AL-DELEBANY v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-02477-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo AHMED AL-DELEBANY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gitanjali Gutierrez +1 212 614 6485 +1 212 614 6499 ggutierrez@ccr-ny.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JAY HOOD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MIKE BUMGARNER, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/28/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County 99999
Terminated 9/20/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '08-5326'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 45 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re (317 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT GATES. (Prince, Robert)
    LREF
    Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry)
      LREF
      Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Response to Order of the Court
      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, of Aug. 20, 2008 filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number 08-5326 for [36] Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO. (jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to re (110 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 52 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01602-RMU, 86 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 41 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 21 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 48 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 17 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 18 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 69 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 62 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 39 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 18 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 33 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 45 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 144 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 63 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 78 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 35 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 94 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 55 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 30 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 77 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 82 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 25 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 74 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 20 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 55 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 97 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 112 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 47 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 27 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 37 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 40 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 173 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 18 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 93 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 84 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 63 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 33 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 195 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 122 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 136 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 10 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 7 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 67 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 57 in 1:05-cv-02349-RMC, 88 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 49 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 71 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 40 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 44 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 62 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 115 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 22 in 1:05-cv-00995-JR, 18 in 1:05-cv-01590-JDB, 51 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 84 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 45 in 1:05-cv-02112-RBW, 43 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 59 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 40 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 61 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 100 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 14 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 47 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 78 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 15 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 67 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 26 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 49 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 72 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 40 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 217 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 131 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 55 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 108 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 256 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 75 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 51 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH-AK, 67 in 1:05-cv-02398-RMU, 64 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 104 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 39 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 50 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 65 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 32 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 84 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 55 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 522 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 73 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 76 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 29 in 1:05-cv-01725-JR, 23 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 84 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 69 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 59 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 34 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 80 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC) MOTION for Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (jeb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
              LREF
              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Reply to Document
              REPLY ADDRESSING PROCEDURAL FRAMEWORK ISSUES filed by BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, ATAG ALI ABDOH, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, SHAKER AAMER, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SHAKER AAMER, ALLADEEN, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABDULZAHER, BISHER AL-RAWI, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, AHMED "DOE", SHAKER AAMER, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABDUALQADER HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, SALEH HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, FARID AHMED, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, BANDAR AL JAABIR, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, SAIF ULLAH, SHARAF AL SANANI, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, ADEL LNU, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, SAD AL MATERI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ADEL AL TUNISI, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDULLA, ADEL, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (MacLean, Matthew)
                LREF
                Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER lifting stays, vacating dismissals, entering protective order, requiring authorizations, and holding motions in abeyance. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/29/08. (lctfh1)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (103 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 64 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 114 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 38 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 103 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 48 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 60 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 62 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 135 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 521 in 1:05-cv-02386-RMU, 111 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 51 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 111 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 60 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 32 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 54 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 130 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 68 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 38 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 50 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH-AK, 53 in 1:05-cv-01602-RMU, 68 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 66 in 1:05-cv-02398-RMU, 126 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 60 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 36 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 93 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU) Notice of Appeal,, (jf, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/26/2008 Memorandum
                    MEMORANDUM by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABDUL RAHMAN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALLADEEN, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, KHIALI-GUL, MOHAMEDOU OULD SLAHI, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, MOHAMEDOU OULD SLAHI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABDULZAHER, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, ABDUL HADI OMER HAMOUD FARAJ, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABRAHIM OTHMAN ABRAHIM EDRIES, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, ABDULKADR ABDULKHALIK DAD, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, JABBAROW OYBEK JAMOLIVICH, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABDUALQADER HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, SALEH HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, ALI THABID, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ALI LNU, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, MSTAFA AL SHAMILI, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, QARI SAAD IQBAL, MOHAMMAD SHARIEF, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, QARI HAMDULLAH, MOHAMMAD NASIR, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (Kadidal, Shayana)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Motion for Order
                      MOTION for Order Regarding Procedural Framework Issues by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Notice of Appeal
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (52 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 52 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 52 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH) Order by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, J. HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Subar, Judry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 ERRATA
                          ERRATA -- Corrections To Exhibts To Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6 -- Corrected)(Warden, Andrew)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER dismissing the petitioner's claims. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 07/23/2008. (lcrmu1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT Submitted Jointly By Petitioners and Respondents In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Petitioners' Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Respondents Exhibits)(Warden, Andrew)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by AHMED AL-DELEBANY. (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT And Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # (2) Exhibit 1 -- Part 2, # (3) Exhibit 1 -- Part 3, # (4) Exhibit 1 -- Part 4, # (5) Exhibit 1 -- Part 5, # (6) Exhibit 1 -- Part 6, # (7) Exhibit 2, # (8) Exhibit 3)(Warden, Andrew)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: setting forth deadlines: Parties' Status Report due by 7/18/2008; Joint Report due 7/21/08; Simultaneous Briefing on procedural framework issues due 7/25/08, and counsel for government and petitioners to file Responses by 8/1/08; Factual Returns and Motions to Amend Factual Returns due 8/29/08. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/11/08. (jeb, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER; Regarding Representative Counsel's request for 30 days advance notice,Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 07/10/08. (hs)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of AHMED AL-DELEBANY Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE Regarding Status Conference by MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Subar, Judry)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/7/08. (lctfh1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER transferring case to Judge Hogan for management and coordination. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 6/3/08. (lcrmu1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
                                              MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that, in the interest of convenience and judicial economy, notices of appearance need not be refiled under this Miscellaneous Case Number (08-MC-4422) if such a notice already has been filed in the docket for the corresponding Civil Action Number. New notices of appearance likewise should be filed exclusively in the docket for the applicable Civil Action Number. Accordingly, no notices of appearance need be filed in the docket for this Miscellaneous Case Number. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION: Hearing set for July 8, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom. (ds)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                  N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER granting [20] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 10/05/07. (lcrmu1, ) Modified on 10/9/2007 (nmw, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [20] MOTION for Reconsideration re [18] Order of September 20, 2007 Dismissing Case filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: respondents file their response to the petitioner's motion for reconsideration on or before Thursday, October 4, 2007 at 3:00 pm, and the petitioner file his reply, if any, on or before Friday, October 5, 2007 at 12:00 pm. (jwd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Order
                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the respondents file their response to the petitioner's motion for reconsideration on or before Thursday, October 4, 2007 at 3:00 pm, and the petitioner file his reply, if any, on or before Friday, October 5, 2007 at 12:00 pm. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 10/3/07. (lcrmu2)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007, Terminated: 10/5/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [18] Order of September 20, 2007 Dismissing Case by AHMED AL-DELEBANY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            JUDGMENT ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on September 21, 2007 dismissing petitioners' claims without prejudice. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00454-RMU et al.(jwd) Modified on 9/21/2007 to add the word Judgment(jwd ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on September 20, 2007 dismissing without prejudice the Petitioner's Claims for lack of jurisdiction. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00454-RMU et al.(jwd, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Response to any document
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion for a Stay-and-Abey Order (see dkt. no. 15) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [14] MOTION to Dismiss filed by AHMED AL-DELEBANY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Military Commision Act of 2006)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                          AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/20/06.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials . Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/15/06.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                              RESPONSE to Order of Court [206] directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt)Associated Cases: (jeb, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Transferring the government's Motion for Procedure Related to Review of Certain Detainee Materials and Request for Expedited Briefing to Judge James Robertson for coordinated handling and decision. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/9/06. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00454-RMU,1:05-cv-00520-RMU,1:05-cv-00526-RMU,1:05-cv-00993-RMU,1:05-cv-00998-RMU,1:05-cv-01048-RMU,1:05-cv-01220-RMU,1:05-cv-01429-RMU,1:05-cv-01453-RMU,1:05-cv-01489-RMU,1:05-cv-01509-RMU,1:05-cv-01607-RMU,1:05-cv-01983-RMU,1:05-cv-02385-RMU,1:05-cv-02477-RMU(djr)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                    Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2006 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay as set forth in the Court's Order this date.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Order
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER setting settlement conference regarding Respondents' Motion for Procedures Related to Review of Certain Detainee Materials. The mediation will take place in chambers on Wednesday, July 19, 2006 at 2:30 p.m. Certain designated representatives will attend on behalf of Habeas Petitioners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/17/2006. (lckay1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE regarding steps taken in the wake of the Supreme Court's recent decision in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld by Respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (jeb, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                          MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Declaration of Harry B. Harris# (2) Exhibit B-Declaration of Carol Kishardt# (3) Text of Proposed Order for Briefing# (4) Text of Proposed Order regarding review of detainee materials)Associated Cases: (jeb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                              NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, and DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jeb, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gitanjali Gutierrez on behalf of AHMED AL-DELEBANY (Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by AHMED AL-DELEBANY.(jf, )
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?