Directv Inc v. Harris, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00006-DJS
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

DirecTV Group, Inc. DirecTV Group, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Directv Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Matthew Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Dallas Gordon +1 860 523 0471 +1 860 523 0472 mattgordon@mdgordonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Uccello, Defendant
No Logo Bill Durante, Defendant
No Logo Justin Harris, Defendant
No Logo Larry Laford, Defendant
No Logo Michael Verrilli, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 4/21/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [18-1] motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment as to Jim Winslow only (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito) (Grady, B.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Order
    ENDORSEMENT so ordered [19-1] notice of dismissal ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Jim Winslow only (Grady, B.)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003, Terminated: 7/16/2003 Motion to Set Aside Judgment
        MOTION by Directv Inc to Set Aside & Vacate Judgment: [15-1] judgment order dated 5/30/03 ast to Deft Jim Winslow (Brief Due 7/30/03 ) (Basile, F.)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
          DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Larry Laford in the amount of $10,776.36 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
            DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Bill Durante in the amount of $10,776.36 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
              DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Jim Winslow in the amount of $10,776.36 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Anthony Uccello in the amount of $10,776.36 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Rectify Judgment ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Basile, F.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003, Terminated: 5/30/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
                    MOTION by Directv Inc to Rectify Judgment (Brief Due 6/18/03 ) (Basile, F.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      RULING granting in part, denying in part [9-1] motion for Entry Judgment by Default as to Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) 5 Page(s) (Basile, F.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Default -Judgment
                        DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Justin Harris, Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow; in the amount of $13,105.43 ( signed by Clerk ) (Basile, F.)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Terminated Case
                          Case closed (Basile, F.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Order
                            ENDORSEMENT so ordered [9-1] motion for Entry Judgment by Default as to Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              MEMORANDUM by Directv Inc in support of [9-1] motion for Entry Judgment by Default as to Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow (Basile, F.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Motion for Default Entry 55(a)
                                MOTION by Directv Inc for Entry Judgment by Default as to Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow (Brief Due 4/28/03 ) (Basile, F.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 NoticeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow Filing of Motion for Default Judgment by 4/10/03 for Bill Durante, for Larry Laford, for Anthony Uccello, for Jim Winslow ( Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/16/03 as to Anthony Uccello (Montgomery, C.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/16/03 as to Bill Durante (Montgomery, C.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/16/03 as to Jim Winslow (Montgomery, C.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/15/03 as to Larry Laford (Montgomery, C.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER to commence Discovery immediately ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Ferguson, L.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Scheduling Order
                                              ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/03 Amended Pleadings due 03/2/03 Motions to Dismiss due 04/2/03 (Ferguson, L.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H008211 (Ferguson, L.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Summons Issued
                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Justin Harris, Bill Durante, Larry Laford, Anthony Uccello, Jim Winslow (Ferguson, L.)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?