Otis Elevator Co v. GE Fanuc Automation

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00972-JCH
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Janet C. Hall
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Otis Elevator Co, Plaintiff

Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel L. FitzMaurice +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 dlfitzmaurice@daypitney.com
Space Maureen O'Connor +1 860 275 0378 +1 860 275 0343 moconnor@daypitney.com
v.
No Logo GE Fanuc Automation Corp, Defendant

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Conway +1 203 265 2035 jconway@lflaw.com
Space W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
Space Charles Phillip Reed +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 creed@lflaw.com
Attributes
Office New Haven
Filed 5/30/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Fairfield
Terminated 6/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy)dated 11/19/04 as to [30] Notice of Appeal filed by GE Fanuc Automation Corp. Stipulation Withdrawing Appeal So Ordered Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk (Warren, C.)
LREF
Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy)dated 9/24/04, as to [30] Notice of Appeal filed by GE Fanuc Automation Corp, Stipulation Withdrawing Appeal, filed by parties, So Ordered. Roseann B. MacKechnie (Warren, C.) Modified on 10/27/2004 (Warren, C.).
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Acknowledged Receipt of ROA
Acknowledged Receipt of NOA at USCA on 8/10/04 (Warren, C.)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/5/04 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanaza. (Warren, C.)
LREF
Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [29] Judgment by GE Fanuc Automation Corp. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number B008599.Certified copy of docket and copy of NOA mailed to USCA. (Warren, C.)
LREF
Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Judgment*
JUDGMENT re: Petition to Compel Aribitration. Case closed. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/04. (Candee, D.)
LREF
Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED ORDER re [27] Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, [1] Petition to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/1/04. (Cody, C.)
LREF
Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [1] Petition to Compel Arbitration Status Report due by 6/15/2004.. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/25/04. (Cody, C.)
LREF
Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall : Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2004 re [1] Petition to compel arbitration filed by Otis Elevator. (Court Reporter Fidanza.) (Boroskey, C.)
LREF
Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Response
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re [24] Response filed by GE Fanuc Automation Corp. (Candee, D.)
LREF
Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 Response
RESPONSE re [1] Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Otis Elevator Co. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibits B & C submitted in paper form with Notice of Manual Filing #(3) Exhibit D, #(4) Exhibit E)(Candee, D.)
LREF
Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/16/04. (Candee, D.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines as to Motion Hearing re: Motion to Compel Arbitration set for 2/26/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom Two - Bridgeport before Janet C. Hall. (Candee, D.)
LREF
Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004, Terminated: 1/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time for approximately one month for oral argument on Petition to Compel Arbitration by GE Fanuc Automation Corp, Otis Elevator Co. (Fazekas, J.)
LREF
Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Glen Pierson on behalf of GE Fanuc Automation Corp (Baldwin, S.)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Clerk ) to Judge Janet C. Hall (Pesta, J.)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Notice
Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 10/10/03 ( signed by Clerk ) (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for GE Fanuc Automation -- John F. Conway (Brown, S.)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Clerk ) to Judge Mark R. Kravitz (Pesta, J.) Modified on 09/12/2003
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Response
Reply by Otis Elevator Co to [1-1] complaint (Candee, D.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to 8/18/03 to Respond to Defendant's Opposition to Compel Arbitration ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Candee, D.)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003, Terminated: 8/12/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Otis Elevator Co to Extend Time to 8/18/03 to Respond to Defendant's Opposition to Compel Arbitration (D'Andrea, S.)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Response
Response by GE Fanuc Automation to [1-1] complaint (Warren, C.)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Timothy R. Schupp by GE Fanuc Automation Re [12-1] objection by GE Fanuc Automation (Barrille, J.)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Response
Memorandum in Opposition by GE Fanuc Automation re: [1-1] complaint (Barrille, J.)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Certified Return Receipt
Certified Return Receipt Card as to GE Fanuc Automation on 6/27/03 re: Order to Show Cause (Doc #6) (Candee, D.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT [9-1] motion to Extend Time to Plead ordered accordingly ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Simpson, T.)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
Disclosure Statement by GE Fanuc Automation (Simpson, T.)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by GE Fanuc Automation to Extend Time to Plead (Simpson, T.)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for GE Fanuc Automation -- Charles Phillip Reed (Simpson, T.)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed on 6/6/03 as to GE Fanuc Automation (Fazekas, J.)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE issued Re: response to Petition to Compel Arbitration ( signed by Judge Janet C. Hall ) (Candee, D.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for GE Fanuc Automation (Simpson, T.)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM by Otis Elevator Co in support of [1-1] Petition (Ferguson, L.)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 ~Notice (other)
Disclosure Statement by Otis Elevator Co (Ferguson, L.)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Otis Elevator Co -- Daniel L. FitzMaurice (Ferguson, L.)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Otis Elevator Co -- Maureen O'Connor (Ferguson, L.)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003, Terminated: 5/26/2004 Complaint
Petition to Compel Arbitration Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H009556 (Ferguson, L.)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 102 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?