AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01771-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 1, 2017 at 12:11 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'DONNELL, SCHWARTZ & ANDERSON, P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anton Hajjar +1 202 898 1707 +1 202 682 9276 ahajjar@odsalaw.com
Space Melinda Kim Holmes +1 202 898 1707 +1 202 682 9276 mholmes@odsalaw.com
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherease Pratt +1 202 307 0895 sherease.pratt@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 39 U.S.C. § 1208 1970 Postal Act-enforced supervision by parent union
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County 11001
Terminated 8/7/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-K
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
Judgment in favor of defendant, United States Postal Service, and against plaintiff, American Postal Workers Union. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 7, 2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK, 1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 7, 2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK, 1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [19] Reply to opposition to Motion was entered in error because filings should only be made in the lead case. (zlc, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
        ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re (28 in 1:04-cv-01404-HHK) MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendant's Supplemental Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is no Genuine Issue, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of New Material Facts as to Which There is no Material Issue, and Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed Facts filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) Errata # (17) Errata # (18) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK, 1:05-cv-01771-HHK(Louis, Sherease) Modified on 4/2/2007 (zlc, ).
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Reset Deadlines: defendant's time to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition is extended to 3/30/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK, 1:05-cv-01771-HHK(ztj, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Terminate Motions
          Motion 15 terminated. (Kennedy, Henry)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
            Minute order granting [42] defendant's motion for an extension of time to file its reply memorandum to plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall have up to and including March 30, 2007, to file a reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on March 5, 2007. Official paperless order Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file an opposition and reply to defendant's motion for summary judgment and stay by 1/31/2007. Defendant's Reply due by 3/9/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(tj )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                Reset Hearings: Status Conference is reset for 4/11/2007 @ 09:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(tj )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/28/2006 Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(clv, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings: Initial scheduling conference set for October 26, 2006, at 9:45 a.m., in Courtroom 27A, before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Set Hearings
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., Initial scheduling conference set for October 26, 2006, at 9:45 a.m.,in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                        MINUTE ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time until August 28, 2006, to file Response to motion to strike and [25] Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference. The clerk of the court shall reschedule the Initial Scheduling Conference to take place in October, 2006, when the business of the court permits. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(Kennedy, Henry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          Order for Initial Scheduling Conference. Status conference set for August 10, 2006 at 9:45 a.m., in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 25, 2006. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [17] MOTION to Strike [21] Answer to Complaint, was entered in error was entered in error because it should not have been spread to the associated case. (lc, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 7/25/2006 Motion to Strike
                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Strike [21] Answer to Complaint, by AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(Holmes, Melinda) Modified on 7/25/2006 (lc, ).
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [16] Answer to Complaint, was entered in error because it should not have been spread to the associated case. (lc, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Answer
                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....I>Consolidated ANSWER to Complaint in both 04-1404 and 05-1771 by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO,.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(Burch, Alan) Modified on 7/24/2006 (lc, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                    Minute order granting [15] defendant's consent motion to enlarge time to oppose plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall have up to and including August 28, 2006, to file an opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before September 11, 2006. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 12, 2006. Official paperless order Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(FL, ) Modified on 7/12/2006 (FL, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006, Terminated: 3/13/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [19] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Facts by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(Burch, Alan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Facts by AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum# (2) Declaration - Guffey# (3) Exhibit Declaration - Guffey Ex 1# (4) Exhibit Declaration - Guffey Ex 2# (5) Exhibit Declaration - Guffey Ex 3# (6) Exhibit Declaration - Guffey Ex 4# (7) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01404-HHK,1:05-cv-01771-HHK(Holmes, Melinda)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                          Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on March 23, 2006. (FL, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Create Case Association
                                            Cases associated. All further submissions related to the consolidated cases (04-1404 and 05-1771) be filed in 04-1404. (lc, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Smith, Peter)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/10/2006. (rew, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                  Minute order granting [11] defendant's motion for enlargement of time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant has up to and including January 10, 2006, within which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on December 22, 2005. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [10] Memorandum in Opposition, by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [9] Defendant?s Motion to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, for Consolidation and Stay filed by AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D.# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H.# (10) Exhibit I)(Holmes, Melinda)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [8] MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Stay, [7] MOTION to Dismiss or for Consolidation and Stay were entered in error and have been refiled by the Court in the correct category (see docket entry #9). (lc, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gary H. Mullins# (2) Affidavit Mary Hercules# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(lc, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Stay by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Smith, Peter) Modified on 12/6/2005 (lc, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Dismiss or for Consolidation and Stay by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gary H. Mullins# (2) Affidavit Mary Hercules# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) Modified on 12/6/2005 (lc, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                              Minute order granting [6] defendant's consent motion for enlargement of time to file answer. Defendant has up to and including December 5, 2005, within which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 9, 2005. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 11/9/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Smith, Peter)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 9/10/2005, answer due 11/9/2005 (Holmes, Melinda)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 09/10/05. (Holmes, Melinda)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Related Case
                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO. Case related to Case No. 04-1404. (lc, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Filing fee $ 250) filed by AMERICAN POSTAL WORKERS UNION, AFL-CIO.(lc, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?