PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01176-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Public Citizen, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Wolfman +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 brian@citizen.org
v.
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 11001
Terminated 11/30/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-I
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC., DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Smith, Peter)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC., DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Wolfman, Brian)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE: The parties are hereby ordered to file a status report with the Court by December 2, 2005, notifying the Court of the current status of this case. (BL)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Order
        ORDER approving Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/18/05. (BL)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) Modified on 7/15/2005 (jf, ). .
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Smith, Peter)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
            LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (jf, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Filing fee $ 250) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC..(jf, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 105 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?