SIEVERDING et al v. AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01283-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DAVID SIEVERDING, Plaintiff
No Logo ED SIEVERDING, Plaintiff
No Logo KAY SIEVERDING, Plaintiff
No Logo TOM SIEVERDING, Plaintiff
v.
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Defendant

Represented by White & Case LLP

No Logo Faegre & Benson LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by obmslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Charles Schaefer +1 202 298 6161 +1 202 293 1640 jschaefer@obmslaw.com
No Logo Hall & Evans, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by obmslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Charles Schaefer +1 202 298 6161 +1 202 293 1640 jschaefer@obmslaw.com
No Logo JAMES B.F. OLIPHANT, FELDMAN, NAGEL & OLIPHANT, Defendant
No Logo JANE BENNETT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by obmslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Charles Schaefer +1 202 298 6161 +1 202 293 1640 jschaefer@obmslaw.com
No Logo MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by obmslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Charles Schaefer +1 202 298 6161 +1 202 293 1640 jschaefer@obmslaw.com
No Logo ROUTT COUNTY COURT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by harrisfamilylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Moore +1 720 530 7205 danielle@harrisfamilylaw.com
No Logo U.S. JUDICIARY, THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIAL BUILDING, Defendant
No Logo White & Steele, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "WHITE & STEELE"

Toggle Switch Represented by obmslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Charles Schaefer +1 202 298 6161 +1 202 293 1640 jschaefer@obmslaw.com
No Logo WORLD COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by obmslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Charles Schaefer +1 202 298 6161 +1 202 293 1640 jschaefer@obmslaw.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/27/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 7422 Appeal from Administrative Decision
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 7/17/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-7068'['USCA']
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-NP, STAYED, TYPE-F
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 79 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
ORDER denying [72] Motion for Reconsideration; denying [76] Motion for ECF Password. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/11/07. (lcrmu2)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Case Referred to Magistrate Judge was entered in the wrong case.(jeb, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
      ENTERED IN ERROR.....CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement. (jeb, ) Modified on 11/20/2007 (jeb, ).
        LREF
        Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 USCA Mandate
        MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (47 in 1:05-cv-01672-RMU) Notice of Appeal filed by KAY SIEVERDING, (39 in 1:05-cv-02122-RMU) Notice of Appeal filed by KAY SIEVERDING, (77 in 1:05-cv-01283-RMU) Notice of Appeal filed by KAY SIEVERDING; granting to the motions to dismiss; dismissing N0s. 07-5126, 07-7060, and 07-7068. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-01283-RMU, 1:05-cv-01672-RMU, 1:05-cv-02122-RMU(jeb, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number 07-7068 for [77] Notice of Appeal filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
            Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [77] Notice of Appeal (jf, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 USCA Appeal Fees
              USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 4616004623 re [77] Notice of Appeal filed by KAY SIEVERDING (jf, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 USCA Case Number
                USCA Case Number 07-5126 for [77] Notice of Appeal filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (tg, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [77] Notice of Appeal (jf, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [70] Order on Motion for Reconsideration by KAY SIEVERDING. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      Second MOTION for an ECF account by KAY SIEVERDING. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Memorandum & Opinion filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (tg, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                          Memorandum in opposition to re [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Memorandum & Opinion filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2)(Lamm, Carolyn)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                            Memorandum in opposition to re [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Memorandum & Opinion filed by WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS. (Attachments: # (1))(Schaefer, Jerome)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Memorandum & Opinion by ED SIEVERDING, DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 11/28/06. (md)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying [65] the plaintiffs' motion for relief from judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 11/28/06. (md)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/16/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    MOTION for clarification as to the status of her actions by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Leave to File Denied
                                      Leave to File Denied. Plaintiff's objection to the ABA's d.67 motion (jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [65] MOTION for Reconsideration re [62] Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [65] MOTION for Reconsideration re [62] Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [65] MOTION for Reconsideration re [62] Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS, JAMES B.F. OLIPHANT, FELDMAN, NAGEL & OLIPHANT. (Attachments: # (1))(Schaefer, Jerome)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 65 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [62] Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 7/17/06. (md)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [27] Motion to Dismiss, granting [16] Motion to Dismiss, granting [17] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 7/17/06.(md)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE re: certificate of service by KAY SIEVERDING (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Case Stayed
                                                      Case Stayed (md)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                        MOTION to Stay by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [59] AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice under duress of jail filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(jf, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice under duress of jail by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [46] Motion for Stay. The case is hereby stayed. Signed by Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/22/2005. (md)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                MOTION to Amend Pleadings to Conform With The Evidence by KAY SIEVERDING. (lc, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Motion to Expedite
                                                                  MOTION to Expedite summary judgment invalidating award to the 02-cv-1950 defendants and MOTION to Stay collections actions scheduled on 01-09-06 by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jerome Charles Schaefer on behalf of WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS Substituting for attorney Kevin A Kernan (Schaefer, Jerome)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                      REPLY to the ABA's opposition to MOTION to Compel re [48] filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Leave to File Denied
                                                                        Leave to File Denied. Plaintiff's letter re: motion for oral hearings (jf, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE of filing by KAY SIEVERDING (jf, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to motion re [48] To Compel Production of Affidavits filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [46] For a Stay or Enlargement of Time filed by ROUTT COUNTY COURT, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, JANE BENNETT. (Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Response to Document
                                                                                RESPONSE to Defense Motion for a stay filed by ED SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing re [27] [32]Plaintiffs' MOTION for summary judgment and Defendants', [16] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by ED SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Response to Document
                                                                                    RESPONSE to motion 47 ABA's refusal to supply proof of previous dispute of evidence filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                      MOTION to Compel by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re [44] Plaintiffs' Motion Under Rules 9(b) and 12(e) to Compel Defendants to Produce Evidence that they Previously Disputed Plaintiffs' Facts filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay or Enlarge Time In Which to Respond to Plaintiffs' Pending and Future Motions by ROUTT COUNTY COURT, WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to MOTION for counsel under Administrative Procedures Act re [31] filed by KAY SIEVERDING. (fiat) JUDGE RICARDO M. URBINA (jf, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by ED SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion for summary judgment re [32] filed by ED SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to motion re [31] request for counsel under APA and appointment of special prosecutor filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re [32] partial summary judgment filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Response to any document
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [32] [33] Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by ROUTT COUNTY COURT. (Moore, Danielle) Modified on 10/12/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re [32] for summary judgment filed by WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS. (Kernan, Kevin)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          MOTION For Special Prosecutor by KAY SIEVERDING. (lc, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                            ERRATA by ED SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Consolidated Objection and Motion for Summary Judgment)(jf, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [16] to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by ROUTT COUNTY COURT. (Moore, Danielle)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [27] to dismiss complaint filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to all defense motions until 20 days after Kay Sieverding is release from jail by KAY SIEVERDING. (fiat, JUDGE RICARDO M. URBINA) (jf, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                    URGENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                      MOTION for partical summary judgment that there is no claims preclusion or res judicata by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                        MOTION for counsel under Administrative Procedures Act by KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                          ERRATA to consolidated objection to defendant's three motions to dismiss by ED SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Response to Document
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (OBJECTION) to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint b [27], [17], [16] filed by ED SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DAVID SIEVERDING (individually) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005, Terminated: 7/17/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9))(Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. 18-26 were entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as one docket entry. (nmw, ) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Proposed Order by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit 7 by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit 6 by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit 5 by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit 4 by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit 3 by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit 2 by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1))(Panopoulos, Frank) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 7/17/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Kernan, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 7/17/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by ROUTT COUNTY COURT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Moore, Danielle)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The American Bar Association's answer is due on or before September 7, 2005. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/1/05. (md)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Panopoulos on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION (Panopoulos, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [3] Amended Complaint,, [1] Complaint, by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (lc, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Amended Complaint Executed. AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION served on 8/5/2005, answer due 8/25/2005 (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Amended Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. U.S. JUDICIARY, THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIAL BUILDING served on 8/5/2005, answer due 10/4/2005 (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 9/7/2005. (jwd)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of motion complaining that Ms. Moore is using Mr. Kernans' ECF account to deceive the court by DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [8] [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until September 7, 2005. The court further orders that the parties refrain from ex parte communications with chambers. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/19/05. (md)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 8/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by ROUTT COUNTY COURT. (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (OBJECTION) to Defendant's motion to delay response to plaintiff's complaint filed by DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING. (Attachments: # (1) Attachments)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005, Terminated: 8/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Errata D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H-1# (9) Exhibit H-2# (10) Exhibit H-3# (11) Exhibit H-4# (12) Exhibit H-5# (13) Exhibit H-6# (14) Exhibit H-7# (15) # (16) Text of Proposed Order)(Kernan, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Amended Complaint Executed. ROUTT COUNTY COURT served on 7/28/2005, answer due 8/17/2005; JANE BENNETT served on 7/28/2005, answer due 8/17/2005 (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER denying [4] Motion to use ECF. The plaintiffs should contact the Clerk's office for assistance on filing documents and viewing the case docket. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/5/05. (md)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHITE & STEELE served on 7/27/2005, answer due 8/16/2005; HALL AND EVANS LLC served on 7/27/2005, answer due 8/16/2005; WORLD COMPANY served on 7/28/2005, answer due 8/17/2005 (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons (10) Issued as to ROUTT COUNTY COURT, U.S. JUDICIARY, THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIAL BUILDING, WHITE & STEELE, HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS, JAMES B.F. OLIPHANT, FELDMAN, NAGEL & OLIPHANT. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of certificate of service by DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to allow plaintiffs to use the ECF system by DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HALL AND EVANS LLC, WORLD COMPANY, ROUTT COUNTY COURT, U.S. JUDICIARY, THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIAL BUILDING, WHITE & STEELE, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS, JAMES B.F. OLIPHANT, FELDMAN, NAGEL & OLIPHANTfiled by DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ED SIEVERDING, DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING. Case related to: Case No. 02-1950, 04-4317 & 05-02. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against ROUTT COUNTY COURT, U.S. JUDICIARY, THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIAL BUILDING, WHITE & STEELE, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS, JAMES B.F. OLIPHANT, FELDMAN, NAGEL & OLIPHANT (Filing fee $ 250) filed by ED SIEVERDING, DAVID SIEVERDING, KAY SIEVERDING, TOM SIEVERDING.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Summons Not Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Not Issued as to ROUTT COUNTY COURT, U.S. JUDICIARY, THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIAL BUILDING, WHITE & STEELE, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, JANE BENNETT, FAEGRE & BENSON, LLP, MCCONNELL SIDERIOUS, JAMES B.F. OLIPHANT, FELDMAN, NAGEL & OLIPHANT (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?