BOUIE v. BARNHART
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01655-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 12:27 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HAROLD S. BOUIE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kenneth R. Hiller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Hiller +1 716 564 3288 +1 716 332 1884 khiller@kennethhiller.com
v.
No Logo JOANNE BARNHART, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Elmore Haynes +1 202 514 7201 +1 202 514 8780 fred.haynes@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/16/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 99999
Terminated 12/13/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-C
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/13/2006. (lcrcl1, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Order on Motion for Judgment on the PleadingsCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [16] Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, granting [18] Motion for affirmance, and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/13/2006. (lcrcl1, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to [16] Motion for Judgment of Reversal filed by HAROLD S. BOUIE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affirmation of Service)(Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 5/31/2006 (tg, ).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006, Terminated: 12/13/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION Judgment of Affirmance and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal by JO ANNE BARNHART. (Haynes, Fred)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to [16] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JO ANNE BARNHART. (See document number 18 for scanned document) (tg, ) Modified on 5/3/2006 (tg, ).
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 12/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal by JO ANNE BARNHART. (Haynes, Fred)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006, Terminated: 12/13/2006 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by HAROLD S. BOUIE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affirmation of Service)(Hiller, Kenneth)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER setting deadlines for dispositive motions. Plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment of reversal by 2/27/06; defendant shall file motion for judgment of affirmance and opposition to plaintiff's motion by 3/26/06; plaintiff shall file a response by 4/13/06. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/22/06. (lcrcl2, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant'sCross Motions due by 3/26/2006. Response to Cross Motions due by 4/13/2006. Plaintiff'sDispositive Motions due by 2/27/2006. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2006. (mon, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                    MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Haynes, Fred)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER directing the parties to hold a Local Rule 16.3 conference within 15 days and to file a report with the court within 10 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/19/06. (lcrcl2, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Description not available
                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by JO ANNE BARNHART. (Haynes, Fred)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint by JO ANNE BARNHART.(Haynes, Fred)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/18/05. (lcrcl2, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 11/18/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JO ANNE BARNHART. (Haynes, Fred)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of JO ANNE BARNHART (Haynes, Fred)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on US Attorney Date of Service Upon US Attorney 08/28/2005. (Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 10/25/2005 (rje, ).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the JO ANNE BARNHART served on 8/28/2005, answer due 10/27/2005 (Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 10/25/2005 (rje, ).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 8/28/2005. (Hiller, Kenneth)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER that plaintiff shall, within the next ten (10) days, file with the Clerk of Court either proof of service or a status memorandum indicating all steps taken to date to effect service. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/5/2005. (lcrcl1, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [2] plaintiff's Motion to admit Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 19, 2005. (lcrcl2, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005, Terminated: 8/19/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            EXPARTE MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth R. Hiller. :Address- 2001 Niagara Falls Boulevard, Amherst, NY 14228. Phone No. - (716) 564-3288. by HAROLD S. BOUIE. (rje, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against JO ANNE BARNHART (Filing fee $ 250) filed by HAROLD S. BOUIE.(rje, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                SUMMONS (3) Issued as to JO ANNE BARNHART, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rje, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?