Endorsement ORDER granting [36] Motion to Seal Document . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/2/04. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY to Response to [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unpublished Authority attached in paper form) filed by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Terry Harris filed by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Tracy Love Jones)(Cody, C.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [39] Motion to Seal Document - document to be filed under seal; [41] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 6/1/2004; [42] MOTION for Leave to File affidavits; . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/04. (Boroskey, C.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/1/04 to File Response/Reply as to [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Cody, C.)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                        MOTION for Leave to File Affidavits of Terry Harris and Tracy Love Jones in support of Motion for Summary Judgment by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Cody, C.)
                          LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Statement of Material Facts
                          SEALED DOCUMENT RE: [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Theresa Hill. (Cody, C.) Modified on 5/21/2004 (Cody, C.).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004, Terminated: 5/21/2004 Description not available
                            MOTION to Seal Document-Statement of Material Facts by Theresa Hill. (Cody, C.)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Memorandum in Opposition re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Theresa Hill. (Cody, C.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004, Terminated: 6/3/2004 Description not available
                                MOTION to Seal Document by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                  Endorsement ORDER granting [33] Motion to Seal . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/25/04. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004, Terminated: 10/7/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amended Statement of Undisputed Facts by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re filing of additional briefs if necessary by 5/14/04. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/21/04. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Docket Annotation
                                        Document re [34] Order entered on wrong case (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004, Terminated: 4/26/2004 Motion to Seal
                                          MOTION to Seal by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Sealed Document +
                                            Sealed Document by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Sealed Document +
                                              Sealed Document by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [30] Sealed Document. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                Sealed Document by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan.Responses due by 5/10/2004 (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                    Endorsement ORDER denying as moot [19] Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/23/04. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                      Endorsement ORDER granting [26] Motion for Extension of Time to 4/19/04 to file dispostive motions . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/22/04. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                        Set Deadlines Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2004. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004, Terminated: 3/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/19/04 for dispositive motions by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                            Endorsement ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to 2/16/04 for discovery & 3/29/04 for dispositive motions . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/26/04. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                              Set Deadlines Discovery due by 2/16/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 3/29/2004. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 1/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/16/04 to complete discovery and to 3/29/04 to file dispositive motions by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                  Endorsement ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Interrogatories & Requests for Documents . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/29/03. (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003, Terminated: 10/30/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/4/03 to respond to discovery requests by SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Order
                                                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to 1/15/04 to file dispositive motions, resetting Discovery deadline to 1/15/04 , resetting Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/04 ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Order
                                                                        ENDORSEMENT denying [20-1] motion to Extend Time to 11/4/03 to respond to discovery ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003, Terminated: 10/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          MOTION by SBC/Southern to Extend Time to 1/15/04 to file dispositive motions (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003, Terminated: 10/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            MOTION by SBC/Southern to Extend Time to 11/4/03 to respond to discovery (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              MOTION by Theresa Hill to Extend Time to complete discovery until 12/1/03 (Corriette, M.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Order
                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to 10/4/03 to Respond to Discovery Requests ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003, Terminated: 8/25/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  MOTION by SBC/Southern to Extend Time to 10/4/03 to Respond to Discovery Requests (Simpson, T.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Theresa Hill -- Katrena K. Engstrom (Baldwin, S.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Status Conference
                                                                                      Rule 16 Status Conference held ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Status Conference
                                                                                        Rule 16 Status Conference held ( JCH) (Boroskey, C.)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Status Report
                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by Theresa Hill, SBC/Southern (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Answer
                                                                                            ANSWER & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SBC/Southern (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Order
                                                                                              ENDORSEMENT granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time until 5/30/03 to respond to discovery ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Order
                                                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time until 4/9/03 to respond to complaint ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003, Terminated: 3/27/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  MOTION by Theresa Hill to Extend Time until 4/9/03 to respond to complaint (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003, Terminated: 3/27/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                    MOTION by Theresa Hill to Extend Time until 5/30/03 to respond to discovery (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      RULING granting [8-1] report, reset Discovery deadline to 10/1/03 , reset Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/03 Rule 16 Conference is scheduled for 7/7/03 at 3:30 p.m. ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) 1 Page(s) (Warren, C.)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER re: Status Conference scheduled for 7/7/03 at 3:30 ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Warren, C.)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                          REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Simpson, T.)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Order
                                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT [7-1] motion to Extend Time to 2/26/03 to respond to complaint ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003, Terminated: 1/21/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                              MOTION by SBC/Southern to Extend Time to 2/26/03 to respond to complaint (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for SBC/Southern -- Regina Duchin Kraus (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for SBC/Southern -- Lori B. Alexander (Kolesnikoff, D.)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/7/03 as to SBC/Southern (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for SBC/Southern New England Tel (SNET) Disability Benefits Plan (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Theresa Hill -- John R. Williams (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/03 Amended Pleadings due 03/02/03 Motions to Dismiss due 04/02/03 (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # N008309 (Rodko, R.)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?