NEWBY v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00160-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BETTY ANN NEWBY, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo ARLEN SPECTER, Defendant
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "AT&T"
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.
No Logo BIDEN, Defendant
No Logo BILL FRIST, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES GRASSLEY, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES SUMNER, Defendant
Chevron Corporation Chevron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CHEVRON-PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY"
No Logo CITY OF BORGER, TEXAS, Defendant
ConocoPhillips Company ConocoPhillips Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONOCO-PHILLIPS, INC."
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"
No Logo DIANNE FEINSTEIN, Defendant
No Logo DICK CHENEY, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD KENNEDY, Defendant
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "EXXON-MOBILE CORP."
Unknown Role, MOBIL CORP
Federal Election Commission Federal Election Commission, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE H. BUSH, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"
No Logo GEORGE WHITTENBURG, III, Defendant
No Logo HANS A. VONSPAKOVSKY, Defendant
No Logo HERBERT KOHL, Defendant
No Logo HOME OWNERS LONG DISTANCE, Defendant
No Logo JACK YOUNG, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "JEFF SESSIONS"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo JOHN BROWNBACK, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CORNYN, Defendant
No Logo JON KYL, Defendant
No Logo LARRY MULLENIX, Defendant
Graham, Lindsey O. Graham, Lindsey O., Defendant
Officially listed as "LINDSAY GRAHAM"
No Logo LOCKE LIDELL AND SAPP, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Mci, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo MIKE DEWINE, Defendant
No Logo Minton, Burton, Foster & Collins, PC, Defendant
No Logo NATHAN HECHT, Defendant
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY"
No Logo ORRIN HATCH, Defendant
No Logo PAT ROBERTSON, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK LEAHEY, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD DURBIN, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT D. LENHARD, Defendant
No Logo RUSSELL FEINGOLD, Defendant
No Logo SAMUEL ALITO, Defendant
No Logo SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE, Defendant
No Logo Southwestern Bell Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY"
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "SPRINT"
No Logo State Bar of Texas, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN T. WALTHER, Defendant
No Logo TED ANDREWS, Defendant
No Logo TOM COBURN, Defendant
United States Senate United States Senate, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE"
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "VERIZON"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/30/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 11001
Terminated 10/5/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-5025'['USCA'], '07-5412'['USCA']
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-D
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 07-5412 for [32] Notice of Appeal filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
    Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [32] Notice of Appeal (tg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [31] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by BETTY ANN NEWBY. Filing fee $ 0.00. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Parties have been notified. (tg, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 31 was modified to show that the case was dismissed. (rje)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Mail Returned
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Betty Ann Newby (rje)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
            Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [26] Notice of Appeal, (tg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [23] Motion for Clarification; denying [24] Motion Clarify; denying [24] Motion for Extension of Time to; granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time to serve the defendants to obtain waivers; granting [27] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; granting [27] Motion for Reconsideration; denying [28] Motion for TRO; granting [30] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The case now stands dismissed as frivolous. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/5/07. (rje) Modified on 11/27/2007 (rje).
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by BETTY ANN NEWBY (tg, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 USCA Order
                  ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to [26] Notice of Appeal, filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY; It is hereby ordered onthe courts own motion that this case be held in abeyance pending the District Court's resolution of appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis; USCA#06-160 (jsc)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 USCA Case Number
                    USCA Case Number 07-5025 for [26] Notice of Appeal, filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Motion for TRO
                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                        MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, MOTION for Reconsideration re [22] Order by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [26] Notice of Appeal, (tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Notice of Appeal
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [10] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for TRO, [22] Reconsideration by BETTY ANN NEWBY. Filing fee $ 0.00. (the Plaintiff left a partial payment in the amount of $20.00 in the overnight filing box of this court. The partial payment has been returned to the Plaintiff). Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Parties have been notified. (tg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Defendants to Obtain Waivers by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION to Clarify [22] Order and MOTION for Extension of Time by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION for Clarification Regarding [22] Order Entered November 14, 2006 by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [11] Motion to Clarify and Reconsider May 4, 2006 Order and vacating that part of the Order which granted plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this Court; denying [12] Motion for Reconsideration; denying [13] Motion for Reconsideraiton; granting Motions [14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20] to Extend Time; and granting Motion [21] to further extend time to and including December 3, 2006 for service of process on defendants. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/14/2006. (lcrcl1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      MOTION to Extend the Service of Process or Filing of Waiver Deadline by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (lc, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Suit by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Requests for Waivers of Service by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to serve waivers of service of process by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Defendants with Service of Process by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Serve the Defendants with Service of Process by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: 7/3/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process Upon the Defendants and Brief by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's May 26, 2006 Order and Other Relief re [10] Order by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                        Plaintiff's MOTION to Reconsider the Motion for Immediate Equitable Relief re [10] Order by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          MOTION to Clarify, MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's May 4, 2006 Order, MOTION for Reconsideration and MOTION to Amend/Correct [5] Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal, by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER denying [7] Motion by plaintiff for recusal of Judge Lamberth, and denying [8] Motion for TRO . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/26/06. (mon, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against ORRIN HATCH, CHARLES GRASSLEY, JON KYL, MIKE DEWINE, JEFF SESSIONS, LINDSAY GRAHAM, JOHN CORNYN, JOHN BROWNBACK, TOM COBURN, PATRICK LEAHEY, EDWARD KENNEDY, BIDEN, HERBERT KOHL, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, RUSSELL FEINGOLD, CHARLES SUMNER, RICHARD DURBIN, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, ROBERT D. LENHARD, HANS A. VONSPAKOVSKY, BETTY ANN NEWBY, STEVEN T. WALTHER, CHEVRON-PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY, CONOCO-PHILLIPS, INC., EXXON-MOBILE CORP., NATHAN HECHT, GEORGE WHITTENBURG, III, STATE BAR OF TEXAS, BILL FRIST, CITY OF BORGER, TEXAS, LARRY MULLENIX, GEORGE W. BUSH, MINTON, BURTON, FOSTER AND COLLINS, P.C., LOCKE LIDELL AND SAPP, LLP, JACK YOUNG, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, GEORGE H. BUSH, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DICK CHENEY, TED ANDREWS, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MICHAEL HAYDEN, PAT ROBERTSON, SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE, ALBERTO GONZALES, SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY, AT&T, VERIZON, SPRINT, MCI, HOME OWNERS LONG DISTANCE, SAMUEL ALITO, UNITED STATES SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, ARLEN SPECTER filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY.(tg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Motion for TRO
                                                                MOTION for Immediate Equitable Relief - TRO Preliminary Injunction by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (Attachments: # (1) Attachments)(tg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006, Terminated: 5/26/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION to Recuse and Disqualify Judge Royce Lamberth and Brief by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying motion of plaintiff for Judge Royce C. Lamberth to recuse himself from this case.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/26/06. (mon, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to AppealCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying plaintiff's motion [4] for leave to file appeal in forma pauperis; This case remains pending before this Court. The Court is willing to treat plaintiff's current motion as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this Court as well as the Court of Appeals. That motion is granted. Before the Court authorizes the U.S. Marshal to effect service of the summons and complaint on each defendant, the Court requires that plaintiff show cause why this complaint should not be dismissed as frivolous. Plaintiff's written response in this Order shall be filed no later than 30 days from this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06-160. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion for Leave to Appeal
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Appeal in Forma Pauperis by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying [2] Motion for TRO . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/30/06. (zmon, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/1/2006 Motion for TRO
                                                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (tg, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT against ORRIN HATCH, CHARLES GRASSLEY, JON KYL, MIKE DEWINE, JEFF SESSIONS, LINDSAY GRAHAM, JOHN CORNYN, JOHN BROWNBACK, TOM COBURN, PATRICK LEAHEY, EDWARD KENNEDY, BIDEN, HERBERT KOHL, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, RUSSELL FEINGOLD, CHARLES SUMNER, RICHARD DURBIN, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, ROBERT D. LENHARD, HANS A. VONSPAKOVSKY, STEVEN T. WALTHER, CHEVRON-PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY, CONOCO-PHILLIPS, INC., EXXON-MOBILE CORP., NATHAN HECHT, GEORGE WHITTENBURG, III, STATE BAR OF TEXAS, BILL FRIST, CITY OF BORGER, TEXAS, LARRY MULLENIX, GEORGE W. BUSH, MINTON, BURTON, FOSTER AND COLLINS, P.C., LOCKE LIDELL AND SAPP, LLP, JACK YOUNG, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, GEORGE H. BUSH, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DICK CHENEY, TED ANDREWS, ALBERTO GONZALES, SAMUEL ALITO, UNITED STATES SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, ARLEN SPECTER (Filing fee $ 250) filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY.(tg, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Summons Not Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS Not Issued as to ORRIN HATCH, CHARLES GRASSLEY, JON KYL, MIKE DEWINE, JEFF SESSIONS, LINDSAY GRAHAM, JOHN CORNYN, JOHN BROWNBACK, TOM COBURN, PATRICK LEAHEY, EDWARD KENNEDY, BIDEN, HERBERT KOHL, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, RUSSELL FEINGOLD, CHARLES SUMNER, RICHARD DURBIN, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, ROBERT D. LENHARD, HANS A. VONSPAKOVSKY, STEVEN T. WALTHER, CHEVRON-PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY, CONOCO-PHILLIPS, INC., EXXON-MOBILE CORP., NATHAN HECHT, GEORGE WHITTENBURG, III, STATE BAR OF TEXAS, BILL FRIST, CITY OF BORGER, TEXAS, LARRY MULLENIX, GEORGE W. BUSH, MINTON, BURTON, FOSTER AND COLLINS, P.C., LOCKE LIDELL AND SAPP, LLP, JACK YOUNG, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, GEORGE H. BUSH, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DICK CHENEY, TED ANDREWS, ALBERTO GONZALES, SAMUEL ALITO, UNITED STATES SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, ARLEN SPECTER, and U.S. Attorney (tg, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 296 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?