JABBAROV et al vs. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02386-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2020 at 2:23 PM EST (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SHARAF AL SANANI, Plaintiff

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Bogan, III +1 404 815 6467 +1 404 541 3133 jbogan@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space A. Stephens Clay +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 sclay@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Curtis Allen Garrett, Jr. +1 404 815 6141 +1 404 541 3211 agarrett@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Vinay J. Jolly +1 202 508 5800 vjolly@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by REPRIEVE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Katznelson +1 207 353 4640 +440 207 353 4641 zachary@reprieve.org.uk
No Logo ABD AL ZAHER, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Wilson +1 202 274 4147 +1 202 274 0659 rwilson@wcl.american.edu
No Logo ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Brown +1 504 862 8818 cdbrown@shb.com

Represented by TENNANT LUBELL, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Lubell +1 617 969 9610 +1 617 969 9611 elubell@tllawgroup.com
Space Doris Tennant +1 617 969 9610 +1 617 969 9611 dtennant@tllawgroup.com
No Logo ABDUL RAZAK ALI, Petitioner

Represented by Albert Einstein Institution

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Candace Gorman +1 312 427 2313 +1 312 427 9552 hcgorman@igc.org

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

No Logo ABDULAZIZ LNU, Petitioner

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Fee +1 202 756 3300 +1 202 756 4987 jon.fee@alston.com
Space W. Terence Walsh +1 404 881 7161 +1 404 881 7777 terry.walsh@alston.com
Space Michael E. Ward +1 202 756 3076 michael.ward@alston.com
Space Jill M. Williamson +1 202 756 3321 jill.williamson@alston.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Lewis +1 312 207 6439 +1 312 207 1000 bclewis@reedsmith.com
Space Matthew John O'Hara +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 mohara@reedsmith.com

Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam R. Chiss +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 achiss@sachnoff.com
Space Lowell E. Sachnoff +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 lsachnoff@sachnoff.com
No Logo ABDURAHMAN LNU, Petitioner
No Logo ABU RAWDA, Petitioner

Represented by 1001 Fourth Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Marshall +1 206 826 1400 +1 206 389 1708 dmarshall@davidsmarshall.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo ADEL LNU, Petitioner

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Fee +1 202 756 3300 +1 202 756 4987 jon.fee@alston.com
Space Michael E. Ward +1 202 756 3076 michael.ward@alston.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seema Saifee +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 ssaifee@kramerlevin.com
Space Eric Anders Tirschwell +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 etirschwell@kramerlevin.com
No Logo Ahmed, Omar, Petitioner

Represented by 1001 Fourth Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Marshall +1 206 826 1400 +1 206 389 1708 dmarshall@davidsmarshall.com

Represented by REPRIEVE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Katznelson +1 207 353 4640 +440 207 353 4641 zachary@reprieve.org.uk
No Logo ALI LNU, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Wells Dixon +1 212 614 6423 +1 212 614 6499 wdixon@ccrjustice.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Bogan, III +1 404 815 6467 +1 404 541 3133 jbogan@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space A. Stephens Clay +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 sclay@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Curtis Allen Garrett, Jr. +1 404 815 6141 +1 404 541 3211 agarrett@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Vinay J. Jolly +1 202 508 5800 vjolly@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald R. Pugliese +1 212 547 5400 +1 212 547 5444 dpugliese@mwe.com
Space Robert A. Weiner +1 212 768 5400 + 212 547 5444 rweiner@mwe.com
No Logo ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, Petitioner

Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela C. Vigil +1 305 789 8904 angela.c.vigil@bakernet.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George M. Clarke, III +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 gclarke@milchev.com
No Logo BILAL LNU, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Lewis +1 312 207 6439 +1 312 207 1000 bclewis@reedsmith.com
Space Matthew John O'Hara +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 mohara@reedsmith.com

Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam R. Chiss +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 achiss@sachnoff.com
Space Lowell E. Sachnoff +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 lsachnoff@sachnoff.com
No Logo EDRESS LNU, Petitioner
No Logo JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by ESDAILE, BARRETT & ESDAILE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Mone, Sr. +1 617 482 0333 +1 617 426 2978 mone@ebelaw.com
No Logo JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, Petitioner

Represented by 2954 SW 35th Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noah H. Rashkind +1 352 215 5990 noah@rashkind.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo MAHER EL FALESTENY, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Henry Carpenter +1 202 220 1200 +1 202 220 1665 carpentc@pepperlaw.com
Space Stephen McKenzie Truitt +1 202 220 1200 +1 202 220 1665 stephmac@earthlink.net
No Logo MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM T. HANGLEY +1 215 496 7001 +1 215 568 0300 whangley@hangley.com
Space Rebecca Y. Starr +1 215 568 6200 rstarr@hangley.com
Space SOZI PEDRO TULANTE +1 215 496 7073 +1 215 568 0300 stulante@hangley.com

Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon Samuel Woodward +1 202 419 4215 +1 202 419 4253 gwoodward@schnader.com
No Logo MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter B. Ellis +1 617 832 1120 +1 617 832 7000 pbellis@comcast.net

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP (Boston)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Usha-Kiran K. Ghia kghia@foleyhoag.com
Space Andrew B. Loewenstein +1 617 832 3015 +1 617 832 7000 aloewens@foleyhoag.com
No Logo MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, Petitioner

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Fee +1 202 756 3300 +1 202 756 4987 jon.fee@alston.com
Space W. Terence Walsh +1 404 881 7161 +1 404 881 7777 terry.walsh@alston.com
Space Michael E. Ward +1 202 756 3076 michael.ward@alston.com
Space Jill M. Williamson +1 202 756 3321 jill.williamson@alston.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Lewis +1 312 207 6439 +1 312 207 1000 bclewis@reedsmith.com
Space Matthew John O'Hara +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 mohara@reedsmith.com

Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam R. Chiss +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 achiss@sachnoff.com
Space Lowell E. Sachnoff +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 lsachnoff@sachnoff.com
No Logo MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, Petitioner

Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 853 8029 +1 404 853 8806 john.chandler@sablaw.com
Space Richard G. Murphy, Jr. +1 202 383 0635 +1 202 637 3593 rick.murphy@sutherland.com
Space Brian C. Spahn +1 202 383 0832 +1 202 637 3593 brian.spahn@sablaw.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 853 8000 +1 404 853 8806 beth.tanis@sutherland.com
Space Kristin B. Wilhelm +1 404 853 8542 +1 404 853 8809 kristin.wilhelm@sablaw.com
No Logo SAIF ULLAH, Petitioner
No Logo SAMIR LNU, Petitioner
No Logo SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by LINCOLN SQUARE LEGAL SERVICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha Rayner +1 212 636 6934 +1 212 636 6923 mrayner@law.fordham.edu
No Logo SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, Petitioner

Represented by bermandowell.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph S. Berman +1 617 723 9911 +1 617 723 6688 jberman@bermandowell.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by REPRIEVE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cori Crider +1 114 420 7353 +01144 207 353 4641 cori@reprieve.org.uk
Space Zachary Katznelson +1 207 353 4640 +440 207 353 4641 zachary@reprieve.org.uk
No Logo SHARGOWI LNU, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 853 8029 +1 404 853 8806 john.chandler@sablaw.com
Space Richard G. Murphy, Jr. +1 202 383 0635 +1 202 637 3593 rick.murphy@sutherland.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 853 8000 +1 404 853 8806 beth.tanis@sutherland.com
Space Kristin B. Wilhelm +1 404 853 8542 +1 404 853 8809 kristin.wilhelm@sablaw.com
No Logo TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, Petitioner

Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela C. Vigil +1 305 789 8904 angela.c.vigil@bakernet.com

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George M. Clarke, III +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 gclarke@milchev.com
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JAY HOOD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MIKE BUMGARNER, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/13/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County 99999
Terminated 1/31/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-02386-UNA None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-5039'[], '07-5040'[], '07-5043'['USCA-DC'], '07-5050'[], '07-5051'[], '08-5149'[], '08-5322'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (2136) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2107 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2105 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2104 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2103 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2102 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2098 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2097 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2096 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2095 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2094 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2093 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2092 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2091 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2090 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2089 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2088 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2087 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2086 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2085 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2083 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2082 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2079 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2078 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2076 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2073 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2072 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2071 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2070 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2069 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2068 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2063 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2062 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2061 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2055 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2052 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2051 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2050 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2049 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2048 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2047 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2044 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2043 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2042 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2041 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2040 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2039 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2038 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2035 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2034 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2033 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2032 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2031 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2030 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2029 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2028 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2027 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2026 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2014 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (rdj ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2013 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2012 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2011 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2010 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2009 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2008 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2007 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2006 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Version of Traverse by Walid Ibrahim Mustafa Abu-Hijazi re 1252 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Walid-1st part, # 2 Exhibit Walid-2nd part, # 3 Exhibit Walid-3rd part, # 4 Exhibit Walid-4th part, # 5 Exhibit Walid-5th part, # 6 Exhibit Walid-6th part, # 7 Exhibit Walid-7th part, # 8 Exhibit Walid-8th part)(O'Hara, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2005 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDERED that the Respondents' Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected the Designated Information is GRANGED. (See Image for Details). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/20/13. (mpt) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2004 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by SHARAF AL SANANI (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Public Version of Emergency Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay and for Face-to-Face Meeting Between Petitioner and His Counsel)(Clay, A.) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 2003 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT (Exhibit 2 Main Document) filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 2000 SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 2002 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT (Part 2 of exhibit 1) filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 2000 SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2001 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT (Part 1 of exhibit 1) filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 2000 SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 2000 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1999 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1998 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1997 Sealed Motion. (See Image for Details). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/11/13. (mpt, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1997 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1996 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1995 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1994 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER (See Image for Details). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/20/13. (mpt) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1993 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1992 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Public Factual Return for ISN 170 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits Part 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits Part 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibits Part 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits Part 8)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1991 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (ISN 170) by SHARAF AL SANANI. (Clay, A.) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1990 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1989 Motion for Order. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3-5-2013. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1989 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Order and Stipulation Regarding Petitioner's Continued Access to Counsel by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Regarding Petitioner's Continued Access to Counsel)(Schwartz, James) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1988 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1987 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding by Carlos Warner by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED re 573 Order (Warner, Carlos) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1986 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 1985 Motion to Dismiss. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2-22-2013. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1985 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1984 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1983 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Ann E. Nash terminated. (Nash, Ann) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1982 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1981 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1980 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1979 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Joint - ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1978 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1977 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1976 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of All Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Remes, David) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1974 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1973 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment Form for Catrin Thorp by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR (Ghia, Usha-Kiran) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1972 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Lifting Protected Information Designation of Decisions By The Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force Approving Detainees For Transfer by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Fried Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Chart Listing Current GTMO Detainees Approved For Transfer)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1971 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Joint Status Report filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1970 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1970 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1969 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Allison M. Lefrak by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1968 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1966 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 1752 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN ; USCA Case Number 10-5292. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion)(kb) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Concerning Public Factual Return (ISN 330) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Public Factual Return by MAHER EL FALESTENY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Charles) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1961 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Concerning Public Factual Return (ISN 34) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1960 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Concerning Public Factual Return by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Concerning Public Factual Return by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Maskew, Trish) Modified on text 5/16/2012 (td, ). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1958 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Stanton, Timothy) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1957 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1956 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Motion by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1955 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Hussey Scott on behalf of BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1954 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus of Noor Uthman Mohammed (ISN 707) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pre-Trial Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1953 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 N, # 5 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1952 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return with the CSO by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1950 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 3/10/09 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Traverse with Exs. 22-24)(Moss, John) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1949 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Classified Filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Stanton, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1947 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1945 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Joint Motion to Modify Status Report Schedule and Joint Status Report (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1944 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Stephen McCoy Elliott terminated. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1943 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Publicly Releasable Version of Petitioner's Motion in Support of Classified Annex to Petitioner's First Discovery Request by OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV re 1144 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Mone, Michael) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1942 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 452 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1941 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 728 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Part 5)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1940 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION filed by OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(ztd, ) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1939 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV re 1928 Notice (Other) (Mone, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1937 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney David Hugh White terminated. (White, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1936 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Joint STATUS REPORT by SHARAF AL SANANI. (td, ) Modified on 1/18/2012 to seal and edit text (dr). (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1935 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1934 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joint Status Report by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Stanton, Timothy) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1932 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Order Delay Filing Public Return Until Petitioner's Traverse is Cleared for Public Filing by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1931 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1930 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 Narrative, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1929 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 Narrative, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1928 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 452 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1927 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 1453 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1926 Filed: 12/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 12/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1925 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1924 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ztd, ). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1923 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1922 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1921 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH re 1898 Sealed Document, 1897 Notice (Other) (Schulof, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1920 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 1903 SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by SHARAF AL SANANI. (Schulof, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1919 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1918 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to "Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Proposed Factual Return for ISN 455" by ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Schulof, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1917 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1916 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 Narrative, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 171 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 893 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Respondents Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 728 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1912 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Unopposed Supplemental Motion to Deem Protected Additional Words in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 089filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Public Factual Return for ISN 089 on the Public Docket by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 223 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1909 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 687 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1908 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 498 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1907 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 257 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1906 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Supplemental Motion to Deem Protected Additional Words in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 089 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1905 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 689 by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1904 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 148 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1903 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 170 filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 E, # 4 Exhibit 3 N, # 5 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1902 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 49 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. Attorney David H. Remes terminated. (Remes, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1900 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 170 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1899 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 455 filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 E, # 4 Exhibit 3 N, # 5 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1898 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED USCA MANDATE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zkb) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1897 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 455 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1896 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1895 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Lubell, Ellen) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1894 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED (AMENDED) ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/13/11.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PETITIONERS, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, BANDAR AL JAABIR, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, OMAR DEGHAYES, JAMAL KIYEMBA, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, SALIM SAID, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, QAYED ABDUL MOSLEH AL QAYED, RASHID ABDUL MOSLEH QAYED, SALEHA ALI BALJASSIM, SOFIAN EBRAHIM HAMAD HAMOODAH, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, FEROZ ALI ABBASI, MOAZZAM BEGG, SALLY BEGG, ZUMRATI ZAITUN JUMA, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, FALEN GHEREBI. Attorney Gitanjali Gutierrez terminated. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1892 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/8/11.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1891 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Joint Status Report filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1890 Notice (Other) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1889 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 1841 Motion for Order Requiring Thirty-Days Advance Notice of Transfer. Petitioner Sanad Ali Yislam Al-Kazimi's (ISN 1453) motion for an order requiring, under certain circumstances, that the government provide him with thirty-days advance notice of a decision to transfer him from the Guantanamo Bay Naval Station is denied. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/19/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT re Response to Discovery Request by Petitioner Al-Kazimi (ISN 1453) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (White, David) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David Campbell Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, David) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1886 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ross on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Ross, Douglas) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse (CORRECTED) by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1884 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. re #1878 SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1883 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION to Seal Proposed Factual Return for ISN 744 filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1881 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 687 filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Lubell, Ellen) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1879 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 687 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1878 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Attachment 3 replaced to reduce file size on 8/11/2011) (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing: Under Seal Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 744 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Koenig on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Trish Maskew on behalf of All Defendants (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1874 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 1841 MOTION for Order for Thirty Days Advance Notice of Transfer filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI. (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1871 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1870 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 1841 MOTION for Order for Thirty Days Advance Notice of Transfer re Petitioner Sanad al-Kazimi (ISN 1453) filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1869 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Classified Filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA (Stanton, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1868 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Lori Buff Warlick terminated. (Warlick, Lori) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1866 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED CROSS MOTION filed by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(zjf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1865 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE filed by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR. re #1851 Sealed Document, filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(zjf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Protected Information Under Seal by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR (Ghia, Usha-Kiran) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing under seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1862 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Newcomb Murley on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. This order relates to petitioner Sanad Ali Yislam Al-Kazimi's (ISN 1453) motion for advance notice of transfer from Guantanamo Bay. The government shall file a memorandum in opposition to the petitioner's motion, if it intends to oppose the motion, on or before July 8, 2011. The petitioner shall file a brief in reply to the government's opposition memorandum, if he desires to file a reply brief, on or before July 15, 2011. Finally, the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the merits of the petitioner's motion at 3:00 p.m. on July 22, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/24/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order (Hart, Andy) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Andy P. Hart on behalf of JAMIL AHMAD SAEED (Hart, Andy) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAMIL AHMAD SAEED. Attorney Shayana Devendra Kadidal terminated. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information for Rhonda Huczel, Assistant Paralegal by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bryan on behalf of JAMIL AHMAD SAEED (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1854 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 438 Notice of Appeal filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER ; USCA Case Number 08-5149. ORDERED that the order to show cause be discharged. It isFURTHER ORDERED that the request to hold in abeyance be dismissed as moot in light of the court's order denying the petition for initial hearing en banc in Abdah v. Obama, No. 05-5224 (D.C. Cir. Jan. 11, 2011). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the district court's order requiring advance notice oftransfer is hereby vacated.(kb) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Supplement to Respondents' Pending Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 689 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD re 1768 Notice (Other) (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1851 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 Narrative, # 6 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing: Proposed Public Return Motion for ISN 498 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment for A. Katon, paralegal by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1848 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY re 1843 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 1841 , 1842 Notice (Other) filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI. (Rayner, Martha) Modified on 6/3/2011 to add additional link(td, ). (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 1841 , 1842 MOTION for Order for Thirty Days Advance Notice of Transfer filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI. (Rayner, Martha) Modified on 6/3/2011 to add link (td, ). (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 1841 MOTION for Order for Thirty Days Advance Notice of Transfer filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 1842 by Respondents to Petitioner's (ISN 1457) Notice to Exercise Option by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) Modified event title and link on 6/1/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Exercise Option by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order for Thirty Days Advance Notice of Transfer by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The attached order relates to the habeas corpus petition filed by Sanad Yislam Al-Kazimi (ISN 1453). The order was issued on May 4, 2011, and is now being released for public consumption upon the completion of the government's classification review. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/11/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 1817 Notice of Motion to Deem Protected filed by petitioner Abu Hijazi. (See Docket Entry 1837 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION SEAL PUBLIC FACTUAL RETURN re 1817 Notice (Other) and Response to Motion to Deem Proctected Information by petitioner Abu Hijazi (Moss, John) Modified filer on 4/21/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1836 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1835 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report re ISN 1453 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (White, David) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1833 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Re-filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1832 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. This Order relates to the matter of Sanad Ali Yislam Al-Kazimi (ISN 1453). The parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the merits of the petitioner's motions at 9:30 a.m. on May 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/8/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDERED that new counsel be appointed for the Petitioner. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/28/11. (mpt, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1830 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse and Joint Status Report by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1829 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1828 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Motion via CSO by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1827 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT in response to the Court's Order of March 15, 2011 (Dkt. No. 1824) by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1826 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Pet's Mot. to Compel Exculpatory Evidence by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI re 1811 Notice (Other) (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1825 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) discharging the order to show cause, granting the motion to exceed the page limit, ordering the Clerk to file the lodged joint response, and vacating the District Court's order requiring advance notice of transfer as to (42 in 1:05-cv-00833-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01347-UNA, 83 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 47 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 99 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 63 in 1:05-cv-02199-UNA, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-UNA, 49 in 1:06-cv-01684-UNA, 83 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 75 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-UNA, 43 in 1:06-cv-01766-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-02385-ESH, 51 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 28 in 1:05-cv-01725-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 60 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 40 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 72 in 1:05-cv-01504-UNA, 50 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 130 in 1:05-cv-00520-UNA, 68 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH -AK, 13 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-UNA, 44 in 1:05-cv-01189-UNA, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 109 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 21 in 1:05-cv-00995-UNA, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 60 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 39 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01353-UNA, 39 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-UNA, 204 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 39 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 102 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 81 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 100 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 58 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 87 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 56 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK -AK, 39 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 96 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 114 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 521 in 1:10-cv-01020-RJL, 60 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 62 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 26 in 1:06-cv-01668-UNA, 58 in 1:05-cv-01497-UNA, 46 in 1:06-cv-01765-UNA, 52 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 25 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 521 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 135 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 66 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 521 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-UNA, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 102 in 1:05-cv-00569-EGS, 32 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00889-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 216 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 83 in 1:05-cv-00492-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 38 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 19 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 83 in 1:05-cv-01601-UNA, 255 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 85 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 34 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 126 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 77 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 24 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 36 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 93 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 143 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK) Notices of Appeal filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, and TERRY CARRICO; USCA Case Number: 08-5233 (consolidated with 08-5234-08-5262, 08-5264-08-5270, 08-5272-08-5278, 08-5280-08-5286, 08-5288, 08-5289, 08-5291-08-5297, 08-5299-08-5306, 08-5308-08-5315, 08-5317-08-5323, 08-5325-08-5330, 08-5332-08-5336, 08-5338-08-5343, and 08-5345-08-5347.) (tnr, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1824 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1793 Motion to Hold Petitioner Jamil Ahmed Saeed's Supplemental Motion for Expedited Judgment in Abeyance. Petitioner Jamil Ahmed Saeed's (ISN 728) motion for expedited judgment is held in abeyance until further order from the Court. Furthermore, the petitioner's remaining counsel of record, Shayana Devendra Kadidal of the Center for Constitutional Rights (the "Center"), shall submit a status report to the Court on or before March 24, 2011, apprising the Court (1) of the efforts that have been made to locate new principal counsel to represent the petitioner in this matter, and (2) whether remaining counsel believes that new counsel will be identified by the Center within a reasonable time period from the date of the status report, or whether it is necessary for the Court to appoint counsel for the petitioner. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/15/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1823 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's (ISN 1453) Second Motion to Compel Discovery (dkt. 1811) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1822 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1821 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1820 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1819 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Sealed Filing - Joint Status Report - Al Sanani (ISN 170) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1818 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's (ISN 1453) Motion to Compel Exculpatory Evidence by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1817 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Pleading under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1816 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1794 Motion for Leave to File Amended Factual Return. This order is in regards to the matter of Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257). The government's motion to amend its factual return is granted. Furthermore, the petitioner shall file his amended traverse, if he intends to amend his traverse, on or before May 16, 2011. Finally, the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 11:00 a.m. on May 26, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/28/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1815 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER from USCA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zls, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1814 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Dalal, Som) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1813 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 1794 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Factual Return (ISN 257) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 712 Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER ; USCA Case Number 08-5515. ORDERED that the motion to dismiss as moot be granted and the appeal is hereby dismissed. (smm) Modified on 5/12/2011 (smm). (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1811 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Response to Respondents' Motion to Amend and Petitioner's Motion to Compel by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1810 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION re 1809 Notice filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE NOTICE of Filing of Respondents Motion Re: Proposed Public Return for ISN 223 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1808 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 1776 Notice of Appeal filed by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI ; USCA Case Number 10-5352. ORDERED that the joint motion for summary affirmance be granted and the district court's order filed September 24, 2010, denying appellant's petition for a writ of habeas corpus, be summarily affirmed. (zsmm) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1807 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1806 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 1794 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Factual Return (ISN 257) filed by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ. (Moss, John) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1805 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1804 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 089 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1803 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1802 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal - Joint Status Report - Sanani (ISN 170) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1801 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1794 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Factual Return (ISN 257) by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Moss, John) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Factual Return re ISN 1453 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) Modified event title on 1/18/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1799 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(ztd, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1797 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(mmh) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1796 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Joint Status Report Filed Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Stanton, Timothy) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1794 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Factual Return (ISN 257) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowles, R.) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Petitioner Jamil Saeed (ISN 728)'s Motion For Expdited Judgment On The Record by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAMIL AHMAD SAEED. Attorney Paul M. Rashkind terminated. (Rashkind, Paul) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. This Order is in regards to the matter of Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257). The government shall file its motion to amend the factual return, if it intends to file such a motion, on or before December 22, 2010; the petitioner shall file his memorandum in opposition to the government's motion to amend the factual return, if he intends on opposing the motion, on or before January 21, 2011; and the government shall file its brief in reply to the petitioner's opposition memorandum, if it intends on replying to the petitioner's opposition memorandum, on or before January 28, 2011. Furthermore, the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 11:00 a.m. on February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/3/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1790 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zmpt, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1789 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. This order is in regards to the matter of Sanad Ali Yislam Al-Kazimi (ISN 1453). The government shall file its motion to amend the factual return, if it intends to file such a motion, on or before January 14, 2011; the petitioner shall file his memorandum in opposition to the government's motion to amend the factual return, if he intends on opposing the motion, on or before February 14, 2011; and the government shall file its brief in reply to the petitioner's opposition memorandum, if it intends on replying to the petitioner's opposition memorandum, on or before February 23, 2011. Furthermore, the petitioner shall file an amended traverse, if he intends to do so, on or before April 1, 2011. Finally, the parties shall submit a joint status report proposing dates for a pre-hearing conference and merits hearing on or before April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/3/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT re Agreed Proposed Schedule (ISN 1453) by BARACK OBAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAMIL AHMAD SAEED. Attorney Noah H. Rashkind terminated. (Rashkind, Noah) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Supplemental Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for Expedited Judgment on the Pleadings, Responding to the Government's Amended Factual Return by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED (Rashkind, Noah) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1783 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, ABD AL ZAHER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by BARACK OBAMA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowles, R.) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal - Zaher (ISN 89) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The parties in the matter of Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257) shall meet and confer regarding a proposed scheduling order that sets forth the deadlines for the filing of an amended factual return, an amended traverse, and a renewed motion for expedited judgment on the record. Furthermore, the parties shall jointly file their proposed scheduling order on or before November 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/17/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The government's motion for leave to amend its factual return in the matter of Jamil Ahmed Saeed (ISN 728) is granted. The petitioner shall file a supplemental memorandum of law in response to the government's new allegations, if he intends to oppose those allegations, on or before November 30, 2010. Furthermore, the government shall file a memorandum in opposition in response to the petitioner's supplemental memorandum, if it intends to respond to the petitioner's supplemental memorandum, on or before December 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/9/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Edmonds Ray on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Ray, Scott) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 1776 Notice of Appeal. (dr) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL RE 1761 by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2326770. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Clarke, George) Modified on 10/19/2010 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1775 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED JOINT STATUS REPORT re 1774 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. The attached memorandum opinion relates to the habeas corpus petition filed by Toffiq Nasser Awad Al-Bihani (ISN 893). The memorandum opinion was issued on September 22, 2010, and is now being released for public consumption upon the completion of the government's classification review. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/7/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1772 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1771 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1770 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing: Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 689 by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 148) by JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Carney, Mary) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Factual Return for Jamil Ahmad Saeed (ISN 728) by BARACK OBAMA (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT of Unclassified Version of Traverse and Supplements by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(O'Hara, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Nancy Naseem Safavi terminated. (Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The parties in the matter of Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257) shall appear before the Court for a further status conference at 2:00 p.m. on November 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/27/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED that the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Steve Ray Matheny terminated. (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to 1691 Notice of Appeal filed by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN ; It is ordered, on the court's own motion, that appellanmt show cause, within 30 days of the date of this order, why the appeal should not be dismissed as moot. The response to the order to show cause may not exceed 20 pages. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the appeal for lack of prosecution. USCA Case Number 10-5191. (ls, ) Modified on 9/20/2010 to change docket link (ls, ). (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Response in Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED re 1749 Notice (Other) (Rashkind, Noah) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by BARACK OBAMA (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Petitioner Unclassified Traverse by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowles, R.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1751 petitioner Abd Al Rathman Abdu Abu Al Ghayth Sulayman's (ISN 223) Motion for Waiver of Filing Fee and Permission to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/7/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal IFP has been GRANTED and is being transmitted with this notice. re 1752 Notice of Appeal. (td, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Proposed Order by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN re 1751 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1726 Order by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1750 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing - Respondents' Motion To Amend Factual Return (ISN 728) by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Rashkind on behalf of JAMIL AHMAD SAEED (Rashkind, Paul) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1746 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zmpt, ) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1745 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zmpt, ) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Petitioner Sanad Ali Yislam Al-Kazimi's (ISN 1453) motion to adjourn the merits hearing is granted. Specifically, the hearing on the merits of the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus originally scheduled to commence on September 21, 2010, is continued until further notice from the Court. Furthermore, the merits hearing procedures order issued by the Court on July 15, 2010, is vacated. Finally, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 1, 2010, apprising the Court of whether the parties are prepared to proceed with a hearing on the merits of the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/26/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1743 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to hold status conference by BARACK OBAMA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowles, R.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re 1739 of Response by Respondents to Petitioner al Kazimi's (ISN 1453) Motion to Adjourn Merits Hearing by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David) Modified to add link on 8/25/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Sarah Maloney terminated. (Maloney, Sarah) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Adjourn Merits Hearing by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Petitioner's Participation by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1737 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/19/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1736 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/19/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. This order is regarding the matter of Jamil Ahmed Saeed (ISN 728). The government shall file its motion for leave to amend the factual return, if it intends to file such a motion, on or before September 1, 2010; the petitioner shall file his memorandum in opposition to the government's motion, if he intends to file an opposition memorandum, on or before September 15, 2010; and the government shall file its brief in reply to the petitioner's opposition memorandum, if it intends to file such a reply, on or before September 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/18/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1734 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ztd, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Ex Parte Motion Under Seal by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. The attached memorandum opinion relates to the habeas corpus petition filed by Abd Al Rahman Abdu Abu Al Ghayth Sulayman (ISN 223). The memorandum opinion was issued on July 20, 2010, and is now being released for public consumption upon the completion of the government's classification review. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/5/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1731 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION filed by SANAD ALI YISLAM AL-KAZIMI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(zdr) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1729 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER re 1579 SEALED MOTION filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/29/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The parties in the matter of Abudllah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257) shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 1:30 p.m. on August 27, 2010. Furthermore, the government shall provide the petitioner with an unclassified version of his traverse on or before September 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/28/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ADEL LNU. Attorney Kristin Ann Meister terminated. (Fee, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED that the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/20/10. (mpt, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1725 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SHARAF AL SANANI, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner (ISN 744) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The matter of Mohammed Ahmed Saweed Hidar (ISN 498) shall remain stayed until further notice from the Court. The status conference originally scheduled in this matter for 11:00 a.m. on July 16, 2010, is cancelled. Furthermore, the parties in this matter shall file a joint status report on or before January 3, 2011, apprising the Court of whether the petitioner wishes to proceed with litigating this matter. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/16/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1721 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/14/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR. (Ghia, Usha-Kiran) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VACATED PURSUANT TO THE ORDER FILED 08/26/2010.....MERITS HEARING PROCEDURES ORDER. This order is in regards to the matter of petitioner Sanad Ali Yislam Al-Kazimi (ISN 1453). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/15/2010 (lcrbw1). Modified on 8/27/2010 (dr). (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1718 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED OPPOSITION re 1717 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing - Respondents' Opposition To Petitioner Naji's Emergency Motion To Enjoin Transfer Pending Supreme Court's Disposition Of Emergency Application by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Emergency Motion to Enjoin the Transfer of Petitioner to Algeria pending the Supreme Court's Disposition of an Emergency Application to Stay the Transfer of Farhi Mohammed (D.D.C. No. 05-1347) to Algeria by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Remes, David) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Remes, David) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Proposed Public Returns (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance (Warlick, Lori) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1712 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Status Report filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1711 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Status Report In Response To Court's April 1, 2010 Order - Naji (ISN 744) v. Obama filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by R. H. Bowles on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1709 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER No. 3 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/1/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1708 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER No. 2 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/1/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1707 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER No. 1 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/1/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Substitution of Correct Notice of Appearance by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Remes, David) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Remes, David) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing - Status Report In Response To Court's April 1, 2010 Order - Naji (ISN 744) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Status Report by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Lubell, Ellen) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The parties in the matter of Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257) shall appear before the Court at 1:30 p.m. on July 27, 2010, for a status conference. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/1/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1698 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Opposition by Respondents (ISN 744) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Response to Respondents' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Petitioner Jamil Ahmad Saeed's Motion for Expedited Judgment on the Pleadings by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED re 1679 Notice (Other) (Rashkind, Noah) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1694 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1693 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1692 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1691 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED NOTICE by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (zjf, ) . (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISASSOCIATION (ISN 893) by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Protected Information Under Seal by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Tennant, Doris) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1688 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/7/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1687 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1686 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF JOINT EXHIBIT LIST by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1685 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of FILING by BARACK OBAMA (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1684 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1682 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Opposition to Petitioner Abdul Aziz Najis (ISN 744) Motion for aPreliminary Injunction filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Protected Information Under Seal by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Tennant, Doris) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN. Attorney Shayana Devendra Kadidal terminated. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Brief (ISN 728) by BARACK OBAMA (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1678 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1677 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN. Attorney Douglas A. Sondgeroth terminated. (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Respondents' Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1675 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION filed by MAHER EL FALESTENY. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1674 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 1672 Notice of Appeal. (dr) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1673 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Supplemental Memorandum by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by MAHER EL FALESTENY. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Truitt, Stephen) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1671 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Protected Information Under Seal by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Lubell, Ellen) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Nash on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Nash, Ann) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Roger Alan Keller terminated. (Keller, Roger) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1667 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED STATUS REPORT filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jf, ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Status Report by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Tennant, Doris) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1665 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Status Report In Response To Court's April 1, 2010 Order - Naji (ISN 744) v. Obama filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1664 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Status Report In Response To Court's April 1, 2010 Order - Mouhammad (ISN 330) v. Obama filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1663 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Tennant, Doris) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1662 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report In Response To Court's April 1, 2010 Order - Naji (ISN 744) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1661 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report In Response To Court's April 1, 2010 Order - Mouhammad (ISN 330) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1660 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF JOINT PRE-HEARING STATEMENT WHICH INCLUDES NOTIFICATION OF PETITIONERS PARTICIPATION by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1659 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 1389 Notice of Appeal filed by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ ; ORDERED that this case is dismissed as moot. USCA Case Number 09-5274. (mmh, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1658 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to (103 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 42 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 107 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 83 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 47 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 38 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 63 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 49 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 75 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 111 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-02385-ESH, 51 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 28 in 1:05-cv-01725-UNA, 61 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 111 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 60 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 40 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 72 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 50 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 130 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 68 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH-AK, 13 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 44 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 109 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 21 in 1:05-cv-00995-UNA, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 60 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 39 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 39 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 39 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 102 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 81 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 100 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 58 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 87 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 56 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 39 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 96 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 103 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 60 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 26 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 58 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 52 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 25 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 135 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 521 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-UNA, 102 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 54 in 1:05-cv-00889-UNA, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 32 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 83 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 66 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 38 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 19 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 16 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 85 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA, 83 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 34 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 126 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 77 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 24 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 36 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 93 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 143 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK) Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO, USCA Case Number, USCA Case Number, (30 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., (25 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU) Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., USCA Case Number, ; USCA Case Number 08-5233.ORDERED that Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348 be dismissed as moot, FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidation of Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348 with Nos. 08-5233, et al., be terminated, FURTHER ORDERED to terminate party Atag Ali Abdoh in 08-5235, Jamal Mar'i, Nabil Mohamed Mar'i and Farouk Ali Ahmed Saif in 08-5236, Waffa El-Arabie and Sherif El-Mashad in 08-5244, Mohammad Karim and Mohammad Rahim in 08-5314, Riad Nargeri in 08-5321 and Adel Lnu and Saif Ullah in 08-5322; dismissing as moot motion to hold case in abeyance [1177160-3]; FURTHER ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that the remaining appellees in these consolidated cases show cause, within 30 days of the date of this order why the district courts orders requiring advance notice of transfer should not be vacated and the cases remanded. Response to Order due 06/01/2010. Response may not exceed 10 pages [See Order for further details]The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith to the district court a certified copy of this order in lieu of formal mandate in Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348. The Clerk is further directed to withhold issuance of the mandate in Nos. 08-5235, 08-5236, 08-5244, 08-5314, 08-5321, and 08-5322 until resolution of the remainder of those appeals. (mmh, ) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1657 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/3/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Petitioner Abd Al Rathman Abdu Abu Al Ghayth Sulayman's (ISN 223) motion to prohibit the government's use of hearsay evidence at the merits hearing is denied. The petitioner's motion to compel the testimony of Walter E. Bruehs is denied as moot. The petitioner's motion to compel the testimony of a government trial attorney is denied. The petitioner's motion to require the government to authenticate its documentary hearsay evidence is denied. The government's motion to exclude the testimony of Felice Bezri is granted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/23/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1655 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1654 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing - Respondents' Corrected Exhibit List - Sulayman (ISN 223) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1653 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing - Respondents' Trial Exhibits - Sulayman (ISN 223) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1652 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing -- Sulayman (ISN 223) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1651 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The stay in the matter of Jamil Ahmed Saeed (ISN 728) is lifted. Furthermore, the government shall file a supplemental memorandum in opposition to the petitioner's motion for expedited judgment on the pleadings, if any it intends to file, on or before May 28, 2010, while the petitioner shall file his brief in reply to the government's supplemental opposition memorandum, if any he intends to file, on or before June 18, 2010. Finally, the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 2:00 p.m. on July 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/29/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The matter of petitioner Mohammed Ahmed Saweed Hidar (ISN 498) is stayed until further notice from the Court. Furthermore, the parties in this matter shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 11:00 a.m. on July 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/29/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1649 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED. (See Docket Entry No. 1645 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1648 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. In regards to the matter of petitioner Abd Al Rathman Abdu Abu Al Ghayth Sulayman (ISN 690), the petitioner shall contact counsel for those detainees that he desires to have testify at the merits hearing to determine whether there are any objections to the detainees' participation at the hearing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/20/10 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by BARACK OBAMA. (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1646 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Motion in Limine by BARACK OBAMA (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1645 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Lift Stay re 1622 Order, Petitioner's Status Report and Motion to Vacate Stay by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Vacating Stay)(Rashkind, Noah) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1644 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR. (Ghia, Usha-Kiran) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1643 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re 1640 Notice (Other) filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1642 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10.(zlin, ) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1641 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zlin, ) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1640 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 170) by MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1639 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Joint Pre-Hearing Statement (ISN 223) by BARACK OBAMA (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to 1392 Notice of Appeal filed by MAHER EL FALESTENY ; USCA Case Number 09-5276. Upon consideration of appellant's consent motion to dismiss, it is ORDERED that the motion be granted and this case is hereby dismissed.The Clerk is directed to transmit forthwith to the Clerk of the district court acertified copy of this order in lieu of formal mandate. (kb) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance (Warlick, Lori) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Bo Stanton on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA (Stanton, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1635 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pre-Hearing Statement (AGREED) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1634 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance (Bauer, Jay) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Traverse by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI re 653 Notice (Other) (Rayner, Martha) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1632 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/9/10.(zlin, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Buff Warlick on behalf of BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Warlick, Lori) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 1389 Notice of Appeal filed by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ ; USCA Case Number 09-5274. It is ordered that the motion be granted in part and the record be remanded to the district court for limited purpose of allowing it to decide whether to vacate its June 12, 2009 order staying appellant's petition for writ of habeas corpus. It is further ordered that this case be removed from the April 15, 2010 oral argument calendar and be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. (kb, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1629 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MERITS HEARING PROCEDURES ORDER. This order is in regards to the matter of petitioner Tofiq Nasser Awad Al Bihani (ISN 893). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/8/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1628 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The Court's June 12, 2009 Order entered in the matter of Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257) is vacated. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/7/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1627 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MAHER EL FALESTENY. re 1626 SEALED MOTION filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(dr) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1626 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION re 1625 NOTICE of filing of motion containing protected information filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of motion containing protected information by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1624 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The parties in the mattter of Mohammed Ahmed Saweed Hidar (ISN 498) shall appear before the Court at 1:30 p.m. on April 27, 2010, for a status conference. Furthermore, the petitioner shall file a status report on or before April 20, 2010, setting forth any outstanding issues that need to be resolved by the Court at the April 27, 2010 status conference. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/6/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1623 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The implicit request by counsel for petitioner Abdullah Bo Omer Hamza Yoyej (ISN 257) to have the stay in this matter vacated is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/1/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The parties in the matters of Jamil Ahmad Saeed (ISN 728) and Abdul Rahman Umir Al Qyati (ISN 461) shall appear before the Court at 1:30 p.m. on April 27, 2010, for a status conference. Furthermore, the parties in each of the above-referenced matters shall file a status report on or before April 20, 2010, setting forth any outstanding issues that need to be resolved by the Court at the April 27, 2010 status conference. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/1/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. The habeas corpus petitions of Bilal Lnu (ISN 330), Abdul Aziz Naji (ISN 744), and Abdulrahman Muhammed Saleh Nasser (ISN 115), shall remain STAYED until otherwise ordered by the Court. Furthermore, the parties in each of the above-referenced matters shall file a status report on or before May 17, 2010, and every forty-five days thereafter, setting forth the status of the litigation. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/1/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER dismissing as moot habeas petitions of former detainees. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/1/10. (lctfh1) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1619 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/1/10. (lctfh1) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1618 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL re (1927 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Mary T. DuVoisin terminated. (DuVoisin, Mary) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1616 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1615 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1614 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED NOTICE filed by RESPONDENTS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Of Protected Information - Notice Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Respondents' Opposition To Petitioners' Emergency Motion by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1612 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF JOINDER by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Lubell, Ellen) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing of Status Report In Advance of March 25, 2010 Status Conference by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The government's motion for judgment on the record in the matter of Toffiq Nasser Awad Al-Bihani (ISN 893) is denied. Furthermore, the parties in this matter shall appear before the Court at 10:30 a.m. on June 16, 2010, for a hearing on the merits of petitioner Al-Bihani's petition for habeas corpus relief. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/18/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1608 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance (Larsen, Christian) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1607 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Emergency Motion by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL re (1911 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1605 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY MOTION filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing - Respondents' Opposition to Emergency Motion by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1603 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1602 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zmpt, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1601 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of ex parte submission by Respondents - Saeed (ISN 728) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1600 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of ex parte submission by Respondents - Hidar (ISN 498) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1599 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/9/10.(gdf) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1598 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD; (See Docket Entry No. 1597 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1597 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report (ISN 157) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1596 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1595 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER (re Exparte Motion This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/4/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1594 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/4/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1593 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/3/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITIONER AL-BIHANIS (ISN 893) OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE RECORD by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1590 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1589 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Ex Parte Submission - Hidar (ISN 498) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Ex Parte Submission - Saeed (ISN 728) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1586 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Emergency Motion by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL (Dixon, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Pursuant to Merits Hearing Procedures Order by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN re 1572 Order (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1584 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1583 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw / Agreed Motion to Withdraw Petitioner's Discovery Motion, MOTION to Modify Court's Merits Hearing Procedures and Reschedule Hearing Dates by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1582 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/4/10.(gdf) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1581 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Sealed Filing by Respondents in ISN 049's Case by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Lee, Ryan) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner Saif Ullah (ISN 046) by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1579 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION filed by SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1578 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing - Al-Bihani (ISN 893) v. Obama - Respondents' Motion For Judgment On The Record by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1577 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER re: Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/16/10.(zmpt, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Classified Filing of Petitioner's motion for discovery by ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1575 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report (ISN 257) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA. (Bladuell, Hector) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1574 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing of protected information - Walid Abu Hijazi (ISN 049) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1573 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Of Protected Information - Saif Ullah (ISN 046) v. Obama by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 453 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?