MALLOY v. JACKSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01117-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES MALLOY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERT C. SELDON & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molly E. Buie +1 202 393 8200 +1 202 318 2287 meb@rcseldon-associates.com
Space Robert C. Seldon +1 202 393 8200 +1 202 318 2287 rcs@sba-pc.com
v.
No Logo ALPHONSO R. JACKSON, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/6/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 9/16/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER approving STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/15/08. (lcrcl2, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Truong, John)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
      Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 8/25/2008 at 10:10 AM and will continue at 10:00 AM on 8/26/2008 and 8/27/2008 in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. The Bench Trial will continue on 9/3/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
        LREF
        Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
        PRETRIAL ORDER and ORDER granting [47] Defendant's Motion to Allow the Main Witness to Testify Outside the Trial Period. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/15/2008. (lcrcl4, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Owens, Cindy)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Status Conference
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 8/14/2008. Bench Trial set for 8/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
              LREF
              Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Trial Exhibits by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Truong, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                REPLY to opposition to motion re [47] MOTION for Order Allowing Main Witness To Testify Outside Trial Period filed by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Attachments: # (1) Gov. Exh 1, # (2) Gov. Exh. 2, # (3) Gov. Exh. 3, # (4) Gov. Exh. 4)(Truong, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                  Memorandum in opposition to re [47] MOTION for Order Allowing Main Witness To Testify Outside Trial Period filed by JAMES MALLOY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Att. A, Haban Dep. Excerpt, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Proposed Findings of Fact
                    Proposed Findings of Fact by JAMES MALLOY. (Seldon, Robert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Pretrial Statement
                      PRETRIAL STATEMENT by JAMES MALLOY, ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Meriweather, Robin)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Meriweather, Robin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion for Order
                          MOTION for Order Allowing Main Witness To Testify Outside Trial Period by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Attachments: # (1) Gov. Exh. A)(Truong, John)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Truong on behalf of ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Truong, John)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Status Conference
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 4/11/2008. Motion in Limine due by 8/4/2008, Pretrial Statement due by 8/4/2008, Opposition due by 8/12/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Bench Trial set for 8/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [29] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/31/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/11/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Molly E. Buie (Buie, Molly)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Service by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON re [42] Reply to opposition to Motion, (Lyons, Jane)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 27- Excerpt from Haban Dep. subject to protective order# (2) Exhibit 28 - Excerpt of Salas Dep subject to protective order# (3) Exhibit 29 - Excerpt of Michael Stephens Dep.# (4) Exhibit 30 - Excerpt of John Robinson Dep.)(Lyons, Jane)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [40] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting [40] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall have to and including August 30, 2007 to file a reply, which may include up to thirty pages of text. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/23/2007. (lcrcl1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply due by 8/30/2007. (rje)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007, Terminated: 8/24/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages And, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: defendant shall have until August 23, 2007 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/20/2007. (lcrcl1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE Filing Under Seal (Att. R) by JAMES MALLOY re [34] Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,, (Seldon, Robert)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 ERRATA
                                                      ERRATA (Second) Corrected Declaration of James Malloy by JAMES MALLOY [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Seldon, Robert)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 ERRATA
                                                        ERRATA to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by JAMES MALLOY [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Seldon, Robert)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES MALLOY. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts Statement of Genuine Issues# (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# (3) Affidavit Malloy Decl.# (4) Errata Malloy Decl., Att. A# (5) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. B# (6) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. C# (7) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. D# (8) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. E# (9) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. F# (10) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. G# (11) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. H# (12) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. I# (13) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. J# (14) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. K# (15) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. L# (16) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. M# (17) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. N# (18) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. O# (19) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. P# (20) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. Q# (21) Exhibit Malloy Decl., Att. R (FILED UNDER SEAL)# (22) Exhibit Exh. 1 -- Chapman v. HUD settlement agreement# (23) Exhibit Exh. 2 -- EEOC Compliance Manual# (24) Exhibit Exh. 3 -- Malloy Dep. corrections/additions# (25) Affidavit Chapman Decl.# (26) Affidavit Groves Declaration# (27) Affidavit Haban Affidavit# (28) Affidavit Romero Affidavit# (29) Affidavit Truxal Affidavit# (30) Exhibit Haban Dep. Excerpts & Dep. Exh.# (31) Exhibit Malloy Dep. II Excerpts# (32) Exhibit McCarty Dep. Excerpts & Dep. Exh.# (33) Exhibit Nuhfer Dep. Excerpts & Dep. Exh.# (34) Exhibit Richardson Dep. Excerpts & Dep. Exh.# (35) Exhibit Robinson Dep. Excerpts & Dep. Exh.# (36) Exhibit Salas Dep. Excerpts & Dep. Exh.# (37) Exhibit Stephens Dep. Excerpts# (38) Exhibit Stephens Dep. II Excerpts)(Seldon, Robert) Modified on 7/19/2007 (tg, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2007. (rje)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER GRANTING [32] Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition, and ORDERING that the date for submission of plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment is extended until July 18, 2007. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/17/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 7/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Summary Judgment by JAMES MALLOY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Buie, Molly)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition due by 7/16/2007 (rje)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Consent Motion [30] for Extension of Time to Respond, and ORDERING that the date for the submission of plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment is hereby extended until July 16, 2007. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/10/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 7/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Summary Judgment by JAMES MALLOY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Exhibit 1 - Malloy I Depo Excerpts# (3) Exhibit 2 - Richardson Depo Exh 6 (Finn decision)# (4) Exhibit 3 - Richardson Depo Excerpts# (5) Exhibit 4 - Richardson Depo Exh 7# (6) Exhibit 5 - Haban Depo Excerpts# (7) Exhibit 6 - Malloy II Depo Excerpts# (8) Exhibit 7 - Oct. 10, 2002 Sworn Interview of Malloy# (9) Exhibit 8 - Nuhfer Depo Exh 3# (10) Exhibit 9 - Nuhfer Depo Excerpts# (11) Exhibit 10 - McCarty Affidavit# (12) Exhibit 11 - Robinson Depo Excerpts# (13) Exhibit 12 - Sept. 19, 2002 Sworn Interview of Malloy# (14) Exhibit 13 - McCarty Depo Excerpts# (15) Exhibit 14 - Salas Depo Excerpts# (16) Exhibit 15 - Stephens Depo Excerpts# (17) Exhibit 16 - Eamiguel Affidavit# (18) Exhibit 17 - Durant Sworn Interview# (19) Exhibit 18 - Gilbert Affidavit# (20) Exhibit 19 - Romero Affidavit# (21) Exhibit 20 - Howell Affidavit# (22) Exhibit 21 - Haley Affidavit# (23) Exhibit 22 - Kepler Affidavit# (24) Exhibit 23 - Plaintiff's Admissions# (25) Exhibit 24 - Davis Depo Excerpts# (26) Exhibit 25 - Nuhfer Depo Exh 10# (27) Exhibit 26 - March 12, 2007 Letter from Mr. Seldon)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [27] Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion, and ORDERING that defendant shall have through and including June 5, 2007 to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/5/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Summary Judgment motions due by 6/5/2007. (rje)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007, Terminated: 6/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2007. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 7/9/2007. Defendant's Reply due by 8/9/2007. (rje)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [25] Motion for Extension of Time to File, and ORDERING that defendant shall have through and including June 4, 2007, to file a dispositive motion. Plaintiff shall file his opposition no later than July 9, 2007, and defendant shall file his reply by August 9, 2007. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/7/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007, Terminated: 5/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re [23] Meet and Confer Statement: ORDERED that the dispositive motions schedule set forth by the parties in their Supplemental Joint Report is ADOPTED. Defendant shall move for summary judgment on or before May 7, 2007; plaintiff shall oppose summary judgment on or before June 11, 2007; and defendant shall reply on or before July 2, 2007. Further, the Court anticipates that it can accommodate scheduling a non-jury trial in 2007 after disposition of any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/3/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 5/7/2007. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/11/2007. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/2/2007. (rje)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Seldon, Robert)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/9/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2007. (rje)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; ORDERING that the Scheduling Order currently in effect as to this matter is hereby amended as follows: Discovery in this case shall conclude on March 9, 2007; The parties shall jointly propose a schedule for further proceedings or briefing dispositive motions on March 20, 2007. In all other respects, the Scheduling Order issued by the Court remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/26/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007, Terminated: 1/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [19] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; ORDERING that the Scheduling Order [14] issued by the Court on May 3, 2006, is hereby amended; further ORDERING discovery in this case shall conclude on February 2, 2007; further ORDERING that the parties shall jointly propose a schedule for further proceedings or briefing dispositive motions on February 16, 2007; and further ORDERING that in all other respects, the Scheduling Order [14] issued by the Court remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/23/06. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/2/2007. Joint Proposed schedule due by 2/16/2007. See Order for details. (rje)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 10/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. Related document: [17] Amended Complaint filed by JAMES MALLOY,.(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALPHONSO R. JACKSON filed by JAMES MALLOY.(tg, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [15] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/25/06. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 7/25/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by JAMES MALLOY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Amended Complaint)(Buie, Molly)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/2/2006. Proposed schedule for briefing of dispositive motions due by 10/16/2006. (mon, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [13] Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and amending the 10/25/05 Scheduling Order as follows: discovery shall conclude on 10/2/06; and the parties shall jointly propose a schedule for briefing dispositive issues on 10/16/06. In all other respects, the 10/25/05 Scheduling Order remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/27/06. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006, Terminated: 5/3/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [10] Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, by JAMES MALLOY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER entering Consent Privacy Act & Protective Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/30/06. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 11/2/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER setting schedule for discovery. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/25/05. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/1/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2006. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2006. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2006. Plaintiff Rule 26a1 due by 3/8/2006. Defendant Rule 26a1 due by 4/28/2006. (mon, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER requiring parties to hold a LCvR 16.3 Conference within 15 days; setting deadline for submission of proposed Scheduling Order for 10 days after conference. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/05. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON.(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting defendant?s second consent motion [5] for an enlargement of time to respond to the complaint in this matter. Defendant shall have through and including September 29, 2005 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 9/12/2005. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/14/2005. (zmon, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/29/2005. (zmon, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting defendant's first consent motion [3] for an enlargement of time to respond to the Complaint; defendant shall have through and including September 8, 2005 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/6/2005. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or other responsive pleading due by 9/8/2005. (mon, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005, Terminated: 9/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by ALPHONSO R. JACKSON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jane M. Lyons on behalf of ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Lyons, Jane)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                            Case Reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge John D. Bates no longer assigned to the case. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against ALPHONSO R. JACKSON (Filing fee $ 250) filed by JAMES MALLOY.(lc, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ALPHONSO R. JACKSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?