ROANE et al v. GONZALES et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02337-RWR-DAR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2019 at 1:43 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CORY JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Christopher Toll +1 202 737 8616 jtoll@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Anthony Zdebski +1 202 274 2909 +1 202 654 5632 charles.zdebski@troutmansanders.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham E. Eddy +1 202 639 6784 geddy@velaw.com
No Logo JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F Enzinna +1 202 639 7700 +1 202 585 1086 paul.enzinna@bakerbotts.com
Space Jeremy Isaac Levin +1 202 639 7734 +1 202 585 1029 jeremy.levin@bakerbotts.com
Space Rachel M. McKenzie +1 202 639 1314 +1 202 639 1190 rachel.mckenzie@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Christopher Toll +1 202 737 8616 jtoll@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham E. Eddy +1 202 639 6784 geddy@velaw.com
No Logo RICHARD TIPTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Anthony Zdebski +1 202 274 2909 +1 202 654 5632 charles.zdebski@troutmansanders.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Christopher Toll +1 202 737 8616 jtoll@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham E. Eddy +1 202 639 6784 geddy@velaw.com
v.
No Logo HARLEY G. LAPPIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Erickson +1 202 514 2841 +1 202 305 2121 robert.erickson@usdoj.gov
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 john.henault@usdoj.gov
Space Madelyn E. Johnson +1 202 514 7135 +1 202 514 8780 madelyn.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Does, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 john.henault@usdoj.gov
Space Madelyn E. Johnson +1 202 514 7135 +1 202 514 8780 madelyn.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo KAREN TANDY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Erickson +1 202 514 2841 +1 202 305 2121 robert.erickson@usdoj.gov
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 john.henault@usdoj.gov
Space Madelyn E. Johnson +1 202 514 7135 +1 202 514 8780 madelyn.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo MARK BEZY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Erickson +1 202 514 2841 +1 202 305 2121 robert.erickson@usdoj.gov
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 john.henault@usdoj.gov
Space Madelyn E. Johnson +1 202 514 7135 +1 202 514 8780 madelyn.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F Enzinna +1 202 639 7700 +1 202 585 1086 paul.enzinna@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
No Logo NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Erickson +1 202 514 2841 +1 202 305 2121 robert.erickson@usdoj.gov
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 john.henault@usdoj.gov
Space Madelyn E. Johnson +1 202 514 7135 +1 202 514 8780 madelyn.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo THOMAS WEBSTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Erickson +1 202 514 2841 +1 202 305 2121 robert.erickson@usdoj.gov
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 john.henault@usdoj.gov
Space Madelyn E. Johnson +1 202 514 7135 +1 202 514 8780 madelyn.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo ANTHONY BATTLE, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abigail Bortnick +1 202 626 5502 +1 202 626 3737 abortnick@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Christopher Toll +1 202 737 8616 jtoll@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kevin McNally

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret O'Donnell +1 502 227 2142 +1 502 227 4669 mod@dcr.net

Toggle Switch Represented by The Eggnatz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. Hoffmann, Jr. +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5136 wehjrlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham E. Eddy +1 202 639 6784 geddy@velaw.com
No Logo BRUCE WEBSTER, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Christopher Toll +1 202 737 8616 jtoll@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham E. Eddy +1 202 639 6784 geddy@velaw.com
Space William E. Lawler, III +1 202 639 6676 +1 202 639 6604 wlawler@velaw.com
Space Jeanne Vosberg Sourgens +1 202 639 6633 +1 202 639 6604
Space Robert E. Waters +1 202 737 0500 rwaters@velaw.com
No Logo ORLANDO HALL, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Christopher Toll +1 202 737 8616 jtoll@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Owen James Bonheimer +1 202 429 6266 obonheimer@steptoe.com
Space Matthew John Herrington +1 202 429 8164 +1 202 429 3902 mherrington@steptoe.com
Space Mark Joseph Hulkower +1 202 429 6221 +1 202 429 3902 mhulkower@steptoe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham E. Eddy +1 202 639 6784 geddy@velaw.com
No Logo RICHARD VEACH, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County 88888
Terminated 2/5/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED, STAYED, TYPE-E
  Entries (461) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 358 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 336 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER; granting 334 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Barring the Scheduling of His Execution and Barring His Execution, Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/3/2014. (hs), (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 335 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, JEFFREY PAUL, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 334 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Barring the Scheduling of His Execution and Barring His Execution by JEFFREY PAUL (jf, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Paul's motion 228 to intervene as of right. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/24/14. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 296 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by JEFFREY PAUL ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded with a direction that the district court grant Paul's motion to intervene as of right, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 12-5020. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion)(md, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 331 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HOLDER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ORLANDO HALL. Attorney Jody A. Cummings terminated. (Cummings, Jody) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA as to 296 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by JEFFREY PAUL ; ORDERED that the motions for summary affirmance and reversal be denied. USCA Case Number 12-5020. (md, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ORLANDO HALL, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Donald P. Salzman on behalf of CORY JOHNSON (Salzman, Donald) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 310 Order ;USCA Case Number 12-05020. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to transmit a copy of this opinion and the record of this case to the Clerk of the court of appeals forthwith in satisfaction of that courts remand order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/15/12. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ORLANDO HALL. Attorney Owen James Bonheimer terminated. (Bonheimer, Owen) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Levin, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by JOHN DOES, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by MARK BEZY, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 296 Notice of Appeal,. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by JEFFREY PAUL re 259 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Jeffrey Paul's motion 228 to intervene, 260 ORDER , 294 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Paul's motion 261 for reconsideration and denying as moot the defendants' motion 276 to strike Paul's supplement . Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2809926. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (O'Brien, Sean) Modified on 1/30/2012 (jf, ). (Entered: 01/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 294 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Paul's motion 261 for reconsideration and denying as moot the defendants' motion 276 to strike Paul's supplement. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/29/11. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by ERIC HOLDER, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue the August 2, 2011 Status Conference and Briefing Schedule Governing the Above-Captioned Matter by ERIC HOLDER, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue June 8, 2011 Motion Hearing and Briefing Schedule by ERIC HOLDER, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for an Order Establishing a Deadline for Defendants to Supplement Discovery, if Appropriate, and to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline for Filing Motion to Reopen Discovery by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, ERIC HOLDER, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) Modified on 5/25/2011 to correct attorney general (jf, ). (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Reopen Discovery by ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, CORY JOHNSON, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, BRUCE WEBSTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul F. Enzinna (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Supplementation of Discovery as Required by the Court's May 3, 2011 Minute Order by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Yousri H. Omar on behalf of BRUCE WEBSTER (Omar, Yousri) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (Joint) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn B. Codd on behalf of BRUCE WEBSTER (Codd, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BRUCE WEBSTER. Attorney Graham E. Eddy terminated. (Eddy, Graham) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Modify the Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION Modify the Briefing Schedule by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike , or Alternatively, MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 1/4/2011 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Resolution of Motion 271 . (ls, ) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental re 261 MOTION for Reconsideration re 260 Order denying Jeffrey Paul's motion 228 to intervene by JEFFREY PAUL (O'Brien, Sean) Modified on 12/27/2010 to correct docket text (jf, ). (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO THE COURT by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAMES H. ROANE, JR. Attorney Rachel M. McKenzie terminated. (McKenzie, Rachel) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION Modify the Briefing Schedule by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF 251 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs to Pay the Expert Fees of the January 18, 2010 Deposition of Dr. Mark Dershwitz, Defendants' Expert by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Parties' Stipulation as to Expert Costs)(Russell, Beverly) Modified on 9/9/2010 to add link (jf, ). (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Joint) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION Modify Briefing Schedule by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Continue the August 5, 2010 Motions Hearing and Memorandum in Support Thereof by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 261 MOTION for Reconsideration re 260 Order filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Mr. Jeffrey Paul's Motion to Reconsider [R. 261], and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Unopposed) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Jeffrey Paul's Motion to Reconsider [R. 261], and Memorandum in Support Thereof by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Expert Reports and Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 260 Order by JEFFREY PAUL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(O'Brien, Sean) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER accompanying Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/1/10. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 259 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Jeffrey Paul's motion 228 to intervene. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/1/10. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 188 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Surreply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY to re [187] Surreply, Redacted filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert P. Boxie, III, :Firm- Vinson & Elkins LLP, :Address- 1455 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Suite 600, Washington, DC 20004-1008. Phone No. - 202-639-6500. Fax No. - 202-639-6604 by BRUCE WEBSTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eddy, Graham) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Surreply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' SURREPLY to re [160] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (tr, )(FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Expert Reports, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 186 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Surreply Regarding Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of Plaintiffs' Executions by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Supplemental Expert Report of Richard I. Cook, M.D. by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved for leave to file a surreply in excess of the page limit. Such extensions are ordinarily disfavored, but since the extension here is sought after the defendants filed without leave of court an oversized reply [177], it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' unopposed motion [186] for leave to file their surreply in excess of the page limit be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/15/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Expert Reports by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' consent motion [183] for leave to file their surreply under seal, and plaintiffs' consent motion [185] for an extension of time until August 15, 2008 to file their surreply be, and hereby are, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/14/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 251 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs to Pay the Expert Fees of the January 18, 2010 Deposition of Dr. Mark Dershwitz, Defendants' Expert filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11. The Parties' Interrogatories)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 185 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Pay the Expert Fees of the January 18, 2010 Deposition of Dr. Mark Dershwitz by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 184 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA by JAMES H. ROANE, JR [183] MOTION for Leave to File filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,. (Attachments: # (1) Errata)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 251 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs to Pay the Expert Fees of the January 18, 2010 Deposition of Dr. Mark Dershwitz, Defendants' Expert filed by ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, CORY JOHNSON, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, BRUCE WEBSTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Eddy, Graham) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 183 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs to Pay the Expert Fees of the January 18, 2010 Deposition of Dr. Mark Dershwitz, Defendants' Expert by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Deposition of Mark Dershwitz, January 18, 2010, # 2 Exhibit 2. Dershwitz Invoices, # 3 Exhibit 3. Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery (Excerpt), # 4 Exhibit 4. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery (Excerpt), # 5 Exhibit 5. E-Mails, October 23, 2009, # 6 Exhibit 6. Letter from Paul Enzinna to Beverly Russell, November 18, 2009, # 7 Exhibit 7. Letter from Beverly Russell to Paul Enzinna, December 16, 2009, # 8 Exhibit 8. Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' Executions (Excerpt), # 9 Exhibit 9. E-Mails, January 21, 2010, # 10 Exhibit 10. E-Mails, January 27, 2010, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: surreply due by 8/14/2008. (zlin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on 10/20/2009; Page Numbers: 1-67. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bowles Reporting Service, Telephone number (860) 464-1083, For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2010.(znmw, ) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' unopposed motion [181] for an extension of time until August 14, 2008 to file their surreply be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/12/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintffs' Discovery Requests by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 181 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008, Terminated: 8/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the Deposition of Dr. Mark Dershwitz by ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, CORY JOHNSON, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, BRUCE WEBSTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eddy, Graham) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion [180] for leave to file a surreply be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/29/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Megan McCracken, :Address- 4626 Cedar Avenue Philadelphia, PA 19143. Phone No. - 267-997-3510. by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan McCracken, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 180 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008, Terminated: 7/29/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Response by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 228 MOTION to Intervene filed by JEFFREY PAUL. (Proctor, Gary) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 179 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of "Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' Executions" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1. Addendum to BOP Execution Protocol, Effective August 1, 2008, # (2) Exhibit 7. Addendum to BOP Execution Protocol, Effective July 1, 2007, # (3) Exhibit 12. BOP Execution Protocol (Redacted))(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 245 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Reply in Support of Their Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. re 213 Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 178 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing, Under Seal, the Confidential, Unredacted Version of "Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' Executions" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete National Crime Information Center ("NCIC") Checks and Depositions by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 177 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [160] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1. Addendum to Protocol, Aug. 1, 2008, # (2) Exhibit 5. Taylor v. Crawford, No. 05-4173-CV-C-FJG (W.D. Mo. Jan. 31, 2006)(Order), # (3) Exhibit 7. Addendum to Protocol, Effective July 1, 2007, # (4) Exhibit 9. Jackson v. Danberg, Civ. No. 06-300-SLR (D.Del. June 27, 2008)(Order), # (5) Exhibit 10. Walker v. Epps, Civil Action No. 4:07CV176-P-B (N.D.Miss. July 15, 2008)(Mem. Op.), # (6) Exhibit 11. Clemons v. Crawford, Case No. 07-4129-CV-C-FJG (W.D.Mo. July 15, 2008)(Order))(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply by JEFFREY PAUL (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Proctor, Gary) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' unopposed motion [176] for an extension of time until July 18, 2008 to file their replies be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/17/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 242 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 228 MOTION to Intervene and for a Preliminary Injunction filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Paul v. United States of America, No. 05-3431(8th Cir.)(Mem. Op. July 22, 2008), # 2 Exhibit 2. Supreme Court Letter Regarding Denial of Paul's Petition for Certiorari, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 176 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008, Terminated: 7/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' Executions by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ON REQUEST FOR LIMITED WRITTEN DISCOVERY ON LACHES by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CORY JOHNSON, KAREN TANDY. (Bonheimer, Owen) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 7/16/2008. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John Richard Gerstein, I on behalf of RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Gerstein, John) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 175 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [161] MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Nooner v. Norris, No. 5:06CV00110 SWW (E.D. Ark)(Order, Aug. 9, 2007))(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report on Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff Intervenors' Request for Limited Written Discovery on Laches by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CORY JOHNSON, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonheimer, Owen) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 174 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [159] MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Mr. Jeffrey Paul's Motion to Intervene and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Barring the Scheduling of His Execution and Barring His Execution (Renewed) by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' consent motion [172] for an extension of time until June 27, 2008 to file their reply memoranda in support of their renewed motion to dismiss and motion to stay discovery, and for an extension of time until July 16, 2008 to file their reply in support of their renewed motion for judgment on the pleadings, be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/26/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Mr. Jeffrey Paul's Motion to Intervene and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Barring the Scheduling of His Execution and Barring His Execution by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 173 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing, Under Seal, the Unredacted Version of "Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal and Ex Parte" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cooey v. Strickland)(Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 172 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008, Terminated: 6/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Owen James Bonheimer on behalf of ORLANDO HALL (Bonheimer, Owen) Modified on 10/20/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 171 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [162] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal and Ex Parte filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Gary E. Proctor on behalf of JEFFREY PAUL Substituting for attorney Douglas G. Robinson (Proctor, Gary) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/24/2008. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Surreply (Doc. No. 227) by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 170 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 232 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 227 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul) Modified on 10/7/2009 (td, ). (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' unopposed motion [170] for an extension of time until June 24, 2008 to file their reply memoranda be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/16/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Reynolds v. Strickland)(Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [161] MOTION to Stay Discovery, [159] MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed), [160] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) filed by BRUCE WEBSTER. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Lee McGlasson, :Address- 1024 Clairemont Avenue, Decatur, GA 30030. Phone No. - (404) 314-7664. Fax No. - (404) 879-0005 by JEFFREY PAUL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean Dennis O'Brien, :Firm- Public Interest Litigation Clinic, :Address- 6155 Oak, Suite C, Kansas City, MO 64113. Phone No. - (816) 363-2795. Fax No. - (816) 363-2799 by JEFFREY PAUL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' consent motion [163] for leave to file under seal their oppositions be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/11/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 228 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene by JEFFREY PAUL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Text of Proposed Order -Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' unopposed motion [168] for an extension of time until 6/16/08 to file their reply memoranda be, and hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/11/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 168 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Memoranda by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 226 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Their Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to [162] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal and Ex Parte filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified to correct filing date on 6/6/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Their Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 06/04/08 granting [165]Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to File under Seal their opposition to Defendants' Motion to file Documents Under Seal and Ex Parte. (lcdar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE OF SEPTEMBER 16, 2009 by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, RICHARD VEACH, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CORY JOHNSON, KAREN TANDY. (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA by JAMES H. ROANE, JR [165] MOTION for Leave to File filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, RICHARD VEACH, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CORY JOHNSON, KAREN TANDY. (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/5/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Dickens, et al. v. Brewer, No. CV07-1770-PHX-NVW (D.Ariz. July 1, 2009)(Order), # 2 Harbison v. Little, No. 07-6225(6th Cir. July 2, 2009)(Opinion))(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 164 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION re [140] MOTION for Leave to File by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 219 MOTION To Deem Plaintiffs Motion To Modify The Protective Order Re-Filed And Briefed And To Deem Plaintiffs Motion For Limited Additional Discovery And To Compel Re-Filed And Briefed In Part filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 6/12/2008. (zlin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE MEMORANDUM re 219 MOTION To Deem Plaintiffs Motion To Modify The Protective Order Re-Filed And Briefed And To Deem Plaintiffs Motion For Limited Additional Discovery And To Compel Re-Filed And Briefed In Part filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR., by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY. (Russell, Beverly) Modified to add docket text on 6/16/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before June 12, 2008, plaintiffs show cause in writing why Robinson v. Mukasey, et al., Civil Action No. 07-2145 (RWR) (D.D.C.) should not be consolidated with this case for all purposes, allowing only limited, if any, discovery regarding Robinson to be taken. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/2/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION To Deem Plaintiffs Motion To Modify The Protective Order Re-Filed And Briefed And To Deem Plaintiffs Motion For Limited Additional Discovery And To Compel Re-Filed And Briefed In Part by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 6/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Lift Stays of Execution, Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery, and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by BRUCE WEBSTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, MOTION for Leave to File Their Reply in Support of Their Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument with respect to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Protective Order currently scheduled for Monday, June 2, 2008 is VACATED pending completion of briefing with respect to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (Document No. 161) and Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal and Ex Parte (Document No. 162). (lcdar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE REPLY by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal and Ex Parte by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing, Under Seal, "Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: In light of defendants' renewed motion [159] to dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion [13] to dismiss be, and hereby is, DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/19/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' 213 Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery (Redacted) filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Addendum to BOP Execution Protocol, July 1, 2007 and Aug. 1, 2008, # 2 Exhibit 4. Clemons v. Crawford, Case No. 07-4129-CV-C-FJG (Protective Order, April 17, 2008), # 3 Exhibit 4-2. Jackson v. Danberg, C.A. No. 06-300-SLR (D.Del.)(Protective Order and Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order), # 4 Exhibit 4-3. Taylor v. Crawford, No. 05-4173-CV-C-SOW (W.D.Mo.)(Protective Order, Oct. 31, 2005), # 5 Exhibit 5. Seattle Times Article, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) Modified on 5/20/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 161 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Discovery by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to "Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 160 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) and, MOTION to Lift Stay (Renewed) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM Regarding Additional Discovery by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, ) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 159 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to "Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings: Oral Argument with respect to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Protective Order is set for Monday, June 2, 2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Counsel shall meet and confer in a further effort to resolve the issue which is the subject of the motion. (lcdar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Additional Discovery by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 158 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs' Addendum) by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Order For Leave to File Under Seal, MOTION for Judgment, MOTION for Leave to File by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 157 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the plaintiffs to file a memorandum by April 30, 2009 detailing what additional discovery they seek before the defendants' motion to lift the stays currently in place should be considered and proposing a schedule for conducting such discovery, and permitting the defendants to file a memorandum in response by May 7, 2009.Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/20/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re [154] Notice (Other) filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - May 1, 2008 Letter from Beverly Russell to Paul Enzinna)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying in part the defendants' renewed motion for judgment on the pleadings 160 , and granting in part and denying in part the defendants' renewed motion to dismiss 159 .Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/20/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 154 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Clemons v. Crawford, Case No. 07-4129-CV-C-FJG (W.D.Mo.)(Protective Order))(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Motion to Redact Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Redact re: Transcript 206 by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 155 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [143] MOTION for Modification of Protective Order filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (REDACTED) (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson of proceedings held on 1/21/2009; Page Numbers: 1-58. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bowles Reporting Service, Telephone number (860) 464-1083, For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2009.(nmw, ) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 153 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to [143] MOTION for Modification of Protective Order filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Discovery by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY. (jf, ) Modified on 3/16/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 152 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF PLAINTIFFS AND INTERVENOR PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND INTERVENOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 200 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Discovery filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 4/17/08 granting [151] Consent Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify The Protective Order. (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Order by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 151 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008, Terminated: 4/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND INTERVENOR PLAINTIFFS by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing, Under Seal, Defendants' Opposition to "Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Additional Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition," and Defendants' Motion to Stay Further Discovery Pending Disposition on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss, and Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Executions by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 150 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BRUCE WEBSTER. Attorney Alexander Owen Levine terminated. (Levine, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to "Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Discovery and to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition" by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 149 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Unredacted Version of "Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Protective Order" Under Seal by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel the Completion of the Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and MOTION for Limited Additional Discovery by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 148 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to the Court by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Enzinna, Paul) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 147 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [143] MOTION for Modification of Protective Order filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Unredacted version of the Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 6/5/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jody A. Cummings on behalf of ORLANDO HALL (Bonheimer, Owen) Modified on 1/21/2009 (nmw, ). (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re [145] Notice (Other), was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as a Response. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, THOMAS WEBSTER, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CORY JOHNSON, KAREN TANDY. (Eddy, Graham) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 146 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [144] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Protective Order filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SHOW CAUSE ORDER by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON re 194 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Bonheimer, Owen) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of filing of Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to the Motion to Modify the Protective Order by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Eddy, Graham) Modified on 4/4/2008 (jf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Eddy, Graham) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify The Protective Order due by 4/9/2008; Reply due by 4/16/2008. (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to the Court Regarding an "Order to Show Cause" Issued to the Government in the Criminal Case, United States v. Webster, et al., by the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 United States v. Webster, et al., Action No. 4:94-CR-121-Y (N.D. Tex. Dec. 10, 2008)(Order to Show Cause))(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 4/3/08 granting [144] Motion for Extension of Time.(EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue the Status Conference Scheduled for January 13, 2009 and Submission of a Joint Status Report, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 144 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Protective Order by ALBERTO GONZALES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF STATUS OF PENDING REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SOUGHT by ORLANDO HALL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hall Administrative Filings)(Bonheimer, Owen) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Modification of Protective Order by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (McKenzie, Rachel) ( FILED UNDER SEAL, PERSONAL INFORMATION SUBMITTED) Modified on 6/2/2008 (jf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A Cooey v. Strickland S.D. Oh. Opinion 8/26/08, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B Nooner v. Norris Ed. Ark. Docket, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C Nooner v. Norris 8th Cir. Docket)(Bonheimer, Owen) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (McKenzie, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Raby v. Johnson, Civil Action H-05-765(S.D. Tex. Oct. 27, 2008(Mem. and Order))(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion [140] for leave to file under seal their motion to temporarily reopen the proceedings be, and hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The accompanying motion to reopen will be accepted for filing under seal only after parties electronically file an appropriately redacted public version of the motion to reopen. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/27/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as related to Defendants' "Reply to Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Renewed Motion to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' Executions," Nunc Pro Tunc by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 141 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to the Court Regarding Defendants' Position on "Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Temporarily Reopen the Proceedings" by ALBERTO GONZALES (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 140 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d)(1), it is hereby ORDERED that Michael B. Mukasey, successor to former United States Attorney General Alberto Gonzales, be, and hereby is, SUBSTITUTED as the named defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/5/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: In light of the court's order [39] staying discovery pending the Supreme Court's decision in Baze v. Rees, it is hereby ORDERED that this case be, and hereby is, ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The case will be re-opened upon the court's receipt of the parties joint written report which is to be filed 21 days after the Supreme Court's decision in Baze. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/5/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING defendants' unopposed motion [138] for an extension of time to complete discovery and CONTINUING the January 22, 2008 status conference; DENYING AS MOOT defendants' motion [59] to stay discovery; and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE defendants' motion [60] for a judgment on the pleadings and motion to lift the stay of plaintiffs' executions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/6/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 138 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue January 22, 2008 Status Conference and, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) and File Dispositive Motions by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 137 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Owen Levine on behalf of BRUCE WEBSTER (Levine, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed Motion [136] to withdraw the appearance of Lisa S. McCalmont be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/26/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Lisa S. McCalmont as Counsel by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McKenzie, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference reset for 1/22/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 134 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA Concerning Document [123] by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON [123] Memorandum in Opposition,,,, filed by RICHARD TIPTON, ANTHONY BATTLE, BRUCE WEBSTER, JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,, ORLANDO HALL, CORY JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Corrected Public Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Lift the Stay of the Plaintiffs' Execution)(Toll, Joshua) .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 133 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Madelyn E. Johnson on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, KAREN TANDY (Johnson, Madelyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying defendants' Motion [129] for clarification of the September 19, 2007 minute order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/29/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 130 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ORLANDO HALL. Attorney Patrick John Cronin terminated. (Cronin, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Oral Argument held on 9/28/2007; re [120] MOTION to Compel responses to interrogatories 3 and 4 is GRANTED for reason set forth on the record; with respect to interrogatories 6 and 7, parties reached an agreement which is memorialized on the record.(Court Reporter Pro-typists.) (lm )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/6/07 before Judge Magistrate Deborah A. Robinson. Court Reporter: Pro-Typists. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 129 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007, Terminated: 10/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Clarification of September 19, 2007 Minute Order by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Videotapes Under Seal by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/24/07 granting [126] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Deliberative Process Declarations and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, no later than Wednesday, September 26, 2007.(LMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 1/11/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2008.,Status Conference set for 1/18/2008 09:45 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (zlin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' consent motion [119] to extend the discovery deadline be, and hereby is, GRANTED IN PART. The deadline for the close of all discovery is extended to January 11, 2008. Further requests for discovery extensions will be disfavored. The post-discovery status conference is RESCHEDULED for January 18, 2008 at 9:45 a.m. The dispositive motion deadline is extended to February 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/19/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY [126] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Deliberative Process Declarations and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY, THOMAS WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MARK BEZY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 9/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Deliberative Process Declarations and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 125 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John Herrington on behalf of ORLANDO HALL (Herrington, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing: Oral Argument with respect to the remaining issues presented by Plaintiffs, through their motion is reset for Friday, 9/28/2007 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDERED, with respect to the request of Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs (hereinafter Plaintiffs) that Defendants be compelled to permit Plaintiffs a second entry of the execution facility at FCC Terre Haute (see Motion at 1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion at 9-14), said motion is GRANTED IN PART for the reasons offered by Plaintiffs in their memoranda; FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall immediately meet and confer regarding the scheduling of the second entry, and shall ensure that the second entry is completed by no later than September 21, 2007; FURTHER ORDERED, with respect to the request of Plaintiffs for an order compelling the deposition of Dr. Thomas Webster, a named defendant in this action (see Motion at 1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion at 42-43), said motion is GRANTED IN PART for the reasons offered by Plaintiffs in their memoranda; said deposition shall be completed by no later than September 20, 2007; FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument with respect to the remaining issues presented by Plaintiffs, through their motion, is scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on Friday, September 21, 2007; FURTHER ORDERED that no later than September 17, 2007, Defendants shall file and serve upon counsel for Plaintiffs any declaration asserting the deliberative process privilege (see Defendants Opposition at 1);FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Request for Expedited Treatment of Motion (Document No. 120, Part 2) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/7/07. (EW, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place, [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Public Version filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4 (Redacted version of Declaration of Dr. Mark Heath)# (5) Exhibit 4A# (6) Exhibit 4B (REDACTED)# (7) Exhibit 4C (REDACTED)# (8) Exhibit 4D# (9) Exhibit 4E# (10) Exhibit 4F# (11) Exhibit 4G# (12) Exhibit 4H# (13) Exhibit 4I# (14) Exhibit 4J# (15) Exhibit 4K# (16) Exhibit 4L# (17) Exhibit 4M# (18) Exhibit 4N# (19) Exhibit 4O# (20) Exhibit 4P# (21) Exhibit 4Q# (22) Exhibit 4R# (23) Exhibit 4S# (24) Exhibit 4T# (25) Exhibit 5 (REDACTED)# (26) Exhibit 6# (27) Exhibit 7# (28) Exhibit 8# (29) Exhibit 9# (30) Exhibit 10# (31) Exhibit 11# (32) Exhibit 12# (33) Exhibit 13# (34) Exhibit 14 (REDACTED)# (35) Exhibit 15# (36) Exhibit 16# (37) Exhibit 17# (38) Exhibit 18# (39) Exhibit 19# (40) Exhibit 20# (41) Exhibit 21# (42) Exhibit 22# (43) Exhibit 23# (44) Exhibit 24 (part 1 of 2)# (45) Exhibit 24 (part 2 of 2)# (46) Exhibit 25)(Toll, Joshua) Modified on 9/7/2007 (lc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Hearing: Oral Argument with respect to the remaining issues presented by Plaintiffs, through their motion is set for Friday, 9/21/2007 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute ORDER granting [101] Motion to Compel. (lm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2007 re [101] MOTION to Compel is Granted for reasons set forth on the record. Court order Defendant to make available in Washington, D.C. witnesses who were initial instructed not to answer deposition for Re-depositions no later than 9/17/2007. (Court Reporter Pro-typists.) (lm )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/5/07 granting [98] Motion to File Sealed Documents (see Minute Order on 8/16/07). (LMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 122 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to [120] MOTION to Compel filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McKenzie, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 118 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [101] MOTION to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Page of Sealed Document)(Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 117 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Videotapes Under Seal by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 116 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Documents Under Seal by ANTHONY BATTLE (Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 115 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/1/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 114 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 113 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly Maria Russell on behalf of all defendants (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's Motion [97] to admit counsel pro hac vice be, and hereby is, GRANTED only upon the condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, first undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/29/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [101] MOTION to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, KAREN TANDY. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 121 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [120] MOTION to Compel filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007, Terminated: 9/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declaration Asserting the Deliberative Process Privilege by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [101] MOTION to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [99] Notice (Other), [98] MOTION TO FILE SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/28/07 granting [108] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Compel; Response due by 8/28/2007; Reply due by 9/4/2007. (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 108 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 8/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Discovery by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [103] MOTION to Set Schedule for the Briefing of the Pending Motions to Compel (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearing: Hearing on Motion to Compel set for Thursday, 9/6/2007 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (LMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [103] MOTION to Set Schedule for the Briefing of the Pending Motions to Compel filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Testimony of Dr. Mark Dershwitz)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [103] MOTION to Set Schedule for the Briefing of the Pending Motions to Compel filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 103 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Set Schedule for the Briefing of the Pending Motions to Compel by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Discovery by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Consent to File Under Seal by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON re [98] MOTION TO FILE SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration (Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 08/16/07 granting [100] Motion for Leave to File Under seal their Motion to Compel Discovery. (LMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007, Terminated: 9/6/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Attachments: # (1) Cover Page of Sealed Document)(Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 100 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007, Terminated: 8/16/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal)(Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Documents Under Seal by ANTHONY BATTLE (Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO FILE SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON (Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007, Terminated: 8/30/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert E. Waters, :Firm- Vinson & Elkins L.L.P., :Address- 1455 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 600, Washington, DC 20004-1008. Phone No. - 202-639-6785. Fax No. - 202-639-6604 by BRUCE WEBSTER (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert E. Waters# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 96 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE regarding Motion to Compel by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (McKenzie, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 95 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, RICHARD VEACH, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Henault, John) (15 Video Records and 15 Mini-Digital Video Cassettes of Depositions Conducted on August 1 through August 3, 2007 FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 8/8/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/5/2007, Entered: 8/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Reset Reply Deadline by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa S. McCalmont on behalf of JAMES H. ROANE, JR (McCalmont, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 92 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re Order (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. McKenzie on behalf of JAMES H. ROANE, JR (McKenzie, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion [90] for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice be and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/30/07. (lcrwr3 )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 90 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lisa S. McCalmont, :Address- 8400 Alameda Drive, Norman, Oklahoma, 73026. Phone No. - 405-573-3223. by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Lisa S. McCalmont# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re Order (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret O'Donnell on behalf of ANTHONY BATTLE (O'Donnell, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place filed by BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motions [70, 78] for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Oppose Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Lift the Stays be, and hereby are, granted nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion [79] for Leave to File Excess Pages be, and hereby is, GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion [80] for Leave to File Opposition Under Seal be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/24/07. (lcrwr3 )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the motions [74, 75, 76, 82, 87] for pro hac vice admission be, and hereby are, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/24/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeanne Vosberg Sourgens, :Firm- Vinson & Elkins L.L.P., :Address- 1455 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 600. Phone No. - 202-639-6633. Fax No. - 202-639-6604 by BRUCE WEBSTER (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeanne Vosberg Sourgens# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Henault, Jr on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Henault, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Deadline for Filing Reply in Support of Document Nos. 60, 61 and 62 by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [62] Errata,, [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy I. Levin on behalf of JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Levin, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 83 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Cronin on behalf of ORLANDO HALL (Cronin, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel M. McKenzie, :Firm- Baker Botts LLP, :Address- 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - 202-639-1314. Fax No. - 202-639-1190 by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Rachel M. McKenzie# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Filing Documents Under Seal by ANTHONY BATTLE (Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal)(Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 79 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit)(Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [59] MOTION to Stay the Conduct of Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Dispositive Motion filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 76 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Abigail Bortnick, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - 202-626-5502. Fax No. - 202-626-3737 by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Abigail Bortnick Supporting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorneys)(Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Margaret O'Donnell, :Firm- McNally & O'Donnell, P.S.C., :Address- P.O. Box 1243, 513 Capitol Avenue, Frankfort, KY 40602. Phone No. - 502-227-2142. Fax No. - 502-227-4669 by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Margaret O'Donnell Supporting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorneys)(Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William E. Hoffmann, Jr., :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 1180 Peachtree Street, N.E., Atlanta, GA 30309. Phone No. - 404-572-3383. Fax No. - 404-572-5136 by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of William Hoffmann, Jr. Supporting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorneys)(Toll, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [59] MOTION to Stay the Conduct of Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Dispositive Motion filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order Supplementing the Existing Privacy Act Protective Order by JAMES H. ROANE, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Supplement to Privacy Act Protective Order)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/13/07 Approving [Docket No. 69-2] Supplement to Privacy Act Protective Order [For Scanned Document see #69-2]. (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [65] Motion for Preliminary Injunction (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting preliminary injunction. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY [60] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MARK BEZY, [61] MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MARK BEZY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Copy of Memorandum)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2007 re [47] MOTION for Protective Order is denied for reasons set forth on the record; counsel are to file a notice of filing supplement to existing protective order by Wednesday 6/13/07. (Court Reporter Pro-typists.) (lm )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 11/21/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Lift Stays Currently in Place by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDYMotions referred to Deborah A. Robinson. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay the Conduct of Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Dispositive Motion by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [57] MOTION to Vacate or Continue June 8, 2007 Hearing on Discovery Issues filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/7/07 denying [57] Motion to Vacate; for the reasons set forth in the opposition [58] (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/6/2007; it is, sua sponte, ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their opposition or other response to Defendant's Motion to Vacate or Continue June 8, 2007 Hearing no later than 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, June 7, 2007.(CM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007, Terminated: 6/7/2007 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Vacate or Continue June 8, 2007 Hearing on Discovery Issues by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUES REMAINING FOR CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUES REMAINING FOR CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul) Modified on 6/5/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [55] Status Report was entered in error at the request of counsel. Counsel will refile said pleading. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by ORLANDO HALL.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007, Terminated: 6/11/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ORLANDO HALL (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by ANTHONY BATTLE.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: All Discovery close by 10/11/2007.,Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2007.,Status Conference reset for 10/12/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (mpt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motions [36, 38] to Intervene be, and hereby are, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/4/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: At the initial scheduling conference in December 2006, the parties were given over six months to complete all discovery. Now, on the eve of the discovery deadline, no depositions have been taken and a motion has been filed to extend the deadline to almost eight months from now. There being good cause for some extension, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion [43] for extension of time to complete discovery be, and hereby is, GRANTED IN PART. Given the deposition allowance ordered by Magistrate Judge Robinson on May 2, 2007, the deadline listed in the December 6, 2006 Scheduling Order for the close of ALL discovery is amended to October 11, 2007. The post-discovery status conference is RESCHEDULED to October 12, 2007 at 9:15 a.m. The dispositive motion deadline is extended to November 13, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/4/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Concerning Motions Pending Before the District Court and Magistrate Judge Assigned to this Case by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing on pending motions relating to conduct of discovery scheduled for 6/8/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson; counsel shall meet and confer in advance of hearing in an effort to resolve discovery disputes; no later than 6/5/2007, parties shall jointly file a status report in which issues remaining for consideration by the court are summarized. (CM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re [51] Notice (Other) filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [47] MOTION for Protective Order filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Response to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's May 2, 2007 Ruling by JAMES H. ROANE, JR re [46] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [47] MOTION for Protective Order filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Tindall Declaration# (2) Exhibit B - Enzinna-Smith Email# (3) Exhibit C - McCalmont Declaration)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [43] Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by JAMES H. ROANE, JR re [45] Memorandum in Opposition, [46] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007, Terminated: 6/19/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDYMotions referred to Deborah A. Robinson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Objections to Magistrate Judge's May 2, 2007 Discovery Ruling by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re Scheduling Conference,,, Set Hearings,, (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [43] Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Orders in Taylor v. Crawford)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [43] Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions by JAMES H. ROANE, JRMotions referred to Deborah A. Robinson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference by Telephone conducted; Defendants shall file their motion for protective order by May 9, 2007; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by May 16, 2007; Defendants' Reply is due by May 18, 2007.(CM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Status Conference held on 5/2/2007: Motion for additional deposition re[37] is Granted in Part; limit on number of depositions vacated and a total of 84 hours of depositions is substituted; request for 120 hours denied; parties are to meet and confer and agree upon a location and schedule for depositions; hearing regarding motion for Extension of Time to complete Discovery re[41] continued for a Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2007 at 02:00 PM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (Court Reporter Pro-typists.) (lm )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : The Motion for Protective order re[31] is denied as moot. The protective order entered by the court on February 23, 2007 will remain in effect pending further order of the court. (lm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [37] MOTION for Discovery Additional Depositions filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007, Terminated: 6/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JAMES H. ROANE, JRMotions referred to Deborah A. Robinson. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [37] MOTION for Discovery Additional Depositions (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re [38] MOTION to Intervene, [36] MOTION to Intervene by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ANTHONY BATTLE, ORLANDO HALL, THOMAS WEBSTER, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 6/8/2007 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery Additional Depositions by JAMES H. ROANE, JRMotions referred to Deborah A. Robinson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene by ORLANDO HALL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Attachment 1# (4) Attachment 2)(lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene as a Plaintiff by ANTHONY BATTLE (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1- Proposed Order to Motion to Intervene# (2) Attachment 2 - Motion for Preliminary Injunction# (3) Exhibit A to Attachment 2# (4) Attachment 3 - Proposed Order Granting Injunction# (5) Attachment 4 - Proposed Complaint)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 3/26/07 Approving [35] Stipulated Order.(EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re Status Conference,, Set Hearings, by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing on Protective Order conducted before Judge Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 3/22/07; Parties agreement with respect to resolution of pending motion re[31] was set forth on the record and will be filed by the parties; Protective Order is denied as moot; the terms of the Provisional Protective Order will remain in place. Status Conference set for 5/2/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (Court Reporter Pro-typists.) (lm )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY [33] Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MARK BEZY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [31] MOTION for Protective Order filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PBS excerpt# (2) Exhibit New Eng. J. Med. article)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [31] MOTION for Protective Order filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit Exhibit J)(Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRIVACY ACT PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 2/23/07. (lm ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2007 (jf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2007 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson; defendants shall serve any interrogatories or requests for production of documents by 2/26/07. (EW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Concerning Discovery by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, BRUCE WEBSTER, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 2/21/2007. (CM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/16/07. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Status Conference held on 2/21/2007. (Court Reporter Pro-typist.) (lm )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRUCE WEBSTER. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion [23] to Intervene be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/14/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/21/2007 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (CM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Discovery. (jsc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Graham E. Eddy on behalf of BRUCE WEBSTER (Eddy, Graham)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY re [23] MOTION to Intervene Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff and Memorandum in Support (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007, Terminated: 2/14/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff and Memorandum in Support by BRUCE WEBSTER. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Attachment 2# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Lawler, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Concerning Schedule by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, KAREN TANDY (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion [20] for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Reply due by 1/19/07. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/29/06. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Peter S. Smith on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY Substituting for attorney Peter Blumberg (Smith, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 6/7/2007. Status Conference set for 6/8/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery closes on 6/7/07. The Post-Discovery Status Conference is scheduled for 6/8/07 at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/6/06. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts : Status Conference held on 12/1/2006. Discovery due by 6/7/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2007. Status Conference set for 6/8/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadline: Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 12/20/2006. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion [15] for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Response due by December 20, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/17/06. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006, Terminated: 11/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, ALBERTO GONZALES. Related document: [8] Amended Complaint filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,, RICHARD TIPTON,, CORY JOHNSON,.(Blumberg, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 5/19/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Newton Kendig# (2) Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Webster# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Blumberg, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion [12] for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Response due by 11/9/06. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/7/06. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006, Terminated: 11/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [8] Amended Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Blumberg, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' consent motions for extension of time to answer, or otherwise respond to, plaintiffs' complaint [10, 11] be, and hereby are, GRANTED. Defendants' response is due by 11/2/06. The Initial Scheduling Conference is continued to 12/1/06 at 9:15 a.m. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/18/06. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [8] Amended Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Blumberg, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [8] Amended Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Blumberg, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Blumberg on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Blumberg, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON.(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 06/30/06. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, THOMAS WEBSTER, JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [2] Motion to Stay, granting [2] Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/24/06. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [2] MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Barring Their Execution filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY. (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Erickson on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, THOMAS WEBSTER, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Barring Their Execution by JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON. (Enzinna, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY (Filing fee $ 250) filed by JAMES H. ROANE, JR, RICHARD TIPTON, CORY JOHNSON.(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (7) Issued as to HARLEY G. LAPPIN, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, MARK BEZY, JOHN DOES, ALBERTO GONZALES, KAREN TANDY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 241 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?