UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $3,799.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01123-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo $3,799.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD KENNETH KELLY, JR., Claimant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/7/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Statistical Closing
County 11001
Terminated 2/7/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Motion to Stay of civil forfeiture proceedings. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall administratively close this case until the stay is lifted by order of the Court upon Notice being filed by the government. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/7/06. (BL)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2006 Motion to Stay
    MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Kidwell, Judith)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Substitution of Counsel
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Anthony Humphreys on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Michael Humphreys (Humphreys, Michael)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 ~Notice (other)
      WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Date served: 9/20/05. (nmw, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by EDWARD KENNETH KELLY, JR.(jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Claim
          CLAIM to the forfeiture and continued seizure of $3,799.00 by EDWARD KENNETH KELLY, JR. (jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Complaint
            VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FOREITURE IN REM against $3,799.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Description not available
              WARRANT (1) For Arrest In Rem issued (jf, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 128 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?