UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 2001 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE LAREDO 4X4, SPORT UTILITY 4-DOOR
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00617-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Rakestraw Cowden +1 202 514 7700 +1 202 514 8780 william.cowden@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo One, Defendant
Officially listed as "ONE 2001 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE LAREDO 4X4, SPORT UTILITY 4-DOOR"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/3/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 11001
Terminated 6/29/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Leave to File Denied
Leave to File Denied by Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle. Petitioner's Motion for an order to produce phone recording, papers, documents and tangible objects. (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/28/06. (gdf)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for Entry of Default
      MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment and Judgment of Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9))(Kidwell, Judith)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER that plaintiff shall move for default judgment on or before June 30, 2006, or the Court will dismiss this action for lack of prosecution pursuant to LCvR 83.23. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/26/2006. (lcesh2)
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Clerks Entry of Default*
        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ONE 2001 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE LAREDO 4X4, SPORT UTILITY 4-DOOR (nmw, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Affidavit for Default
          AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (nmw, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER that by no later than June 26, 2006, plaintiff shall cause default to be entered and apply for entry of judgment thereon or show cause why a motion for entry of default has not been filed. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/16/2006. (lcesh2)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Summons Returned Executed
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ONE 2001 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE LAREDO 4X4, SPORT UTILITY 4-DOOR served on 5/4/2006, answer due 5/24/2006 (td, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Order on Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [3] Motion to Reassign Case. Case reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle for all further proceedings. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/10/06. (clv, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006, Terminated: 4/11/2006 Motion to Reassign Case
                  MOTION to Reassign Case by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Related Case)(nmw, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Notice of Related Case
                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 05cr386. (jf, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against ONE 2001 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE LAREDO 4X4, SPORT UTILITY 4-DOOR (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Warrant Issued
                        WARRANT (1) of of Arrest issued (jf, )
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 144 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?