UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE HUNDRED FIFTY-NINE THOUSAND AND FORTY DOLLARS ($159,040.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02404-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Rakestraw Cowden +1 202 514 7700 +1 202 514 8780 william.cowden@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space Diane G. Lucas +1 202 514 7912 +1 202 514 9155 diane.lucas@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo One, Defendant
Officially listed as "ONE 2002 BMW 745 LI SEDAN"
No Logo ONE HUNDRED FIFTY-NINE THOUSAND AND FORTY DOLLARS ($159,040.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, Defendant
No Logo DUANE MCKINNEY, Claimant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/15/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Statistical Closing
County 11001
Terminated 12/5/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice[20] Motion to Strike; denying without prejudice []Motion for Default Judgment; denying without prejudice [24] Motion for Return of Property. The instant action shall be stayed pending resolution of the underlying criminal matter. All pending motions in the instant action shall be denied without prejudice. This matter shall be administratively closed pending resolution of the related criminal proceeding. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/3/07. (lcrbw2)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as to McKinney's fourth motion for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/9/07. (lcrbw2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Order on Motion for Return of PropertyCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [18] Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/28/07. (lcrbw2)
        LREF
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 ERRATA
        ERRATA -Praecipe by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA [26] Memorandum in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Errata Proposed Order)(Lucas, Diane)
          LREF
          Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to re [24] MOTION for return of illegally seized car and U.S. Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lucas, Diane)
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
            ENTERED IN ERROR....REPLY to opposition to motion re [24] MOTION for return of illegally seized car and U.S. Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lucas, Diane) Modified on 8/31/2007 (lc, ).
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [25] Reply to opposition to Motion was entered in error and was refiled correctly by counsel in docket entry [26]. (lc, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION for return of illegally seized car and U.S. Currency by DUANE MCKINNEY (td, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [20] MOTION to Strike Answer and for Entry of a Default Judgment and Judgment of Forfeiture Against the In Rem Defendant Properties filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lucas, Diane)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Memorandum in opposition to re MOTION for Default Judgment as to MOTION for Judgment filed by DUANE MCKINNEY. (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re [20] MOTION to Strike Answer and for Entry of a Default Judgment and Judgment of Forfeiture Against the In Rem Defendant Properties (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) # (3))(Lucas, Diane)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 12/3/2007 Motion to Strike
                      MOTION to Strike Answer and for Entry of a Default Judgment and Judgment of Forfeiture Against the In Rem Defendant Properties by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lucas, Diane)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Diane G. Lucas on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lucas, Diane)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Motion for Default Judgment
                          MOTION for Default Judgment as to, MOTION for Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; (See Docket Entry [20] to view document) (td, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion for Return of Property
                            MOTION for Return of Property by DUANE MCKINNEY. (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Response to any document
                              RESPONSE to information and notice of forfeiture filed by DUANE MCKINNEY. (td, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                NOTICE of Change of Address by DUANE MCKINNEY (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying [9],[13] Motion for return of property. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/1/06. (lcrbw1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Order
                                    MINUTE ENTRY. The scheduling conference set for July 26, 2006 is vacated. A new date will be set at a later date if necessary. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/21/06. (lcrbw1, ) Modified on 7/25/2006 (lcrbw1, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION FOR RETURN OF SEIZED PROPERTY, [4] MOTION for the return of sized property, [13] MOTION return of siezed property $159,040.00 and 2002 BMW filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Kidwell, Judith)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006, Terminated: 8/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION return of siezed property $159,040.00 and 2002 BMW by DUANE MCKINNEY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Order
                                        GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES. (mpt, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1))(Kidwell, Judith)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by DUANE MCKINNEY. Related document: [1] Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(td, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 8/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION for return of seized property by DUANE MCKINNEY; (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [7] FOR IMAGE) (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of forfeiture by DUANE MCKINNEY; (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [7] FOR IMAGE) (td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [4] Motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/10/06. (lcrbw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [4] filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (unpublished decision))(Cowden, William)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006, Terminated: 4/10/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION for the return of seized property by DUANE MCKINNEY. (td, ) Modified on 2/22/2006 (td, ).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE for permission or mitigation of forfeiture by DUANE MCKINNEY (td, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Warrant for Arrest In Rem Executed. ONE HUNDRED FIFTY-NINE THOUSAND AND FORTY DOLLARS ($159,040.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY served on 12/20/2005, answer due 1/9/2006; ONE 2002 BMW 745 LI SEDAN served on 12/20/2005, answer due 1/9/2006 (Attachments: # (1))(nmw, ) Modified on 1/12/2006 (nmw, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Complaint
                                                            VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against ONE HUNDRED FIFTY-NINE THOUSAND AND FORTY DOLLARS ($159,040.00) IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, ONE 2002 BMW 745 LI SEDAN (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                              WARRANT (2)FOR ARREST IN REM issued (jf, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?