ROUM v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00112-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BUONY ROUM, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ALBERTO R. GONZALES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT S. MUELLER, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/20/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $875000000
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 11001
Terminated 11/14/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-I
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [7] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment, granting [22] Defendants' Supplemental Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying as moot [23] Plaintiff's Motion for Order. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/14/2006. (ses)
    LREF
    Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/14/2006. (ses)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Civil Statement
      Civil Statement from Plaintiff re Defendant's Eavsdroping and Spying Practices. (tg, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Jury Demand
        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BUONY ROUM. (tg, ) (See docket number 23 for scanned document)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Motion for Order
          MOTION for Order - The United States District Court for the District of Columbia Must Either Grant Summary Judgment to Pro Se Plaintiff or to the Federal Defendants by BUONY ROUM. (tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion to Dismiss
            Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss, Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit (Second) of David Hardy# (2) Statement of Facts)(Smith, Peter)
              LREF
              Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Response to Document
              RESPONSE re [18] Request, [19] Request filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Smith, Peter)
                LREF
                Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Amended Complaint
                AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN filed by BUONY ROUM.(tg, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Request
                  REQUEST from Plaintiff for New Trial Date. (tg, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Request
                    REQUEST from Plaintiff for Background Investigation of the United States Attorneys. (tg, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                      Memorandum in opposition to re [16] MOTION to Stay Pending the Processing of Request for Records filed by BUONY ROUM. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [16] Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending the Processing of Plaintiff's Request for Records. The Court hereby stays this action for 60 days. Defendants are ordered to submit a status report or dispositive motion by no later than August 14, 2006. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/13/2006. (tkf)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 6/13/2006 Motion to Stay
                          MOTION to Stay Pending the Processing of Request for Records by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of Change of Address and Telephone by BUONY ROUM (tg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to compel his former employer to return him back to work. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/16/2006. (tkf)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Civil Statement
                                Civil Statement from Plaintiff, BUONY ROUM. (tg, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 ERRATA
                                  ERRATA by BUONY ROUM re [10] Memorandum in Opposition filed by BUONY ROUM,. (tg, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (Smith, Peter)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUONY ROUM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-K# (2) Exhibits L-V)(tg, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [9] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due no later than May 16, 2006. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/25/2006. (tkf)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006, Terminated: 4/25/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                        Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss His Original Complaint for Summary Judgment by BUONY ROUM. (tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of Filing Clearer Copy of Declaration of Scott A. Koch by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III re [7] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Scott A. Koch (without attachments))(Smith, Peter)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit CIA Declaration# (2) Exhibit FBI Declaration# (3) Statement of Facts)(Smith, Peter)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying [5] Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/7/2006. (tkf)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2006 Motion for TRO
                                              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BUONY ROUM. (tg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 4/13/2006. (cdw)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting in part and denying in part [3] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer shall be due by no later than April 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/1/06. (dyc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Reply to Document
                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to [3] Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by BUONY ROUM. (tg, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of all defendants (Smith, Peter)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT against GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III (Filing fee $ 250) filed by BUONY ROUM.(tg, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Summons Issued
                                                            Summons (6) Issued as to GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO R. GONZALES, PORTER J. GOSS, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?