CLEVELAND v. CHERTOFF
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01709-GK
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Branch +1 202 785 2805 +1 202 785 0289 dablaw@erols.com
v.
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/26/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 12/29/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND, MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Smith, Peter)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/2/2007. (CS, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
      MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including January 2, 2007 in which to file a Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/28/06. (CS, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Status Conference
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 8/29/2006. Scheduling Order will be issued. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Protective OrderCourt Filing
            STIPULATED PRIVACY ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/14/06. (tth, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006, Terminated: 8/14/2006 Motion for Protective Order
              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                LREF
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                REPLY to opposition to motion re [17] MOTION to Dismiss Title VII Claims in Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Smith, Peter)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                  Memorandum in opposition to re [17] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (Attachments: # (1) order)(Branch, David)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Scheduling Order with MediationCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER WITH MEDIATION: Written discovery due 5/15/06. Discovery ends 9/1/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2006. Exchange Witness List due by 5/1/2006. Status Conference set for 8/29/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. This case is referred to mediation to commence August 1, 2006. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/24/06. (CS, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Meet and Confer Hearing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Initial Scheduling Conference held. Scheduling Order entered. Status Conference set for 8/29/2006 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. The case is referred to the Court's Mediation Program to commence 8/1/06.(Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Written discovery due by 5/15/06. Discovery ends 9/1/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2006. Exchange Witness List due by 5/1/2006. This case is referred to mediation to commence on August 1, 2006. Status Conference set for 8/29/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/8/2006 (CS, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [20] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 8, 2006 in which to file her opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/23/06. (CS, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 2/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [17] MOTION to Dismiss Title VII Claims in Amended Complaint by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (Branch, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Filing Amended Joint Report of Local Rule 16.3 Conference by MICHAEL CHERTOFF re [18] Meet and Confer Statement (Smith, Peter)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Smith, Peter)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Title VII Claims in Amended Complaint by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Amended Complaint
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL CHERTOFFfiled by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND.(tg, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                        ORDER denying as moot [7] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, granting [12] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Defendant may re-file his Motion to Dismiss; an Initial Scheduling Conference will be held in this case on February 24, 2006 at 9:45 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/3/06. (CS, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2006 09:45 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [7] filed by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Smith, Peter)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [12] filed by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Smith, Peter)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006, Terminated: 2/3/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Complaint)(Branch, David)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [7] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (Branch, David)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/9/2006 (CS, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 9, 2006 in which to file her response to the Court's November 10, 2005 Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/8/05. (CS, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 12/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] Order, by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (Branch, David)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Branch on behalf of MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND (Branch, David)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER that Plaintiff respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by December 10, 2005 of the Court will treat the Motion as granted and enter judgment in favor of Defendant . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/10/05. (CS, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 2/3/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/10/2005 (CS, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendnat shall have up to and including November 10, 2005 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/8/05. (CS, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 11/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MICHAEL CHERTOFF served on 9/9/2005, answer due 11/8/2005. (rje, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 9/9/2005. (rje, ) Modified on 9/19/2005 (rje, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Consent and Undertaking
                                                                        CONSENT to proceed before a United States magistrate judge for all purposes by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (rje, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of MICHAEL CHERTOFF (Smith, Peter)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT against MICHAEL CHERTOFF (Filing fee $ 250) filed by MARCIA HUGHES CLEVELAND. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Bulky Exhibit)(rje, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MICHAEL CHERTOFF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rje, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?