MCDUFFIE v. MINETA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00338-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH MCDUFFIE, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo NORMAN Y. MINETA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/27/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 12/8/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [16] defendant's Motion to Compel, for an Award of Expenses, and to Extend Discovery. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/18/2006. (KF)
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing the case without prejudice to plaintiff's filing of a motion to reconsider within 30 days of this Order that states the reasons why the case should be reinstated. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/8/2006. (KF)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Status Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle : Status Conference held on 12/8/2006. Plaintiff not present for status hearing. Court hereby dismiss the case without prejudice. Motion to compel is denied as moot. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of NORMAN Y. MINETA (Kidwell, Judith)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006, Terminated: 12/18/2006 Motion to Compel
          MOTION to Compel , For an Award of Expenses, and, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NORMAN Y. MINETA. (Konopka, Kathleen)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
            Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 12/8/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Order
              MINUTE ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for December 7, 2006, is hereby VACATED and RESET for December 8, 2006, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/14/2006. (KF)
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER. A further status conference is scheduled for December 7, 2006 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/12/2006. (lcesh2) Modified on 7/12/2006 (lcesh2). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2006 (lcesh2, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Meet and Confer Hearing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 7/12/2006. Discovery due by 12/1/2006. Status Conference set for 12/7/2006 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (tb, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Order
                      MINUTE ORDER continuing Initial Scheduling Conference to 7/12/2006 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/6/2006. (lcesh2)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                        AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint by NORMAN Y. MINETA. Related document: [13] Amended Complaint filed by JOSEPH MCDUFFIE,.(Konopka, Kathleen).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Amended Complaint
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against NORMAN Y. MINETA filed by JOSEPH MCDUFFIE. (fiat) JUDGE ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE(jf, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Meet and Confer Hearing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle : Meet and Confer Hearing held on 6/6/2006. Plaintiff has Two (2) weeks to amend complaint. Initial Conference continued to 7/11/2006 10:15 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith.) (gdf)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Order
                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference is continued to July 11, 2006, at 10:15 a.m. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall amend his complaint by June 20, 2006. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/6/06. (ah)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Konopka, Kathleen)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER for initial scheduling conference on June 6, 2006, at 11:30. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/17/2006. (lcesh2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by NORMAN Y. MINETA. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JOSEPH MCDUFFIE,.(Konopka, Kathleen)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2006 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                        ORDER denying [5] Motion to Obtain ECF Password. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/1/2006. (lcesh2)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying [6] Motion to Dismiss, vacating the Court's April 28, 2006 Order [7] directing plaintiff to respond to the motion, and requiring defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint within twenty (20) days. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/28/2006. (lcesh2)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                            Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded re [6]MOTION to Dismiss filed by NORMAN Y. MINETA. Response due by 5/26/2006. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/28/2006. (lcesh2)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006, Terminated: 4/28/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss by NORMAN Y. MINETA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Konopka, Kathleen)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 5/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION for obtaining log-in number and password by JOSEPH MCDUFFIE. (jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Konopka on behalf of NORMAN Y. MINETA (Konopka, Kathleen)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 3/01/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to NORMAN Y. MINETA served on 3/1/2006, answer due 5/1/2006., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. NORMAN Y. MINETA served on 3/1/2006, answer due 5/1/2006 (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH MCDUFFIE. (jf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against NORMAN Y. MINETA (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by JOSEPH MCDUFFIE. (Attachments: # (1) Attachments)(jf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                                                        FIAT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/10/06. (jf, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                          SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NORMAN Y. MINETA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?