UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $6,138.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01879-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo $6,138.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/22/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County 11001
Terminated 5/2/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of Plaintiff, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Defendant, $6,138.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/2/06. (dot, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
    MOTION for Default Judgment as to $6,138.00, MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1))(Kidwell, Judith)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Clerks Entry of Default*
    Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $6,138.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (nmw, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Affidavit for Default
      AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (nmw, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Substitution of Counsel
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Michael Humphreys (Humphreys, Michael) Modified on 1/20/2006 (nmw, ).
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Summons Returned Executed
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Arrest in Rem executed. $6,138.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005 (td, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against $6,138.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (Filing fee $ 250) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(td, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Warrant Issued
              WARRANT of for arrest in rem (1) issued (td, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 73 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?