EARLE v. WASHINGTON D.C. POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00072-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VERNON NORMAN EARLE, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant
No Logo JAMES JOINER, Defendant
No Logo U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Defendant
No Logo WASHINGTON D.C. POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/13/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 1/13/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5035'['USCA']
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, JURY, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Remark
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA. (lc, )
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma paupeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/23/07. (ls, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 USCA Order
      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to [5] Notice of Appeal filed by VERNON NORMAN EARLE; It is hereby ordered that this case be dismissed for lack of prosecution; USCA#06-5035 (jsc)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
        MOTION for Reconsideration re [7] USCA Order, by VERNON NORMAN EARLE; Exhibits (ks, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 USCA Order
          ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to [5] Notice of Appeal filed by VERNON NORMAN EARLE; It is hereby ordered that the motion for reconsideration be granted and the June 21, 2006 order is hereby vacated; It is further ordered that the appeal be held in abeyance pending the District Court's resolution of appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis; USCA#06-5035 (jsc)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 1/25/2007 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
            MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by VERNON NORMAN EARLE. (ls, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 USCA Order
              ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to [5] Notice of Appeal filed by VERNON NORMAN EARLE;It is hereby ordered on the courts own motion that by March 27, 2006 appellant must either pay the $255.00 docketing and filing fee to the Court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; Failure to respond to a dispositive motion or comply with any order of the court including this order will result in dismissal of the appeal for lack of prosecution;USCA#06-5035 (jsc)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 USCA Case Number
                USCA Case Number 06-5035 for [5] Notice of Appeal filed by VERNON NORMAN EARLE,. (jf, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [5] Notice of Appeal (jf, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [4] Order Dismissing Case entered on 1/27/06 by VERNON NORMAN EARLE. No fee paid. (jf, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                      ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Further ordered that the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/6/06. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/6/06. (tg, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VERNON NORMAN EARLE. (tg, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against WASHINGTON D.C. POLICE DEPARTMENT, U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JAMES JOINER, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by VERNON NORMAN EARLE.(tg, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Summons Not Issued
                              SUMMONS Not Issued as to WASHINGTON D.C. POLICE DEPARTMENT, U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JAMES JOINER, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney General. (tg, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?