UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR, VIN #5LMFU28A8YLJ36287
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02125-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space Diane G. Lucas +1 202 514 7912 +1 202 514 9155 diane.lucas@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo One, Defendant
Officially listed as "ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR, VIN #5LMFU28A8YLJ36287"
No Logo JESSE A. ARCHIBALD, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Keith McDaniel +1 202 331 0793 +1 202 331 7004 bkmassociates@aol.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/1/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 11001
Terminated 4/26/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER AND JUDGMENT signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on April 26, 2007 of forfeiture. of property identified One 2000 Lincoln Navigator SUV Vin: 5LMFU28A8YLJ36287. (jwd)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
    MINUTE ORDER granting [7] Motion for Summary Judgment, with prejudice. The defendant has failed to oppose the motion; the court deems this failure a concession of the motion. LCvR 7(b); Fox v. American Airlines, Inc., 389 F.3d 1291, 1295 (D.C. Cir. 2004) ("as we have observed, '[w]here the district court relies on the absence of a response as a basis for treating the motion as conceded, we honor its enforcement of the rule'"). Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 4/26/07. (djr)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007, Terminated: 4/26/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
      MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit Deposition of Jesse Archibald# (3) Exhibit Complaint# (4) Exhibit Judgment# (5) Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts# (6) Exhibit Affidavit of Publication)(Lucas, Diane)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Substitution of Counsel
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Michael Humphreys (Humphreys, Michael) Modified on 1/19/2006 (nmw, ).
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint [1] by JESSE A. ARCHIBALD.(jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Claim
            CLAIM to ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR, VIN #5LMFU28A8YLJ36287With all appurtenances and attachments thereon [1] by JESSE A. ARCHIBALD. (jf, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Summons Returned Executed
              WARRANT Executed. ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR, VIN #5LMFU28A8YLJ36287 served on 11/3/2005(jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR, VIN #5LMFU28A8YLJ36287 (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Summons Issued
                  Summons (1) Issued as to ONE 2000 LINCOLN NAVIGATOR, VIN #5LMFU28A8YLJ36287. (jf, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Warrant Issued
                    WARRANT (1) of for arrest in rem issued (jf, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 91 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?