UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($48,900.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01280-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($48,900.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, Defendant
No Logo GISELA AMADOR, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Burnell Smith +1 480 990 7400 +1 480 990 7860 dbsdbsatty@yahoo.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/27/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 11001
Terminated 1/17/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, TYPE-E
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Withdrawal of Motion
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by GISELA AMADOR Withdrawal of Claim of Gisela Amador. (Smith, David)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
    Final Judgment and Order of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 2, 2006. (FL, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Substitution of Counsel
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Anthony Humphreys on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Michael Humphreys (Humphreys, Michael)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Stipulation
        STIPULATION Order of Settlement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1))(Humphreys, Michael)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order
        MINUTE ORDER: The parties' Stipulated Order of Settlement (#6) docketed January 12, 2006, is SO ORDERED. (Kennedy, Henry)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Jury Demand
          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GISELA AMADOR. (Smith, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint by GISELA AMADOR.(Smith, David)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Claim
              CLAIM as the owner of the property alleged to be subject to forfeiture, $48,900.00 by GISELA AMADOR. (lc, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($48,900.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY served on 6/28/2005, answer due 7/18/2005 (lc, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Description not available
                  WARRANT (1) For Arrest In Rem issued (lc, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($48,900.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(lc, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Summons Issued
                      Summons (1) Issued as to FORTY-EIGHT THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($48,900.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (lc, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 67 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?