CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00173-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Allan Hodes +1 301 404 0502 +1 413 641 2833 infoprivacylaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly D. Perkins +2024 085 565 X111 kperkins@citizensforethics.org
Space Anne L. Weismann +1 202 588 5020 aweismann@citizensforethics.org
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/31/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 11001
Terminated 7/22/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-I
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
ORDER granting defendant's Renewed Motion [29] for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/22/08. (kc)
    LREF
    Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION the Court GRANTS defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/22/08. (kc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bryce, Peter)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
        MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [30] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Out of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion is GRANTED and that plaintiff's opposition to defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment may be filed on 2/20/2008; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's reply in support of its renewed motion for summary judgment is due on or before 3/11/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/27/2008. (lcrjl1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion for Leave to File
          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum, # (3) Proposed Order attached to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Hodes, Scott)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Status Conference
            Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 1/30/2008, ( Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/19/2008., Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/10/2008.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
              LREF
              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration Second Supplemental Sevier Declaration (Part 1), # (3) Declaration Second Supplemental Sevier Declaration (Part 2), # (4) Declaration Second Supplemental Sevier Declaration (Part 3), # (5) Declaration Supplemental Bagnal Declaration)(Bryce, Peter)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: 12/24/2007 Set Hearings
                Status Conference set for 1/30/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/24/07. (lcrjl1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/25/07. (whb)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/25/07. (whb)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                      MINUTE ORDER denying [24] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/1/07. (lcrjl1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                        Memorandum in opposition to re [24] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply , Or In the Alternative, Response to Plaintiff's Sur-reply filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007, Terminated: 5/1/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                          MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Plaintiff's Sur-Reply# (3) Exhibit)(Weismann, Anne)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Declaration of Adrian Sevier)(Bryce, Peter)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                              Memorandum in opposition to re [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allan Hodes on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Hodes, Scott)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                  MINUTE ORDER denying [18] MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/7/07. (lcrjl1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [18] MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Seal Document, filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (jf, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                        Voluntary NOTICE to the Court by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Seal Document, by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (jf, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re Order on Motion to Seal Document,, [16] Notice (Other) (Weismann, Anne)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [15] Motion to Seal Document. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant?s Motion for Leave to File Defendant?s Voluntary Notice tothe Court under seal is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant?s Voluntary Notice to the Court shall be filed UNDER SEAL; and it is furtherORDERED that plaintiff may not disclose the fact of or substance of the Voluntary Notice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/2/07. (lcrjl1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Sealed Document by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Bryce, Peter)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007, Terminated: 3/2/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                  MOTION to Seal Document by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Large Additional Attachment(s)
                                                    ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT Declaration of Joel B. Bagnal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY,. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Large Additional Attachment(s)
                                                      ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1-52) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (53-1366)# (2) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1367-1420)# (3) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1421-1480)# (4) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1481-1543)# (5) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1544-1646)# (6) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1650-1708)# (7) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1709-1789)# (8) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1790-1867)# (9) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1868-1921)# (10) Exhibit 5 to Sevier Declaration (1922-1938))(Bryce, Peter)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007, Terminated: 9/27/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Declaration of Adrian Sevier# (3) Exhibit 1 to Sevier Declaration# (4) Exhibit 2 to Sevier Declaration# (5) Exhibit 3 to Sevier Declaration# (6) Exhibit 4 to Sevier Declaration)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 2/20/2007. Plainitff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and cross motion for summary judgment due by 3/22/2007. Defendant's Reply to plaintiff's opposition and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/23/2007. (whb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [11] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 2/20/07; plaintiff's opposition and cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 3/22/07; defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion and reply to plaintiff's opposition shall be filed by 4/23/07; and plaintiff's reply to defendant's opposition shall be filed by 5/7/07. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/17/07. (lcrjl1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007, Terminated: 1/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plainitff's cross Motions due by 2/20/2007. Defendant's response to Cross Motions due by 3/22/2007. Plaintiff's reply to Cross Motions due by 4/6/2007. Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 1/19/2007. Plainitff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/20/2007. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/22/2007. (whb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by 1/19/07; plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross motion for summary judgment, if any, by 2/20/07; defendant shall file reply and opposition to cross motion for summary judgment by 3/22/06; and plaintiff shall file its reply by 4/6/07. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/19/06. (lcrjl1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Perkins on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Perkins, Kimberly)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006, Terminated: 12/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plainitff's opposition and Cross Motions for Summary Judgment due by 1/19/2007. Defendant's Response to Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Reply to plaintiff's opposition due by 2/19/2007. Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's opposition due by 3/5/2007. Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 12/20/2006. (whb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                        MINUTE SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Briefing Schedule Statement, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 12/20/2006; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment are due by 1/19/2007; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition are due by 2/19/07; and Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition is due by 3/5/2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/3/06. (lcrjl1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Order
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER deferring the date for the parties to submit any proposed schedule for briefing of dispositive motions until July 26, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/17/06. (lcrjl1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Weismann, Anne)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Anne L. Weismann (Weismann, Anne)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Answer
                                                                                Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Bryce, Peter)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Description not available
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Compliance by Anne L. Weismann on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/01/2006. (CB, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                                      LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (jf, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Filing fee $ 250) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A thru N)(jf, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                        SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?