WOODRUFF v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02071-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 6:10 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Phillips, Woodruff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF +1 301 868 9383
v.
Federal Aviation Administration Federal Aviation Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo NORMAN Y. MINETA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/21/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 3/30/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5239'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to [41] Notice of Appeal filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to file a surreply be denied; directing that the motion for summary affirmance be granted. (USCA No. 07-5239) (kb)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 USCA Case Number
    USCA Case Number 07-5239 for [41] Notice of Appeal filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (td, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [39] Order, [40] Memorandum & Opinion, by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616005336. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
        Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [41] Notice of Appeal (td, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
          OPINION granting defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's due process claim and defendants' motion for summary judgment with respect to plaintiff's age and disability discrimination claims and his claim of retaliation. An amended order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 9, 2007. (MA)
            LREF
            Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
            AMENDED ORDER granting [18] defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 9, 2007. (MA)
              LREF
              Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [18] defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting [18] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 30, 2007. (MA)
                LREF
                Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Surreply
                SURREPLY to defendants' reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (td, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [34] Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, granting [23] Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply, denying [24] Motion for Permission to Conduct Discovery, and denying [26] Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 08/31/06. (lcplf1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [26] MOTION to Strike [25] Amended Complaint filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN Y. MINETA. (Smith, Peter)
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006, Terminated: 8/31/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                      MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (tg, ) (See docket number 33 for scanned document)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Response to Document
                        RESPONSE to Defendant's [26] MOTION to Strike [25] Amended Complaint filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(tg, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                          REPLY to opposition to [23] MOTION for Leave to Respond to Defendant's Reply filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                            REPLY to opposition to motion [24] MOTION for permission to conduct discovery filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(tg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 ERRATA
                              ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN Y. MINETA [28] Memorandum in Opposition filed by NORMAN Y. MINETA,, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION,, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,, [27] Memorandum in Opposition filed by NORMAN Y. MINETA,, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION,, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,. (Smith, Peter)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 ERRATA
                                ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN Y. MINETA [26] MOTION to Strike [25] Amended Complaint filed by NORMAN Y. MINETA,, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION,, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,. (Smith, Peter)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [23] MOTION for Leave to File filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN Y. MINETA. (Smith, Peter)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [24] MOTION for permission to conduct discovery filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN Y. MINETA. (Smith, Peter)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006, Terminated: 8/31/2006 Motion to Strike
                                      MOTION to Strike [25] Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN Y. MINETA. (Smith, Peter)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Amended Complaint
                                        (Second) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NORMAN Y. MINETA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF.(td, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION for permission to conduct discovery by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                            MOTION for Leave to File response to defendants reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's amendd complaint or, in the alternative for summary judgment by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit Surreply# (3) Text of Proposed Order Surreply Order)(td, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Surreply
                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .SURREPLY to re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, ) Modified on 7/31/2006 (td, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [22] Surreply was entered in error and counsel was refiled with document no. [23].(td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Smith, Peter)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (td, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [19] plaintiff's motion for extension of time up to and including June 16, 2006 to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 15, 2006. (MA)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Exhibit # (10) Exhibit # (11) Exhibit # (12) Exhibit # (13) Exhibit # (14) Exhibit # (15) Exhibit # (16) Exhibit # (17) Exhibit # (18) Exhibit # (19) Exhibit # (20) Statement of Facts # (21) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTAITON filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (FIAT "Let this be filed" Judge Paul L. Friedman)(td, ) Modified on 4/26/2006 (td, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [11] defendans' motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement, and denying [12] defendants' motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 6, 2006. (MA)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] MOTION to Transfer Case, [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement or for Transfer filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                Memorandum in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement or for Transfer [11] [12] filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER advising plaintiff that he must respond to defendant's motion to dismiss by 2/15/2006. If plaintiff does not respond, the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/30/2006. (bm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006, Terminated: 3/6/2006 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                                    MOTION to Transfer Case by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006, Terminated: 3/6/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement or for Transfer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Reply to Document
                                                                      REPLY [9] to defendant's memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for reversal of defendant's motion for enlargement of time to file answer filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [8] Motion for reversal of defendant's enlargement of time to file answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/4/2006. (lcplf1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [8] filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          MOTION for reversal of defendant's enlargement of time to file answer re minute Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Response to Document
                                                                            RESPONSE to [3] defendant's enlargement of time to answer filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served Secertary of Transportation Norman Y. Mineta on 11/7/2005, answer due 1/6/2006. (td, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served Chief Counsel Andrew B. Steinberg on 11/5/2005, answer due 1/4/2006. (td, ) Modified on 12/29/2005 (td, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 11/7/05. (td, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [3] defendant's motion for enlargement of time up to and including January 27, 2006 to file answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 23, 2005. (MA)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of all defendants (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION (Filing fee $ 250) filed by PHILLIP S. WOODRUFF.(td, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                            SUMMONS (4) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 232 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?