ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL v. LEAVITT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01944-GK
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher L. Crosswhite +1 202 776 7846 +1 202 776 7801 clcrosswhite@duanemorris.com
v.
No Logo MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/3/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 151 - Contract: Medicare Act
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1395 HHS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 3/13/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-C
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Stipulation
STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice by ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Crosswhite, Christopher)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
    MINUTE ORDER granting [24] the parteis' Joint Motion for Leave to File Status Report Out of time; the proceedings in this case are stayed until May 15, 2008, pending the proposed settlement between the parties. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/4/06. (CL, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008, Terminated: 2/4/2008 Motion for Leave to File
      Joint MOTION for Leave to File Status Report Out of Time, and Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007, Terminated: 11/15/2007 Motion to Stay
        Joint MOTION to Stay and Joint Status Report by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/15/2008. Status Report due by 1/15/2008. (CL, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
            MINUTE ORDER granting [23] the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer or Respond; the parties shall submit an additional status report on January 15, 2008; Defendant shall have until February 15, 2008 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/15/07. (CL, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 Motion to Vacate
              Joint MOTION to Vacate Initial Scheduling Order and Supplement To Pending Joint Motion To Stay Time To Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Order on Motion to Vacate
                MINUTE ORDER granting [22] the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate the Initial Scheduling Conference (ISC); the ISC is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/29/07. (CL, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/14/2007. Status Report due by 11/15/2007. (CL, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
                    MINUTE ORDER granting [19] the parties' Joint Motion to Stay; Defendant shall have up to and including December 14, 2007 in which to respond to the Complaint and the parties are to file a Status Report by November 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/29/07. (CL, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      Case Reassigned to Judge Gladys Kessler. Judge John Garrett Penn no longer assigned to the case. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for November 6, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 26A. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/24/07. (CL, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                          Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                            Case Reassigned to Judge Unassigned until 10/16/07 after the conclusion of the CJRA Period.(jeb, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 Motion to Stay
                              Joint MOTION to Stay Time To Answer Or Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer to the complaint due by 10/15/2007. (cp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [18] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before October 15, 2007. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on August 10, 2007. (lcjgp1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007, Terminated: 8/10/2007 Motion to Stay
                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 ERRATA
                                      ERRATA by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT [15] Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond filed by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007, Terminated: 6/13/2007 Motion to Stay
                                        Joint MOTION to Stay Time To Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007, Terminated: 6/13/2007 Motion to Stay
                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter) Modified on 6/13/2007 (jf, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to complaint due by 8/13/2007. (cp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [15] Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond was entered in error and was refiled with corrected pleading. See entry # [16]. (jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [16] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before August 13, 2007. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 13, 2007. (lcjgp1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 6/13/2007. (ks, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [14] Joint Motion To Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 13, 2007. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on April 13, 2007. (lcjgp1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007, Terminated: 4/13/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay Time To Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Bryce, Peter)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 13, 2007. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on February 12, 2007. (lcjgp1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/11/2007, Entered: 2/11/2007, Terminated: 2/12/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/12/2006. (adc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 13, 2007. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on December 12, 2006. (lcjgp1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006, Terminated: 12/12/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay Time To Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [11] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before December 15, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on October 18, 2006. (lcjgp1) Modified on 10/18/2006 (lcjgp1).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall Response to complaint due by 10/15/2006. (rje)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [9] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond [9]. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before October 15, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on August 18, 2006. (lcjgp1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/18/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                            ORDER granting [8] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before August 15, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 15, 2006. (lcjgp1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006, Terminated: 6/15/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay Time to Answer/Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [7] Joint Motion to Stay Time to Answer/Respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 16, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on April 26, 2006. (lcjgp1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006, Terminated: 4/26/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay Time To Answer/Respond by ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before April 17, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on February 8, 2006. (lcjgp1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 2/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [3] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant to answer or respond to the complaint on or before February 15, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on November 29, 2005. (lcjgp1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005, Terminated: 11/29/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                                            LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (rje, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Complaint
                                                                                              COMPLAINT against MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Filing fee $ 250) filed by ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(rje, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                              SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rje, )
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?