Directv Inc v. Crawley, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00005-PCD
District Judge Peter C. Dorsey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

DirecTV Group, Inc. DirecTV Group, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Directv Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan E. Malliet +1 860 233 5900 +1 860 233 5901 smalliet@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Matthew Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Dallas Gordon +1 860 523 0471 +1 860 523 0472 mattgordon@mdgordonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Eric Long, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/31/2005
Origin 4
Reopened 11/18/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, EFILE
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of party Eric Long by Directv Inc (Pesta, J.)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order
    ORDER re [35] Stipulation of Dismissal of party Rose Marie Boyd, ORDERED ACCORDINGLY . Signed by Clerk on 8/18/05. (Pesta, J.)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Rose Marie Boyd Defendant by Rose Marie Boyd. (Attachments: # (1))(Gordon, Matthew)
        LREF
        Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Docket Annotation
        Docket Entry Correction: Attached correct PDF to [31] Stipulation of Dismissal of Carla Crawley (Pesta, J.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7/11/05. (Villano, P.)
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Order
            ORDER dismissing defendant Carla Crawley re: [31] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Directv Inc,, Carla Crawley, . Signed by Clerk on 5/17/05. (Pesta, J.)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
              STIPULATION of Dismissal of defendant Carla Crawley by Directv Inc, Carla Crawley. (Attachments: # (1) certification)(Pesta, J.) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2005 (Pesta, J.).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Calendar Entry
                NOTICE OF E-FILED COURT TRIAL CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Villano, P.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Calendar Entry
                  NOTICE OF E-FILED COURT TRIAL CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. PLEASE CLICK ON DOCUMENT NUMBER TO VIEW AND PRINT CALENDAR. (Villano, P.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Trial Brief due by 3/18/2005. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/9/05. (Miller, K.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying [22] Motion for Default Judgment . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/2/04. (Depino, F.)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Carla Crawley.(Depino, F.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance by Carla Crawley (Depino, F.)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Objection re [22] MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Rose Marie Boyd. (Depino, F.)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              Memorandum in Support re [22] MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Directv Inc. (Attachments:Exhibit # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) )(Depino, F.)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003, Terminated: 9/3/2004 Motion for Default Judgment
                              MOTION for Default Judgment as to Carla Crawley and Rose Marie Boyd by Directv Inc. (Depino, F.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting [19] Motion to Vacate [9] Judgment Of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/17/03. (Inferrera, L.)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Open/Rescind Judgment of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/17/03. (Depino, F.)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003, Terminated: 11/18/2003 Motion to Vacate
                                    MOTION to Vacate [9] Order on Motion for Judgment by Directv Inc. (Depino, F.)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E. Malliet on behalf of Directv Inc (Depino, F.)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Answer
                                        ANSWER and Denial to Complaint by Rose Marie Boyd.(Inferrera, L.)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Response
                                          Opposition to [10] Motion for Default Judgment filed by Rose Marie Boyd. (Inferrera, L.)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Marie Boyd (Inferrera, L.)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                              ENDORSEMENT ORDER denying [12] Motion to Stay . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/23/03. (Depino, F.)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                ENDORSEMENT ORDER denying [10] Motion for Default Judgment . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/23/03. (Depino, F.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003, Terminated: 10/24/2003 Motion to Stay
                                                  MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to Defendant Long only by Directv Inc.Responses due by 11/4/2003 (Brown, S.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM by Directv Inc in support of [10-1] motion for Default Judgment against Carla Crawley, Rose Marie Boyd (Depino, F.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003, Terminated: 10/24/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                      MOTION by Directv Inc for Default Judgment against Carla Crawley, Rose Marie Boyd (Depino, F.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Order on Motion for Judgment
                                                        JUDGMENT ORDERED that this action be and hereby is dismissed (signed by Clerk) (Depino, F.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Terminated Case
                                                          Case closed (Depino, F.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 41(a) Lack of Prosecution. Status Report due on 10/3/03 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Villano, P.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Answer
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Carla Crawley (Depino, F.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/11/03 as to Rose Marie Boyd (Falcone, K.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/11/03 as to Eric Long (Falcone, K.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/11/03 as to Carla Crawley (Falcone, K.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order
                                                                      Supplemental Order re: motion filing procedures (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                        ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/03 Amended Pleadings due 3/2/03 Motions to Dismiss due 4/2/03 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H8212 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Summons Issued
                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Carla Crawley, Rose Marie Boyd, Eric Long (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?