UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 1995 MERCEDES BENZ S420, VIN WDBGA43E1SA260011
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02263-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo One, Defendant
Officially listed as "ONE 1995 MERCEDES BENZ S420, VIN WDBGA43E1SA260011"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/22/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County 11001
Terminated 4/28/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of United States against one 1995 Mercedes Benz S240. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 4/26/2006. (alr, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006, Terminated: 4/28/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
    MOTION for Default Judgment as to and Judgment of Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Kidwell, Judith)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Clerks Entry of Default*
    Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ONE 1995 MERCEDES BENZ S420, VIN WDBGA43E1SA260011 (lc, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Affidavit for Default
      AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1))(Kidwell, Judith)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Substitution of Counsel
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Anthony Humphreys on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Michael Humphreys (Humphreys, Michael)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Summons Returned Executed
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ONE 1995 MERCEDES BENZ S420, VIN WDBGA43E1SA260011 served on 12/2/2005, answer due 12/22/2005 (lc, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Notice of Related Case
          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Criminal Case No. 05-202. (jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against ONE 1995 MERCEDES BENZ S420, VIN WDBGA43E1SA260011 (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Warrant Issued
              WARRANT (1) of for forfeiture issued, Summons (1) Issued as to ONE 1995 MERCEDES BENZ S420, VIN WDBGA43E1SA260011. (jf, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 80 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?