SHORT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02412-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HARVEY PATRICK SHORT, Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/15/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 10/23/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [12] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment, or to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 8-4-06.(jpm)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER that plaintiff respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss, for summary judgment, or to transfer [12] within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 28, 2006. (MT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 8/4/2006 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment or, MOTION to Transfer Case by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Declaration of Kimberly J. DelGreco# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
      MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time [11] to April 21, 2006 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 10, 2006. (MT)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006, Terminated: 4/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
        ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time [9] . Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 20, 2006. (MT)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/19/2006, Entered: 3/19/2006, Terminated: 3/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 1/19/2006, answer due 3/20/2006. (lc, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 1/19/2006. (lc, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney on 1/19/2006. (lc, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                    ORDER Directing an initial payment in the amount of $2.00 be made from Prison Account of Harvey P. Short, and regular monthly payments on the remaining balance of the $250.00 filing fee; granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 1/6/2006. (lc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (lc, ).
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      Case Reassigned to Judge James Robertson. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (lc, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 1/17/2006 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                        PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by HARVEY PATRICK SHORT (lc, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                          ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of HARVEY PATRICK SHORT; directing within THIRTY (30) days of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the information requested herein; failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/10/2005. (bm) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (lc, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (lc, ). Modified on 1/23/2006 (lc, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 1/13/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HARVEY PATRICK SHORT. (bm) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (lc, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by HARVEY PATRICK SHORT.(bm) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (lc, ).
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Summons Not Issued
                                SUMMONS Not Issued (bm)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?